Ignao et al v. Singh et al
Plaintiff: Patrick Ignao, Steven Ignao and Mary Ignao
Defendant: Karmjit Sandhu, Simranjeet Singh and BS Transportation, Inc.
Not Classified By Court: Temiika Gipson
Case Number: 2:2020cv02279
Filed: April 15, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Tennessee
Presiding Judge: Charmiane G Claxton
Referring Judge: Thomas L Parker
Nature of Suit: Motor Vehicle
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 10, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 10, 2020 Filing 16 INTERROGATORIES Propounded to Defendant BS Transportation, Inc. by All Plaintiffs.(Moore, Jeffrey)
June 10, 2020 Filing 15 INTERROGATORIES Propounded to Defendant Simranjeet Singh by All Plaintiffs.(Moore, Jeffrey)
June 10, 2020 Filing 14 NOTICE by Mary Ignao, Patrick Ignao, Steven Ignao Notice of Service of Initial Disclosures (Moore, Jeffrey)
June 5, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 13 SCHEDULING ORDER. Signed by Judge Thomas L. Parker on 06/05/2020. (Parker, Thomas)
June 4, 2020 Filing 12 SETTING LETTER: Proposed Pretrial Order due by 4/30/2021. Final Pretrial Conference set for 5/7/2021 at 01:30 PM in Courtroom 2 - Memphis before Judge Thomas L. Parker. Jury Trial set (2-3 days) for 5/24/2021 at 09:30 AM in Courtroom 2 - Memphis before Judge Thomas L. Parker. (mlk)
June 4, 2020 Filing 11 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Thomas L. Parker; Telephonic Scheduling Conference held on 6/4/2020. Jeffrey Moore appeared for the Plaintiff. Cameron Watson appeared for the Defendants. This is an accident case where Plaintiff claims brain injury. The Court adopted the Proposed Scheduling Order. Proposed Pretrial Order due by 4/30/2021. Final Pretrial Conference set for 5/7/2021 at 01:30 PM in Courtroom 2 - Memphis before Judge Thomas L. Parker. Jury Trial set (2-3 days) for 5/24/2021 at 09:30 AM in Courtroom 2 - Memphis before Judge Thomas L. Parker. (Court Reporter, Catherine Phillips.(mlk)
May 15, 2020 Filing 10 REPORT of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting (Proposed Order Submitted). (Watson, Cameron)
May 5, 2020 Filing 9 SETTING LETTER: Telephonic Scheduling Conference set for Thursday, 6/4/2020 at 10:00 AM before Judge Thomas L. Parker. If the parties consent to have the case heard by the magistrate, please file your consent and this conference will be cancelled. Please call 877-336-1839 to dial into the conference call. The access code is 6517215. (jpw)
May 4, 2020 Filing 8 ANSWER to #6 Amended Complaint by BS Transportation, Inc., Simranjeet Singh.(Watson, Cameron)
May 4, 2020 Filing 7 ANSWER to #6 Amended Complaint by Karmjit Sandhu.(Watson, Cameron)
April 27, 2020 Filing 6 AMENDED COMPLAINT against All Defendants All Defendants., filed by All Plaintiffs.(Moore, Jeffrey)
April 15, 2020 Filing 5 NOTICE OF RIGHT TO CONSENT TO THE EXERCISE OF CIVIL JURISDICTION BY A MAGISTRATE JUDGE Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 636(c), Fed.R.Civ.P.73, and Local Rule 72.1, this Court has designated the Magistrate Judges of this District to conduct trials and otherwise dispose of any civil case that is filed in this Court. Your decision to consent, or not consent, to the referral of your case to a United States Magistrate Judge for trial and entry of a final judgment must be entirely voluntary. The judge or magistrate judge to whom the case has been assigned will not be informed of your decision unless all parties agree that the case may be referred to a magistrate judge for these specific purposes. A less than unanimous decision will not be communicated by this office to either the judge or magistrate judge. The consent form is available on the courts website at https://www.tnwd.uscourts.gov/forms-and-applications.php (jae)
April 15, 2020 Filing 4 NOTICE TO COMPLY WITH PLAN FOR ALTERNATE DISPUTE RESOLUTION (ADR): Pursuant to Section to 2.1 of the ADR Plan, all civil cases filed on or after Sept. 1, 2014, shall be referred automatically for ADR. For compliance requirements, refer to the ADR Plan at: http://www.tnwd.uscourts.gov/pdf/content/ADRPlan.pdf (jae)
April 15, 2020 Filing 3 NOTICE OF CASE TRACKING ASSIGNMENT PURSUANT TO LOCAL RULE 16.2: Pursuant to Local Rule 16.2, this case has been assigned to the Standard track. http://www.tnwd.uscourts.gov/pdf/content/LocalRules.pdf (jae)
April 15, 2020 Filing 2 Judge Thomas L. Parker and Magistrate Judge Charmiane G. Claxton added. (jae)
April 15, 2020 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by BS Transportation, Inc., Simranjeet Singh, Karmjit Sandhu from Shelby Circuit, case number CT-1279-20 (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number ATNWDC-3327619), filed by BS Transportation, Inc., Simranjeet Singh, Karmjit Sandhu. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Complaint, #2 Exhibit B - Business Info, #3 Civil Cover Sheet)(Watson, Cameron)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Tennessee Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Ignao et al v. Singh et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Patrick Ignao
Represented By: Jeffrey Karl Moore, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Steven Ignao
Represented By: Jeffrey Karl Moore, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mary Ignao
Represented By: Jeffrey Karl Moore, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Not classified by court: Temiika Gipson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Karmjit Sandhu
Represented By: Cameron M. Watson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Simranjeet Singh
Represented By: Cameron M. Watson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: BS Transportation, Inc.
Represented By: Cameron M. Watson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?