Lee v. State of Tennessee
Petitioner: Wendolyn Lee
Respondent: State of Tennessee and Bill Oldham
Case Number: 2:2020cv02203
Filed: March 18, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Tennessee
Presiding Judge: Mark S Norris
Referring Judge: Tu M Pham
Nature of Suit: Habeas Corpus (General)
Cause of Action: 28:2254
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 8, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
May 8, 2020 Filing 10 PRO SE MOTION for Hearing on denied writ of habeas corpus by Wendolyn Lee. (Attachments: #1 envelope)(jae)
April 20, 2020 Filing 9 PRO SE MOTION for Reconsideration re #7 Order Denying Petition, by Wendolyn Lee. (Attachments: #1 envelope)(jae)
April 8, 2020 Filing 8 JUDGMENT. Signed by Judge Mark S. Norris on 04/08/2020. (Norris, Mark)
April 8, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER MODIFYING DOCKET, DENYING PETITION PURSUANT TO 28 U.S.C. 2241, DENYING A CERTIFICATE OF APPEALABILITY, CERTIFYING THAT AN APPEAL WOULD NOT BE TAKEN IN GOOD FAITH, AND DENYING LEAVE TO PROCEED IN FORMA PAUPERIS ON APPEAL. Signed by Judge Mark S. Norris on 04/08/2020. (Norris, Mark)
April 2, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER GRANTING #5 LEAVE TO PROCEED IN FORMA PAUPERIS. Signed by Judge Mark S. Norris on 04/02/2020. (Norris, Mark)
March 31, 2020 Filing 5 PRO SE MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Wendolyn Lee. (Attachments: #1 inmate balance history, #2 envelope)(jae)
March 19, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER DIRECTING PETITIONER TO FILE AN IN FORMA PAUPERIS AFFIDAVIT AND A CURRENT INMATE TRUST ACCOUNT STATEMENT OR PAY THE HABEAS FILING FEE. Signed by Judge Mark S. Norris on 03/19/2020. (Norris, Mark)
March 18, 2020 Filing 3 NOTICE OF CASE TRACKING ASSIGNMENT PURSUANT TO LOCAL RULE 16.2: Pursuant to Local Rule 16.2, this case has been assigned to the Pro Se Prisoner track. http://www.tnwd.uscourts.gov/pdf/content/LocalRules.pdf (csf)
March 18, 2020 Filing 2 Pro Se MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Wendolyn Lee. (Attachments: #1 Inmate Balance History Report)(csf)
March 18, 2020 Filing 1 PRO SE Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 2254 filed by Wendolyn Lee against State of Tennessee. (Attachments: #1 Supporting Documents, #2 Envelope, #3 Judicial Cards)(csf)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Tennessee Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Lee v. State of Tennessee
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Wendolyn Lee
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: State of Tennessee
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Bill Oldham
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?