Harbi et al v. Shalts et al
Plaintiff: Idan Yechezkel, Anton Shor, Shmuel Haim Chadad, Benyamin Menahem Harbi, Oz Lock, Israel Maidanchick, Mordechai Yshary, Doron Avitan, Sarit Pollak, Haim Aharon, Haim Noach Kott, Miriam Friedman, Roei Buchbut, Ofer Aharon, Avihu Hadad and Avtandil Zuhbaia
Defendant: Dayan Abraham, 770 Investments LLC, Sharestates Intercap Line, LLC, Global One Funding Corporation, David Shalts and 1030 Poplar Avenue LLC
Case Number: 2:2020cv02366
Filed: May 21, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Tennessee
Presiding Judge: Charmiane G Claxton
Referring Judge: Mark S Norris
Nature of Suit: Securities/Commodities
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 16, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 16, 2020 Filing 23 JUDGMENT. Signed by Judge Mark S. Norris on 7/16/2020. (Norris, Mark)
July 15, 2020 Filing 22 NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by Benyamin Menahem Harbi (Higgins, Charles)
June 7, 2020 Filing 21 [**TEXT ENTRY ONLY - NO IMAGE ATTACHED**] NOTICE OF CANCELLATION: The Preliminary Injunction Hearing set for Monday, 06/08/2020 at 10:00 AM before Judge Mark S. Norris is CANCELLED. (zsf)
May 22, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 20 TEMPORARY RESTRAINING ORDER. Signed by Judge Mark S. Norris on 5/22/2020. (Norris, Mark)
May 22, 2020 Filing 19 [**TEXT ENTRY ONLY - NO IMAGE ATTACHED**] SETTING LETTER: Preliminary Injunction Hearing set for Monday, 06/08/2020 at 10:00 AM before Judge Mark S. Norris. The hearing will be held via Skype for Business video conference. The Court will send, via email, to each attorney, an invitation for the conference. Parties shall consult the # Skype for Business webpage for instructions on downloading the proper extensions for their computer. You will receive an email invitation to the conference prior to the start of the hearing. (zsf)
May 22, 2020 Filing 18 MINUTES: Hearing on #14 Motion for Temporary Restraining Order held by Skype Video on 05/22/2020 before Judge Mark S. Norris. Attys Nathan Bicks & Charles Higgins appeared for the plaintiffs. Atty Shelley Rothman appeared for defendants David Shalts & 770 Investments LLC via teleconference. The Court heard statements from counsel & parties indicated that they are in agreement for entry of the TRO. Plaintiff's Motion for Temporary Restraining Order #14 - Granted. Plaintiff's counsel to give notice to parties who were not present for today's proceeding. Preliminary Injunction Hearing set for Monday, 06/08/2020 at 10:00 AM before Judge Mark S. Norris by Skype Video. Order to enter. (Court Reporter: Lisa Mayo) (zsf)
May 22, 2020 Filing 17 [**TEXT ENTRY ONLY - NO IMAGE ATTACHED**]: NOTICE of Hearing on Motion: The parties are hereby notified that a Hearing on Plaintiff's Motion for Temporary Restraining Order #14 has been set for Friday, 05/22/2020 at 3:00 PM before Judge Mark S. Norris. The hearing will be held via Skype for Business video conference. The Court will send, via email, to each attorney, an invitation for the conference. Parties shall consult the # Skype for Business webpage for instructions on downloading the proper extensions for their computer. You will receive an email invitation to the conference prior to the start of the hearing. (zsf)
May 22, 2020 Filing 16 Certificate of Abstract. (btg)
May 22, 2020 Filing 15 Certificate of Abstract and Notice of Lien Lis Pendens by All Plaintiffs. (Bicks, Nathan)
May 22, 2020 Filing 14 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order Emergency Application for Temporary Restraining Order (Proposed Order Submitted) by All Plaintiffs. (Bicks, Nathan)
May 22, 2020 Filing 13 NOTICE of Appearance by William David Irvine on behalf of All Plaintiffs (Irvine, William)
May 22, 2020 Filing 12 NOTICE of Appearance by Charles Silvestri Higgins on behalf of All Plaintiffs (Higgins, Charles)
May 21, 2020 Filing 10 Summons Issued as to Sharestates Intercap Line, LLC. The filer has been notified electronically that the summons has been issued, and the new docket entry reflects this. Upon notification of the new docket entry, the filer is to print the issued summons in order to effect service. (jld)
May 21, 2020 Filing 9 Summons Issued as to 1030 Poplar Avenue LLC. The filer has been notified electronically that the summons has been issued, and the new docket entry reflects this. Upon notification of the new docket entry, the filer is to print the issued summons in order to effect service. (jld)
May 21, 2020 Filing 8 Summons Issued as to Global One Funding Corporation. The filer has been notified electronically that the summons has been issued, and the new docket entry reflects this. Upon notification of the new docket entry, the filer is to print the issued summons in order to effect service. (jld)
May 21, 2020 Filing 7 Summons Issued as to Dayan Abraham. The filer has been notified electronically that the summons has been issued, and the new docket entry reflects this. Upon notification of the new docket entry, the filer is to print the issued summons in order to effect service. (jld)
May 21, 2020 Filing 6 Summons Issued as to 770 Investments LLC. The filer has been notified electronically that the summons has been issued, and the new docket entry reflects this. Upon notification of the new docket entry, the filer is to print the issued summons in order to effect service. (jld)
May 21, 2020 Filing 5 Summons Issued as to David Shalts. The filer has been notified electronically that the summons has been issued, and the new docket entry reflects this. Upon notification of the new docket entry, the filer is to print the issued summons in order to effect service. (jld)
May 21, 2020 Filing 4 NOTICE OF RIGHT TO CONSENT TO THE EXERCISE OF CIVIL JURISDICTION BY A MAGISTRATE JUDGE Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 636(c), Fed.R.Civ.P.73, and Local Rule 72.1, this Court has designated the Magistrate Judges of this District to conduct trials and otherwise dispose of any civil case that is filed in this Court. Your decision to consent, or not consent, to the referral of your case to a United States Magistrate Judge for trial and entry of a final judgment must be entirely voluntary. The judge or magistrate judge to whom the case has been assigned will not be informed of your decision unless all parties agree that the case may be referred to a magistrate judge for these specific purposes. A less than unanimous decision will not be communicated by this office to either the judge or magistrate judge. The consent form is available on the courts website at https://www.tnwd.uscourts.gov/forms-and-applications.php (jld)
May 21, 2020 Filing 3 NOTICE TO COMPLY WITH PLAN FOR ALTERNATE DISPUTE RESOLUTION (ADR): Pursuant to Section to 2.1 of the ADR Plan, all civil cases filed on or after Sept. 1, 2014, shall be referred automatically for ADR. For compliance requirements, refer to the ADR Plan at: http://www.tnwd.uscourts.gov/pdf/content/ADRPlan.pdf (jld)
May 21, 2020 Filing 2 NOTICE OF CASE TRACKING ASSIGNMENT PURSUANT TO LOCAL RULE 16.2: Pursuant to Local Rule 16.2, this case has been assigned to the Standard track. http://www.tnwd.uscourts.gov/pdf/content/LocalRules.pdf (jld)
May 21, 2020 Filing 11 Judge Mark S. Norris and Magistrate Judge Charmiane G. Claxton added. 5/22/2020 (jld).
May 21, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number ATNWDC-3353112), filed by All Plaintiffs. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons David Shalts, #3 Summons 770 Investments LLC, #4 Summons Dayan Abraham, #5 Summons Global One Funding Corporation, #6 Summons 1030 Poplar Avenue LLC, #7 Summons Sharestates Intercap Line LLC, #8 Exhibit Collective Exhibit A, #9 Exhibit Collective Exhibit B (Part 1), #10 Exhibit Collective Exhibit B (Part 2), #11 Exhibit Collective Exhibit C)(Bicks, Nathan)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Tennessee Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Harbi et al v. Shalts et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Idan Yechezkel
Represented By: Nathan A. Bicks
Represented By: Charles Silvestri Higgins
Represented By: William David Irvine
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Anton Shor
Represented By: Nathan A. Bicks
Represented By: Charles Silvestri Higgins
Represented By: William David Irvine
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Shmuel Haim Chadad
Represented By: Nathan A. Bicks
Represented By: Charles Silvestri Higgins
Represented By: William David Irvine
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Benyamin Menahem Harbi
Represented By: Nathan A. Bicks
Represented By: Charles Silvestri Higgins
Represented By: William David Irvine
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Oz Lock
Represented By: Nathan A. Bicks
Represented By: Charles Silvestri Higgins
Represented By: William David Irvine
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Israel Maidanchick
Represented By: Nathan A. Bicks
Represented By: Charles Silvestri Higgins
Represented By: William David Irvine
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mordechai Yshary
Represented By: Nathan A. Bicks
Represented By: Charles Silvestri Higgins
Represented By: William David Irvine
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Doron Avitan
Represented By: Nathan A. Bicks
Represented By: Charles Silvestri Higgins
Represented By: William David Irvine
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sarit Pollak
Represented By: Nathan A. Bicks
Represented By: Charles Silvestri Higgins
Represented By: William David Irvine
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Haim Aharon
Represented By: Nathan A. Bicks
Represented By: Charles Silvestri Higgins
Represented By: William David Irvine
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Haim Noach Kott
Represented By: Nathan A. Bicks
Represented By: Charles Silvestri Higgins
Represented By: William David Irvine
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Miriam Friedman
Represented By: Nathan A. Bicks
Represented By: Charles Silvestri Higgins
Represented By: William David Irvine
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Roei Buchbut
Represented By: Nathan A. Bicks
Represented By: Charles Silvestri Higgins
Represented By: William David Irvine
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ofer Aharon
Represented By: Nathan A. Bicks
Represented By: Charles Silvestri Higgins
Represented By: William David Irvine
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Avihu Hadad
Represented By: Nathan A. Bicks
Represented By: Charles Silvestri Higgins
Represented By: William David Irvine
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Avtandil Zuhbaia
Represented By: Nathan A. Bicks
Represented By: Charles Silvestri Higgins
Represented By: William David Irvine
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dayan Abraham
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: 770 Investments LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sharestates Intercap Line, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Global One Funding Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: David Shalts
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: 1030 Poplar Avenue LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?