Daniels et al v. Farm Credit Leasing Services, Corp. et al
Plaintiff: Jeffrey Daniels and David Woodard
Defendant: Diversified Financial Services, Barrett Kranz, Co-Bank, Farm Credit Leasing Services, Corp. and Bob Bimson
Case Number: 2:2020cv02632
Filed: August 20, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Tennessee
Presiding Judge: Sheryl H Lipman
Referring Judge: Tu M Pham
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 18 U.S.C. ยง 1962
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 16, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 16, 2020 Filing 45 NOTICE of Appearance by Danny Parish on behalf of All Plaintiffs (Parish, Danny)
October 14, 2020 Filing 44 COURTESY NOTICE: Pursuant to Rule 5 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure, document #42 Notice (Other) filed by Co-Bank, Bob Bimson, Farm Credit Leasing Services, Corp., Barrett Kranz has been filed. For future reference, please note: Proposed scheduling orders should be emailed to chambers. The Rule 26F meeting is published on CM/ECF. Please refer to the #ECF User Manual and #ECF Policies and Procedures. Filer is not required to resubmit document. (jae)
October 14, 2020 Filing 43 COURTESY NOTICE: Pursuant to Rule 5 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure, document #41 MOTION to Stay Discovery and Other Rule 16 and 26 Requirements filed by Co-Bank, Bob Bimson, Farm Credit Leasing Services, Corp., Barrett Kranz has been filed. For future reference, please note: Filer failed to indicate in the docket text "proposed order submitted". If no order previously emailed to chambers, please do so upon receipt of this notice. Please refer to the #ECF User Manual and #ECF Policies and Procedures. Filer is not required to resubmit document. (jae)
October 13, 2020 Filing 42 NOTICE by Bob Bimson, Co-Bank, Farm Credit Leasing Services, Corp., Barrett Kranz of Filing Proposed Scheduling Order (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2)(Scavotto, Andrew)
October 13, 2020 Filing 41 MOTION to Stay Discovery and Other Rule 16 and 26 Requirements by Bob Bimson, Co-Bank, Farm Credit Leasing Services, Corp., Barrett Kranz. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum)(Scavotto, Andrew)
October 12, 2020 Filing 40 AFFIDAVIT re #38 MOTION to Dismiss and Abstain of Brian Kelley by Diversified Financial Services. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Logue, Gregory)
October 12, 2020 Filing 39 AFFIDAVIT re #38 MOTION to Dismiss and Abstain of Gregory C. Logue by Diversified Financial Services. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C - Part 1 of 3, #4 Exhibit C - Part 2 of 3, #5 Exhibit C - Part 3 of 3, #6 Exhibit D, #7 Exhibit E, #8 Exhibit F, #9 Exhibit G, #10 Exhibit H, #11 Exhibit I)(Logue, Gregory)
October 12, 2020 Filing 38 MOTION to Dismiss and Abstain by Diversified Financial Services. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum)(Logue, Gregory)
October 12, 2020 Filing 37 MEMORANDUM in Support re #36 MOTION to Dismiss filed by Bob Bimson, Co-Bank, Farm Credit Leasing Services, Corp., Barrett Kranz. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2)(Scavotto, Andrew)
October 12, 2020 Filing 36 MOTION to Dismiss by Bob Bimson, Co-Bank, Farm Credit Leasing Services, Corp., Barrett Kranz. (Scavotto, Andrew)
October 9, 2020 Filing 35 NOTICE by Jeffrey Daniels, David Woodard Notice of Pre-Existing Civil Judgement and Pending Related Case (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A (Restitution Order/Civil Judgement), #2 Exhibit B (Petition to Modify Restitution Order)(Lofton, Daniel)
September 14, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 34 ORDER GRANTING DEFENDANTS' MOTION TO CONTINUE SCHEDULING CONFERENCE #30 . Signed by Judge Sheryl H. Lipman on 9/14/20. (shl)
September 14, 2020 Filing 33 NOTICE by Jeffrey Daniels, David Woodard NOTICE OF HOSTED RULE 26(f) MEETING, ANTICIPATORY CANCELLATION BY DEFENDANTS, AND SERVICE OF RULE 26(f) E-DISCOVERY CHECKLIST (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A [Rule 26(f) E-Discovery Checklist])(Lofton, Daniel)
September 14, 2020 Filing 32 NOTICE by Jeffrey Daniels, David Woodard NOTICE OF SERVICE OF SUBPOENA FOR CRIMINAL FILE OF CHARLES SCHINDLER; AGREED RESPONSE DATE: 09/25/2020 (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A (Subpoena), #2 Exhibit B (Touhy Letter))(Lofton, Daniel)
September 11, 2020 Filing 31 COURTESY NOTICE: Pursuant to Rule 5 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure, document #30 MOTION to Continue Defendants' Motion to Continue Scheduling Conference filed by Co-Bank, Bob Bimson, Farm Credit Leasing Services, Corp., Diversified Financial Services, Barrett Kranz has been filed. For future reference, please note: Filer failed to indicate in the docket text "proposed order submitted". If no order previously emailed to chambers, please do so upon receipt of this notice. Please refer to the #ECF User Manual and #ECF Policies and Procedures. Filer is not required to resubmit document. (jae)
September 10, 2020 Filing 30 MOTION to Continue Defendants' Motion to Continue Scheduling Conference by All Defendants. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum)(Shelton, Henry)
September 10, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 29 ORDER granting #28 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. [**TEXT ORDER ONLY--NO IMAGE ATTACHED.**] Signed by Judge Sheryl H. Lipman on 9/10/20. (Lipman, Sheryl)
September 10, 2020 Filing 28 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice (proposed order submitted) (Filing fee $ 150 receipt number ATNWDC-3433614) by Farm Credit Leasing Services Corporation, CoBank, Bob Bimson and Bernard Kranz. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit State of MO Cert. of Good Standing, #2 Exhibit EDMO Cert. of Good Standing)(Scavotto, Andrew) Modified on 9/10/2020 to correct filers and docket text (cdi).
September 10, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 27 ORDER GRANTING DEFENDANT DIVERSIFIED FINANCIAL SERVICES, LLC'S MOTION FOR ADDITIONAL TIME #26 . Signed by Judge Sheryl H. Lipman on 9/10/20. (shl)
September 4, 2020 Filing 26 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint, proposed Order submitted, by Diversified Financial Services. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Logue, Gregory)
September 4, 2020 Filing 25 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Diversified Financial Services identifying Corporate Parent Lauritzen Corporation for Diversified Financial Services.. (Logue, Gregory)
September 2, 2020 Filing 24 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Jeffrey Daniels, David Woodard as to Barrett Kranz. (Lofton, Daniel)
September 1, 2020 Filing 23 NOTICE by Jeffrey Daniels, David Woodard NOTICE OF SERVICE OF REQUEST FOR E-DISCOVERY INFORMATION PURSUANT TO L.R. 26.1(e) and REQUEST FOR LITIGATION HOLD (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A (E-Discovery / Litigation Hold Letter))(Lofton, Daniel)
August 31, 2020 Filing 22 NOTICE of Appearance by Gregory C. Logue on behalf of Diversified Financial Services (Logue, Gregory)
August 31, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 21 ORDER GRANTING DEFENDANTS' MOTION #18 FOR ADDITIONAL TIME TO RESPOND TO PLAINTIFF'S COMPLAINT. Signed by Judge Sheryl H. Lipman on 8/31/20. (shl)
August 28, 2020 Filing 20 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Farm Credit Leasing Services, Corp. identifying Corporate Parent Co-Bank for Farm Credit Leasing Services, Corp... (Shelton, Henry)
August 28, 2020 Filing 19 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Co-Bank. (Shelton, Henry)
August 28, 2020 Filing 18 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint, proposed order submitted by Bob Bimson, Co-Bank, Farm Credit Leasing Services, Corp., Barrett Kranz. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1)(Shelton, Henry)
August 28, 2020 Filing 17 SETTING LETTER: Scheduling Conference set for Thursday, October 1, 2020 at 1:30 PM in Courtroom 1 - Memphis before Judge Sheryl H. Lipman. The proceeding will be done via Skype for Business video conference. The Court will email the parties an invitation for the video conference prior to the proceeding.Counsel should submit any exhibits to be offered to the Judge's ECF mailbox prior to the proceeding.The public may also access the video proceeding. If the public and/or media wish to attend in the video proceeding, please click on the following link to request access information: #https://www.tnwd.uscourts.gov/videohearings The access information will be delivered via email to the email address from which the request originated.Parties shall consult the #Skype for Business webpage for instructions on downloading the proper extensions for their computer.Please email Sandra McClain at sandra_mcclain@tnwd.uscourts.gov for any questions. (smm)
August 28, 2020 Filing 16 DEFICIENCY NOTICE: Pursuant to Rule 5 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure, document #15 Notice of Appearance filed by Co-Bank, Bob Bimson, Farm Credit Leasing Services, Corp., Barrett Kranz has been filed. However, the following deficiency has been found: The court cannot make a ruling on a "notice of appearance". The motion included in the notice of appearance must be submitted as a separate pleading in order for chambers to rule on the request. Please refer to the #ECF User Manual and #ECF Policies and Procedures. The filer has one business day to correct the deficiency. (jae)
August 27, 2020 Filing 15 NOTICE of Appearance by Henry C. Shelton, III on behalf of Bob Bimson, Co-Bank, Farm Credit Leasing Services, Corp., Barrett Kranz (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1)(Shelton, Henry)
August 26, 2020 Filing 14 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Jeffrey Daniels, David Woodard as to Diversified Financial Services. (Lofton, Daniel)
August 26, 2020 Filing 13 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Jeffrey Daniels, David Woodard as to Bob Bimson. (Lofton, Daniel)
August 20, 2020 Filing 12 Summons Issued as to Farm Credit Leasing Services, Corp.. The filer has been notified electronically that the summons has been issued, and the new docket entry reflects this. Upon notification of the new docket entry, the filer is to print the issued summons in order to effect service. (jld)
August 20, 2020 Filing 11 Summons Issued as to Diversified Financial Services. The filer has been notified electronically that the summons has been issued, and the new docket entry reflects this. Upon notification of the new docket entry, the filer is to print the issued summons in order to effect service. (jld)
August 20, 2020 Filing 10 Summons Issued as to Co-Bank. The filer has been notified electronically that the summons has been issued, and the new docket entry reflects this. Upon notification of the new docket entry, the filer is to print the issued summons in order to effect service. (jld)
August 20, 2020 Filing 9 Summons Issued as to Barrett Kranz. The filer has been notified electronically that the summons has been issued, and the new docket entry reflects this. Upon notification of the new docket entry, the filer is to print the issued summons in order to effect service. (jld)
August 20, 2020 Filing 8 Summons Issued as to Bob Bimson. The filer has been notified electronically that the summons has been issued, and the new docket entry reflects this. Upon notification of the new docket entry, the filer is to print the issued summons in order to effect service. (jld)
August 20, 2020 Filing 7 NOTICE OF RIGHT TO CONSENT TO THE EXERCISE OF CIVIL JURISDICTION BY A MAGISTRATE JUDGE Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 636(c), Fed.R.Civ.P.73, and Local Rule 72.1, this Court has designated the Magistrate Judges of this District to conduct trials and otherwise dispose of any civil case that is filed in this Court. Your decision to consent, or not consent, to the referral of your case to a United States Magistrate Judge for trial and entry of a final judgment must be entirely voluntary. The judge or magistrate judge to whom the case has been assigned will not be informed of your decision unless all parties agree that the case may be referred to a magistrate judge for these specific purposes. A less than unanimous decision will not be communicated by this office to either the judge or magistrate judge. The consent form is available on the courts website at https://www.tnwd.uscourts.gov/forms-and-applications.php (jld)
August 20, 2020 Filing 6 NOTICE TO COMPLY WITH PLAN FOR ALTERNATE DISPUTE RESOLUTION (ADR): Pursuant to Section to 2.1 of the ADR Plan, all civil cases filed on or after Sept. 1, 2014, shall be referred automatically for ADR. For compliance requirements, refer to the ADR Plan at: http://www.tnwd.uscourts.gov/pdf/content/ADRPlan.pdf (jld)
August 20, 2020 Filing 5 NOTICE OF CASE TRACKING ASSIGNMENT PURSUANT TO LOCAL RULE 16.2: Pursuant to Local Rule 16.2, this case has been assigned to the Standard track. http://www.tnwd.uscourts.gov/pdf/content/LocalRules.pdf (jld)
August 20, 2020 Filing 4 COURTESY NOTICE: Pursuant to Rule 5 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure, document #1 Complaint, filed by Jeffrey Daniels, David Woodard has been filed.Please note Civil cover sheet missing your s/signature. Please refer to the #ECF User Manual and #ECF Policies and Procedures. (jld)
August 20, 2020 Filing 3 Judge Sheryl H. Lipman and Chief Magistrate Judge Tu M. Pham added. (jld)
August 20, 2020 Filing 2 NOTICE of Summons by Daniel Owen Lofton on behalf of Jeffrey Daniels, David Woodard. (Attachments: #1 Summons, #2 Summons, #3 Summons, #4 Summons)(Lofton, Daniel)
August 20, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number ATNWDC-3418040), filed by Jeffrey Daniels, David Woodard. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit A (Schindler Indictment), #3 Exhibit B (Lauderdal County Sheriff's Report), #4 Exhibit C (Report from D. Fahr Manufacturer), #5 Exhibit Exhibit D and E (Leasing Agreement and UCC-1 Filing), #6 Exhibit F (Hardi Report))(Lofton, Daniel)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Tennessee Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Daniels et al v. Farm Credit Leasing Services, Corp. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Diversified Financial Services
Represented By: Gregory C. Logue
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Barrett Kranz
Represented By: Andrew Scavotto
Represented By: Henry C. Shelton, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Co-Bank
Represented By: Andrew Scavotto
Represented By: Henry C. Shelton, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Farm Credit Leasing Services, Corp.
Represented By: Andrew Scavotto
Represented By: Henry C. Shelton, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bob Bimson
Represented By: Andrew Scavotto
Represented By: Henry C. Shelton, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jeffrey Daniels
Represented By: Daniel Owen Lofton
Represented By: Danny Parish
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: David Woodard
Represented By: Daniel Owen Lofton
Represented By: Danny Parish
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?