Higgs v. Golden Title Loans LLC
Plaintiff: Danita Higgs
Defendant: Golden Title Loans LLC agent of d/b/a "745 Cash"
Case Number: 2:2020cv02559
Filed: August 3, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Tennessee
Presiding Judge: Annie T Christoff
Referring Judge: Sheryl H Lipman
Nature of Suit: Other Statutory Actions
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1331
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 28, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 28, 2020 Filing 14 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Danita Higgs. Golden Title Loans LLC waiver sent on 8/25/2020, answer due 10/26/2020. (Morgan, Max)
August 26, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER granting #12 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. [**TEXT ORDER ONLY--NO IMAGE ATTACHED.**] Signed by Judge Sheryl H. Lipman on 8/26/20. (Lipman, Sheryl)
August 26, 2020 Filing 12 First MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice proposed order submitted (Filing fee $ 150 receipt number ATNWDC-3422263) by Danita Higgs. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Certificate of Good Standing, #2 Exhibit Certificate of Good Standing)(Morgan, Max)
August 26, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER granting #10 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. [**TEXT ORDER ONLY--NO IMAGE ATTACHED.**] Signed by Judge Sheryl H. Lipman on 8/26/20. (Lipman, Sheryl)
August 26, 2020 Filing 10 First MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice proposed order submitted (Filing fee $ 150 receipt number BTNWDC-3422215) by Danita Higgs. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Certificate of Good Standing, #2 Exhibit Certificate of Good Standing)(Weitz, Eric)
August 20, 2020 Filing 9 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Danita Higgs as to Golden Title Loans LLC. (Garrison, David)
August 13, 2020 Filing 8 Pursuant to Admin. Order 2020-31 referral judge reassigned to Magistrate Judge Annie T. Christoff.(cdi)
August 12, 2020 Filing 7 NOTICE of Appearance by Joshua Art Frank on behalf of Danita Higgs (Frank, Joshua)
August 4, 2020 Filing 6 Summons Issued as to Golden Title Loans LLC. The filer has been notified electronically that the summons has been issued, and the new docket entry reflects this. Upon notification of the new docket entry, the filer is to print the issued summons in order to effect service. (jae)
August 4, 2020 Filing 5 NOTICE OF RIGHT TO CONSENT TO THE EXERCISE OF CIVIL JURISDICTION BY A MAGISTRATE JUDGE Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 636(c), Fed.R.Civ.P.73, and Local Rule 72.1, this Court has designated the Magistrate Judges of this District to conduct trials and otherwise dispose of any civil case that is filed in this Court. Your decision to consent, or not consent, to the referral of your case to a United States Magistrate Judge for trial and entry of a final judgment must be entirely voluntary. The judge or magistrate judge to whom the case has been assigned will not be informed of your decision unless all parties agree that the case may be referred to a magistrate judge for these specific purposes. A less than unanimous decision will not be communicated by this office to either the judge or magistrate judge. The consent form is available on the courts website at https://www.tnwd.uscourts.gov/forms-and-applications.php (jae)
August 4, 2020 Filing 4 NOTICE TO COMPLY WITH PLAN FOR ALTERNATE DISPUTE RESOLUTION (ADR): Pursuant to Section to 2.1 of the ADR Plan, all civil cases filed on or after Sept. 1, 2014, shall be referred automatically for ADR. For compliance requirements, refer to the ADR Plan at: http://www.tnwd.uscourts.gov/pdf/content/ADRPlan.pdf (jae)
August 4, 2020 Filing 3 NOTICE OF CASE TRACKING ASSIGNMENT PURSUANT TO LOCAL RULE 16.2: Pursuant to Local Rule 16.2, this case has been assigned to the Standard track. http://www.tnwd.uscourts.gov/pdf/content/LocalRules.pdf (jae)
August 3, 2020 Filing 2 Judge Sheryl H. Lipman and Magistrate Unassigned 7. (jae). Modified on 8/4/2020 to show "unassigned magistrate judge" (jae).
August 3, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Golden Title Loans LLC (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number ATNWDC-3403558), filed by Danita Higgs. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons, #3 Exhibit A to Complaint)(Garrison, David)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Tennessee Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Higgs v. Golden Title Loans LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Golden Title Loans LLC agent of d/b/a "745 Cash"
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Danita Higgs
Represented By: David W. Garrison
Represented By: Max Morgan
Represented By: Eric H Weitz
Represented By: Joshua Art Frank
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?