United States of America v. Arberg
Plaintiff: United States of America
Defendant: Lee Bradford Arberg
Garnishee: Bearpaw Partners LLC
Case Number: 2:2020cv02585
Filed: August 11, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Tennessee
Presiding Judge: Annie T Christoff
Referring Judge: Jon Phipps McCalla
Nature of Suit: Contract: Recovery/Enforcement
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1345
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 24, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 24, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER ADMINISTRATIVELY CLOSING CASE. Signed by Judge Jon Phipps McCalla on 9/24/2020. (joj)
September 23, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER OF GARNISHMENT. Signed by Judge Jon Phipps McCalla on 9/23/2020. (joj)
August 25, 2020 Filing 5 ANSWER to Writ of Garnishment by Bearpaw Partners LLC. (Attachments: #1 envelope)(jae)
August 13, 2020 Filing 4 Pursuant to Admin. Order 2020-31 referral judge reassigned to Magistrate Judge Annie T. Christoff. (cdi)
August 11, 2020 Filing 3 WRIT OF GARNISHMENT issued (jae)
August 11, 2020 Filing 2 Judge Jon Phipps McCalla and Judge Unassigned 7 added. (jae)
August 11, 2020 Filing 1 APPLICATION for Writ of Garnishment (PLEASE ISSUE), filed by United States of America. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Fondren, Reagan)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Tennessee Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: United States of America v. Arberg
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Garnishee: Bearpaw Partners LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lee Bradford Arberg
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: United States of America
Represented By: Reagan Fondren
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?