Lewis v. Muriis Logistics, LLC et al
Plaintiff: Pershonna Lewis
Defendant: Muktar Oumer and Muriis Logistics, LLC
Not Classified By Court: Temiika Gipson
Case Number: 2:2020cv02474
Filed: July 1, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Tennessee
Presiding Judge: Annie T Christoff
Referring Judge: Sheryl H Lipman
Nature of Suit: Motor Vehicle
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 18, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 18, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 15 SCHEDULING ORDER. Signed by Judge Sheryl H. Lipman on 8/18/20. (Lipman, Sheryl)
August 18, 2020 Filing 14 NOTICE SETTING TRIAL WITH PRETRIAL PROCEDURES: Jury Trial set for Monday, August 23, 2021 at 9:30 AM in Courtroom 1 - Memphis before Judge Sheryl H. Lipman. Trial expected to last approximately 3 days. Proposed Pretrial Order due by Friday, August 6, 2021. Pretrial Conference set for Friday, August 13, 2021 at 11:00 AM in Courtroom 1 - Memphis before Judge Sheryl H. Lipman. (smm)
August 18, 2020 Filing 13 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Sheryl H. Lipman: A Scheduling Conference was held via Skype Video on 08/18/2020. Bobby F. Martin, Jr. appeared for the plaintiff. Carl Wyatt appeared for defendant. The court discussed the status of the case with the parties. Jury Trial set for Monday, August 23, 2021 at 9:30 AM in Courtroom 1 - Memphis before Judge Sheryl H. Lipman. Trial expected to last approximately 3 days. Proposed Pretrial Order due by Friday, August 6, 2021. Pretrial Conference set for Friday, August 13, 2021 at 11:00 AM in Courtroom 1 - Memphis before Judge Sheryl H. Lipman. Scheduling Order to be Entered. (Court Reporter: Candace Covey)(smm)
August 13, 2020 Filing 12 Pursuant to Admin. Order 2020-31 referral judge reassigned to Magistrate Judge Annie T. Christoff. (agj)
August 11, 2020 Filing 11 REPORT of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting . (Wyatt, Carl)
July 21, 2020 Filing 10 SETTING LETTER: Scheduling Conference set for Tuesday, August 18, 2020 at 01:30 PM in Courtroom 1 - Memphis before Judge Sheryl H. Lipman. The proceeding will be done via Skype for Business video conference. The Court will email the parties an invitation for the video conference prior to the proceeding.Counsel should submit any exhibits to be offered to the Judge's ECF mailbox prior to the proceeding.The public may also access the video proceeding. If the public and/or media wish to attend in the video proceeding, please click on the following link to request access information: #https://www.tnwd.uscourts.gov/videohearings The access information will be delivered via email to the email address from which the request originated.Parties shall consult the #Skype for Business webpage for instructions on downloading the proper extensions for their computer.Please email Sandra McClain at sandra_mcclain@tnwd.uscourts.gov for any questions. (smm)
July 5, 2020 Filing 9 ANSWER to Complaint with Jury Demand by Muriis Logistics, LLC.(Wyatt, Carl)
July 1, 2020 Filing 8 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Muriis Logistics, LLC. (Wyatt, Carl)
July 1, 2020 Filing 7 NOTICE of Appearance by Carl Wyatt on behalf of Muriis Logistics, LLC, Muktar Oumer (Wyatt, Carl)
July 1, 2020 Filing 6 COURTESY NOTICE: Pursuant to Rule 5 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure, document #1 Notice of Removal, filed by Muktar Oumer, Muriis Logistics, LLC has been filed. Please note the attorney's s/signature is missing from the civil cover sheet.. Please refer to the #ECF User Manual and #ECF Policies and Procedures. (jld)
July 1, 2020 Filing 5 NOTICE OF RIGHT TO CONSENT TO THE EXERCISE OF CIVIL JURISDICTION BY A MAGISTRATE JUDGE Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 636(c), Fed.R.Civ.P.73, and Local Rule 72.1, this Court has designated the Magistrate Judges of this District to conduct trials and otherwise dispose of any civil case that is filed in this Court. Your decision to consent, or not consent, to the referral of your case to a United States Magistrate Judge for trial and entry of a final judgment must be entirely voluntary. The judge or magistrate judge to whom the case has been assigned will not be informed of your decision unless all parties agree that the case may be referred to a magistrate judge for these specific purposes. A less than unanimous decision will not be communicated by this office to either the judge or magistrate judge. The consent form is available on the courts website at https://www.tnwd.uscourts.gov/forms-and-applications.php (jld)
July 1, 2020 Filing 4 NOTICE TO COMPLY WITH PLAN FOR ALTERNATE DISPUTE RESOLUTION (ADR): Pursuant to Section to 2.1 of the ADR Plan, all civil cases filed on or after Sept. 1, 2014, shall be referred automatically for ADR. For compliance requirements, refer to the ADR Plan at: http://www.tnwd.uscourts.gov/pdf/content/ADRPlan.pdf (jld)
July 1, 2020 Filing 3 NOTICE OF CASE TRACKING ASSIGNMENT PURSUANT TO LOCAL RULE 16.2: Pursuant to Local Rule 16.2, this case has been assigned to the Standard track. http://www.tnwd.uscourts.gov/pdf/content/LocalRules.pdf (jld)
July 1, 2020 Filing 2 Judge Sheryl H. Lipman and Judge Unassigned 7 added. (jld)
July 1, 2020 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Muktar Oumer, Muriis Logistics, LLC from Shelby County Circuit, case number Ct-0542-19 (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number ATNWDC-3379717), filed by Muktar Oumer, Muriis Logistics, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit State Court Complaint)(Wyatt, Carl)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Tennessee Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Lewis v. Muriis Logistics, LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Pershonna Lewis
Represented By: Bobby F. Martin, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Muktar Oumer
Represented By: Carl Wyatt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Muriis Logistics, LLC
Represented By: Carl Wyatt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Not classified by court: Temiika Gipson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?