Stafford v. United States of America
Petitioner: James Stafford
Respondent: United States of America
Case Number: 2:2020cv02517
Filed: July 15, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Tennessee
Presiding Judge: Annie T Christoff
Referring Judge: John T Fowlkes
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Vacate Sentence
Cause of Action: 28:2255
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 13, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 13, 2020 Filing 7 Pursuant to Admin. Order 2020-31 referral judge reassigned to Magistrate Judge Annie T. Christoff.(cdi)
August 13, 2020 Filing 6 ANSWER to #4 Amended Complaint by United States of America.(Bedini, Naya)
July 29, 2020 Filing 5 NOTICE of Appearance by Naya Bedini on behalf of United States of America (Bedini, Naya)
July 27, 2020 Filing 4 Pro Se AMENDED 2255 Motion against United States of America, filed by James Stafford. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum, #2 Cover letter, #3 Envelope)(jld)
July 22, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER directing United States to respond to 2255 Motion. Signed by Judge John T. Fowlkes, Jr. on 07/22/2020. (Fowlkes, J.)
July 15, 2020 Filing 2 NOTICE OF CASE TRACKING ASSIGNMENT PURSUANT TO LOCAL RULE 16.2: Pursuant to Local Rule 16.2, this case has been assigned to the Pro Se Prisoner track. http://www.tnwd.uscourts.gov/pdf/content/LocalRules.pdf (csf)
July 15, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 1 Order from COA Authorizing District Court to Consider Second or Successive Motion to Vacate, Set Aside or Correct Sentence filed by James Stafford against United States of America. (Attachments: #1 Letter from COA, #2 Application for Leave to File successive 28 U.S.C. 2255, #3 Petitioner's Motion Seeking Permission to File Successive 28 U.S.C. 2255, #4 Appendix I, #5 Appendix 2, #6 Appendix 3, #7 Motion Under 28 U.S.C. 2255 to Vacate, Set Aside or Correct Sentence, #8 Memorandum of Law in Support #9 Judicial Cards) (csf).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Tennessee Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Stafford v. United States of America
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: United States of America
Represented By: 2255 AUSA
Represented By: Naya Bedini
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: James Stafford
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?