Bond et al v. Parks et al
Plaintiff: David Taylor and Harvey Bond
Defendant: Lakeisha Parks and EAN Holdings, LLC doing business as Enterprise Rent-A-Car
Not Classified By Court: Clerk Temiika Gipson
Case Number: 2:2020cv02620
Filed: August 19, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Tennessee
Presiding Judge: Annie T Christoff
Referring Judge: Annie T Christoff
2 Judge: Mark S Norris
Nature of Suit: Motor Vehicle
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 28, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 28, 2020 Filing 9 ANSWER to Complaint with Jury Demand by EAN Holdings, LLC.(Curry, Edward)
August 26, 2020 Filing 8 SETTING LETTER: Scheduling Conference set for Friday, 11/06/2020 at 09:30 AM in Courtroom 4 - Memphis before Judge Mark S. Norris. (zsf)
August 26, 2020 Filing 7 ANSWER to Complaint with Jury Demand by Lakeisha Parks.(Overstreet, Tracy)
August 19, 2020 Filing 6 NOTICE of Appearance by William David Darnell on behalf of Lakeisha Parks (Darnell, William)
August 19, 2020 Filing 5 NOTICE OF RIGHT TO CONSENT TO THE EXERCISE OF CIVIL JURISDICTION BY A MAGISTRATE JUDGE Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 636(c), Fed.R.Civ.P.73, and Local Rule 72.1, this Court has designated the Magistrate Judges of this District to conduct trials and otherwise dispose of any civil case that is filed in this Court. Your decision to consent, or not consent, to the referral of your case to a United States Magistrate Judge for trial and entry of a final judgment must be entirely voluntary. The judge or magistrate judge to whom the case has been assigned will not be informed of your decision unless all parties agree that the case may be referred to a magistrate judge for these specific purposes. A less than unanimous decision will not be communicated by this office to either the judge or magistrate judge. The consent form is available on the courts website at https://www.tnwd.uscourts.gov/forms-and-applications.php (jld)
August 19, 2020 Filing 4 NOTICE TO COMPLY WITH PLAN FOR ALTERNATE DISPUTE RESOLUTION (ADR): Pursuant to Section to 2.1 of the ADR Plan, all civil cases filed on or after Sept. 1, 2014, shall be referred automatically for ADR. For compliance requirements, refer to the ADR Plan at: http://www.tnwd.uscourts.gov/pdf/content/ADRPlan.pdf (jld)
August 19, 2020 Filing 3 NOTICE OF CASE TRACKING ASSIGNMENT PURSUANT TO LOCAL RULE 16.2: Pursuant to Local Rule 16.2, this case has been assigned to the Standard track. http://www.tnwd.uscourts.gov/pdf/content/LocalRules.pdf (jld)
August 19, 2020 Filing 2 Judge Mark S. Norris and Magistrate Judge Annie T Christoff added. (jld)
August 19, 2020 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Lakeisha Parks from Circuit Court of Shelby County, TN, case number CT-2412-20, Div. II (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number ATNWDC-3416078), filed by Lakeisha Parks. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit Exhibit "A" Complaint)(Overstreet, Tracy)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Tennessee Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Bond et al v. Parks et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lakeisha Parks
Represented By: Tracy A. Overstreet
Represented By: William David Darnell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: EAN Holdings, LLC doing business as Enterprise Rent-A-Car
Represented By: Edward Inman Curry, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: David Taylor
Represented By: Murray B. Wells
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Harvey Bond
Represented By: Murray B. Wells
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Not classified by court: Clerk Temiika Gipson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?