McNeil v. United States of America
Petitioner: Mario McNeil
Respondent: United States of America
Case Number: 2:2020cv02628
Filed: August 19, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Tennessee
Presiding Judge: Thomas L Parker
Referring Judge: Tu M Pham
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Vacate Sentence
Cause of Action: 28:2255
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 23, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 23, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 6 [**TEXT ORDER ONLY--NO DOCUMENT ATTACHED**] Respondent moves for an extension of time--specifically through October 21, 2020--to respond to Petitioner's 2255 claims. (See ECF No. #5 .) Respondent argues the additional time is necessary for Respondent to "respond adequately" to Petitioner's complaint. (Id.) For good cause shown, the Court GRANTS Respondent's motion. Respondent shall have through October 21, 2020, to file its answer. Signed by Judge Thomas L. Parker on 09/23/2020. (ljt)
September 21, 2020 Filing 5 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #3 Order of Reference, #1 Pro Se Complaint, with proposed Order submitted by United States of America. (Whitmore, Kevin)
August 26, 2020 Filing 4 NOTICE of Appearance by Kevin Patrick Whitmore on behalf of United States of America (Whitmore, Kevin)
August 24, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER DIRECTING THE UNITED STATES TO RESPOND. Signed by Judge Thomas L. Parker on 08/24/2020. (ljt)
August 19, 2020 Filing 2 NOTICE OF CASE TRACKING ASSIGNMENT PURSUANT TO LOCAL RULE 16.2: Pursuant to Local Rule 16.2, this case has been assigned to the Pro Se Prisoner track. http://www.tnwd.uscourts.gov/pdf/content/LocalRules.pdf (csf)
August 19, 2020 Filing 1 PRO SE Motion Under 28 U.S.C. 2255 to Vacate, Set Aside or Correct Sentence filed by Mario McNeil against United States of America. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support, #2 Exhibit 1(A) Partial Transcript, #3 Exhibit 1(B) Indictment, #4 Envelope, #5 Judicial Cards)(csf)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Tennessee Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: McNeil v. United States of America
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Mario McNeil
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: United States of America
Represented By: 2255 AUSA
Represented By: Kevin Patrick Whitmore
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?