Kimble v. Capital One Bank, U.S.A., N.A.
Plaintiff: Jasmine Kimble
Defendant: Capital One Bank, U.S.A., N.A.
Case Number: 2:2020cv02319
Filed: April 30, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Tennessee
Presiding Judge: Charmiane G Claxton
Referring Judge: Mark S Norris
Nature of Suit: Consumer Credit
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 2, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 2, 2020 Filing 10 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Jasmine Kimble as to Capital One Bank, U.S.A., N.A.. (Ginsburg, Amy)
May 28, 2020 Filing 9 SETTING LETTER: Scheduling Conference set for Friday, 08/14/2020 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom 4 - Memphis before Judge Mark S. Norris. (zsf)
May 28, 2020 Filing 8 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Capital One Bank, U.S.A., N.A. identifying Corporate Parent Capital One Financial Corporation for Capital One Bank, U.S.A., N.A... (Morris, Samuel)
May 28, 2020 Filing 7 ANSWER to #1 Complaint and Affirmative Defenses by Capital One Bank, U.S.A., N.A..(Morris, Samuel)
April 30, 2020 Filing 6 Summons Issued as to Capital One Bank, U.S.A., N.A.. The filer has been notified electronically that the summons has been issued, and the new docket entry reflects this. Upon notification of the new docket entry, the filer is to print the issued summons in order to effect service. (jae)
April 30, 2020 Filing 5 NOTICE OF RIGHT TO CONSENT TO THE EXERCISE OF CIVIL JURISDICTION BY A MAGISTRATE JUDGE Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 636(c), Fed.R.Civ.P.73, and Local Rule 72.1, this Court has designated the Magistrate Judges of this District to conduct trials and otherwise dispose of any civil case that is filed in this Court. Your decision to consent, or not consent, to the referral of your case to a United States Magistrate Judge for trial and entry of a final judgment must be entirely voluntary. The judge or magistrate judge to whom the case has been assigned will not be informed of your decision unless all parties agree that the case may be referred to a magistrate judge for these specific purposes. A less than unanimous decision will not be communicated by this office to either the judge or magistrate judge. The consent form is available on the courts website at https://www.tnwd.uscourts.gov/forms-and-applications.php (jae)
April 30, 2020 Filing 4 NOTICE TO COMPLY WITH PLAN FOR ALTERNATE DISPUTE RESOLUTION (ADR): Pursuant to Section to 2.1 of the ADR Plan, all civil cases filed on or after Sept. 1, 2014, shall be referred automatically for ADR. For compliance requirements, refer to the ADR Plan at: http://www.tnwd.uscourts.gov/pdf/content/ADRPlan.pdf (jae)
April 30, 2020 Filing 3 NOTICE OF CASE TRACKING ASSIGNMENT PURSUANT TO LOCAL RULE 16.2: Pursuant to Local Rule 16.2, this case has been assigned to the Standard track. http://www.tnwd.uscourts.gov/pdf/content/LocalRules.pdf (jae)
April 30, 2020 Filing 2 Judge Mark S. Norris and Magistrate Judge Charmiane G. Claxton added. (jae)
April 30, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Capital One Bank, U.S.A., N.A. (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number ATNWDC-3337367), filed by Jasmine Kimble. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons)(Ginsburg, Amy)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Tennessee Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Kimble v. Capital One Bank, U.S.A., N.A.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Capital One Bank, U.S.A., N.A.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jasmine Kimble
Represented By: Amy Lynn Bennecoff Ginsburg
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?