Boothe v. Hankins et al
Plaintiff: Brett Boothe
Defendant: M&A Transport, LLC and Michael Hankins
Not Classified By Court: Temiika Gipson
Case Number: 2:2020cv02573
Filed: August 6, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Tennessee
Presiding Judge: Charmiane G Claxton
Referring Judge: Jon Phipps McCalla
Nature of Suit: Motor Vehicle
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 17, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 17, 2020 Filing 14 NOTICE by Brett Boothe Notice of Service of Initial Disclosures (Martin, Bobby)
September 9, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 13 SCHEDULING ORDER. Signed by Judge Jon Phipps McCalla on 9/9/2020. (pa)
September 3, 2020 Filing 12 SETTING LETTER: The Jury Trial is set for Monday, 7/26/2021 at 9:30 AM before Judge Jon Phipps McCalla. The Pretrial Conference is set for Friday, 7/16/2021 at 9:30 AM before Judge Jon Phipps McCalla. The Proposed Joint Pretrial Order is due by 4:30 PM on 7/7/2021. (jrs)
September 3, 2020 Filing 11 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Jon Phipps McCalla: Telephonic Scheduling Conference held on 9/3/2020. Bobby Martin, Jr. appeared for the Plaintiff. Carl Wyatt appeared for the Defendant. Case background and preliminary information reviewed. Court set the schedule with deadlines. The Jury Trial is set for Monday, 7/26/2021 at 9:30 AM in Courtroom 7 - Memphis before Judge Jon Phipps McCalla. The Trial is estimated to last 3-4 days. The Pretrial Conference is set for Friday, 7/16/2021 at 9:30 AM in Courtroom 7 - Memphis before Judge Jon Phipps McCalla. The Proposed Joint Pretrial Order is due by 4:30 p.m. on 7/7/2021. A Scheduling Order will be entered. (Court Reporter: Kristi Heasley) (jrs)
September 1, 2020 Filing 10 REPORT of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting . (Wyatt, Carl)
August 13, 2020 Filing 9 ANSWER to Complaint with Jury Demand by Michael Hankins, M&A Transport, LLC.(Wyatt, Carl)
August 6, 2020 Filing 8 SETTING LETTER: A Telephonic Scheduling Conference is set for Thursday, 9/3/2020 at 2:30 PM before Judge Jon Phipps McCalla. To access the telephonic conference parties will dial 888-675-2535 and enter access code 7360481. Please call at least 5 minutes in advance of the conference time. (jrs)
August 6, 2020 Filing 7 NOTICE OF RIGHT TO CONSENT TO THE EXERCISE OF CIVIL JURISDICTION BY A MAGISTRATE JUDGE Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 636(c), Fed.R.Civ.P.73, and Local Rule 72.1, this Court has designated the Magistrate Judges of this District to conduct trials and otherwise dispose of any civil case that is filed in this Court. Your decision to consent, or not consent, to the referral of your case to a United States Magistrate Judge for trial and entry of a final judgment must be entirely voluntary. The judge or magistrate judge to whom the case has been assigned will not be informed of your decision unless all parties agree that the case may be referred to a magistrate judge for these specific purposes. A less than unanimous decision will not be communicated by this office to either the judge or magistrate judge. The consent form is available on the courts website at https://www.tnwd.uscourts.gov/forms-and-applications.php (jae)
August 6, 2020 Filing 6 NOTICE TO COMPLY WITH PLAN FOR ALTERNATE DISPUTE RESOLUTION (ADR): Pursuant to Section to 2.1 of the ADR Plan, all civil cases filed on or after Sept. 1, 2014, shall be referred automatically for ADR. For compliance requirements, refer to the ADR Plan at: http://www.tnwd.uscourts.gov/pdf/content/ADRPlan.pdf (jae)
August 6, 2020 Filing 5 NOTICE OF CASE TRACKING ASSIGNMENT PURSUANT TO LOCAL RULE 16.2: Pursuant to Local Rule 16.2, this case has been assigned to the Standard track. http://www.tnwd.uscourts.gov/pdf/content/LocalRules.pdf (jae)
August 6, 2020 Filing 4 Judge Jon Phipps McCalla and Magistrate Judge Charmiane G. Claxton added. (jae)
August 6, 2020 Filing 3 Corporate Disclosure Statement by M&A Transport, LLC. (Wyatt, Carl)
August 6, 2020 Filing 2 NOTICE of Appearance by Carl Wyatt on behalf of Michael Hankins, M&A Transport, LLC (Wyatt, Carl)
August 6, 2020 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by M&A Transport, LLC, Michael Hankins from Shelby County Circuit, case number CT-2282-20 (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number ATNWDC-3406628), filed by M&A Transport, LLC, Michael Hankins. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit State Court Complaint)(Wyatt, Carl)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Tennessee Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Boothe v. Hankins et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Brett Boothe
Represented By: Bobby F. Martin, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: M&A Transport, LLC
Represented By: Carl Wyatt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Michael Hankins
Represented By: Carl Wyatt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Not classified by court: Temiika Gipson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?