Sosa v. United States of America
Petitioner: Angilito Sosa
Respondent: United States of America
Case Number: 2:2020cv02525
Filed: July 16, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Tennessee
Presiding Judge: John T Fowlkes
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Vacate Sentence
Cause of Action: 28:2255
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 27, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 27, 2020 Filing 5 NOTICE: US COA number assigned 20-5844. (jae)
July 22, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER transferring #1 successive 2255 Motion to Sixth Circuit Court of Appeals and closing case. Signed by Judge John T. Fowlkes, Jr. on 07/22/2020. (Fowlkes, J.)
July 21, 2020 Filing 3 NOTICE of Appearance by Naya Bedini on behalf of United States of America (Bedini, Naya)
July 16, 2020 Filing 2 NOTICE OF CASE TRACKING ASSIGNMENT PURSUANT TO LOCAL RULE 16.2: Pursuant to Local Rule 16.2, this case has been assigned to the Pro Se Prisoner track. http://www.tnwd.uscourts.gov/pdf/content/LocalRules.pdf (csf)
July 16, 2020 Filing 1 PRO SE Motion Under 28 U.S.C. 2255 to Vacate, Set Aside or Correct Sentence filed by Angilito Sosa against United States of America. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support, #2 Envelope)(csf) (Additional attachment(s) added on 7/20/2020: #3 judges cards) (agj).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Tennessee Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Sosa v. United States of America
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Angilito Sosa
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: United States of America
Represented By: Naya Bedini
Represented By: 2255 AUSA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?