Brown v. Shelby County Board of Education
Plaintiff: Keith Brown
Defendant: Shelby County Board of Education
Not Classified By Court: Clerk Temiika Gipson
Case Number: 2:2020cv02546
Filed: July 27, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Tennessee
Presiding Judge: Charmiane G Claxton
Referring Judge: Sheryl H Lipman
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 26, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 26, 2020 Filing 12 NOTICE of Appearance by Varonica R Cooper on behalf of All Plaintiffs (Cooper, Varonica)
August 26, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 11 SCHEDULING ORDER. Signed by Judge Sheryl H. Lipman on 8/26/20. (Lipman, Sheryl)
August 26, 2020 Filing 10 NOTICE SETTING TRIAL WITH PRETRIAL PROCEDURES: Jury Trial set for Monday, June 21, 2021 at 9:30 AM in Courtroom 1 - Memphis before Judge Sheryl H. Lipman. Trial is estimated to last 2 days. Joint Proposed Pretrial Order due by Friday, May 28, 2021. Pretrial Conference set for Friday, June 4, 2021 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom 1 - Memphis before Judge Sheryl H. Lipman. (smm)
August 26, 2020 Filing 9 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Sheryl H. Lipman: Scheduling Conference was held via Skype Video on 08/26/2020. Varonica R. Cooper appeared for the plaintiff(s). Rodney G. Moore appeared for the defendant(s). The court discussed the dates and deadlines with the parties. Jury Trial set for Monday, June 21, 2021 at 9:30 AM in Courtroom 1 - Memphis before Judge Sheryl H. Lipman. Trial is estimated to last 2 days. Joint Proposed Pretrial Order due by Friday, May 28, 2021. Pretrial Conference set for Friday, June 4, 2021 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom 1 - Memphis before Judge Sheryl H. Lipman. Scheduling Order to be entered. (Court Reporter: Candace Covey) (smm)
August 5, 2020 Filing 8 REPORT of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting . (Moore, Rodney)
August 3, 2020 Filing 7 Defendant's ANSWER to Complaint by Shelby County Board of Education.(Moore, Rodney)
July 27, 2020 Filing 6 SETTING LETTER: Scheduling Conference set for Wednesday, August 26, 2020 at 9:15 AM in Courtroom 1 - Memphis before Judge Sheryl H. Lipman. The proceeding will be done via Skype for Business video conference. The Court will email the parties an invitation for the video conference prior to the proceeding.Counsel should submit any exhibits to be offered to the Judge's ECF mailbox prior to the proceeding.The public may also access the video proceeding. If the public and/or media wish to attend in the video proceeding, please click on the following link to request access information: #https://www.tnwd.uscourts.gov/videohearings The access information will be delivered via email to the email address from which the request originated.Parties shall consult the #Skype for Business webpage for instructions on downloading the proper extensions for their computer.Please email Sandra McClain at sandra_mcclain@tnwd.uscourts.gov for any questions. (smm)
July 27, 2020 Filing 5 NOTICE OF RIGHT TO CONSENT TO THE EXERCISE OF CIVIL JURISDICTION BY A MAGISTRATE JUDGE Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 636(c), Fed.R.Civ.P.73, and Local Rule 72.1, this Court has designated the Magistrate Judges of this District to conduct trials and otherwise dispose of any civil case that is filed in this Court. Your decision to consent, or not consent, to the referral of your case to a United States Magistrate Judge for trial and entry of a final judgment must be entirely voluntary. The judge or magistrate judge to whom the case has been assigned will not be informed of your decision unless all parties agree that the case may be referred to a magistrate judge for these specific purposes. A less than unanimous decision will not be communicated by this office to either the judge or magistrate judge. The consent form is available on the courts website at https://www.tnwd.uscourts.gov/forms-and-applications.php (jld)
July 27, 2020 Filing 4 NOTICE TO COMPLY WITH PLAN FOR ALTERNATE DISPUTE RESOLUTION (ADR): Pursuant to Section to 2.1 of the ADR Plan, all civil cases filed on or after Sept. 1, 2014, shall be referred automatically for ADR. For compliance requirements, refer to the ADR Plan at: http://www.tnwd.uscourts.gov/pdf/content/ADRPlan.pdf (jld)
July 27, 2020 Filing 3 NOTICE OF CASE TRACKING ASSIGNMENT PURSUANT TO LOCAL RULE 16.2: Pursuant to Local Rule 16.2, this case has been assigned to the Standard track. http://www.tnwd.uscourts.gov/pdf/content/LocalRules.pdf (jld)
July 27, 2020 Filing 2 Judge Sheryl H. Lipman and Magistrate Judge Charmiane G. Claxton added. (jld)
July 27, 2020 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Shelby County Board of Education from Circuit Court of Shelby County Tennessee, case number CT-2289-20 (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number ATNWDC-3397801), filed by Shelby County Board of Education. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Circuit Court Documents, #2 Civil Cover Sheet)(Moore, Rodney)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Tennessee Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Brown v. Shelby County Board of Education
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Keith Brown
Represented By: Terrell L. Tooten
Represented By: Varonica R Cooper
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Shelby County Board of Education
Represented By: Rodney G. Moore
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Not classified by court: Clerk Temiika Gipson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?