Williams v. Mancini, et al
Plaintiff: Marion LaTroy Williams
Defendant: Mary Mancini, Linda Phillips and Mark Goins
Case Number: 2:2020cv02715
Filed: September 24, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Tennessee
Presiding Judge: Annie T Christoff
Referring Judge: Mark S Norris
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Voting
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1981
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 31, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 19, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 10 MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney by Marion LaTroy Williams. (Robinson, Paul)
October 28, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER DENYING #8 PLAINTIFF'S PRO SE EMERGENCY MOTION FOR TEMPORARY RESTRAINING ORDER WITHOUT PREJUDICE. Signed by Judge Mark S. Norris on 10/28/2020. (Norris, Mark)
October 27, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 8 PRO SE EMERGENCY MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order by Marion LaTroy Williams. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit)(jae)
September 24, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 7 NOTICE by Marion LaTroy Williams re #1 Complaint, Exhibits (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit D, #2 Exhibit Exhibit C)(Robinson, Paul)
September 24, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 6 Summons Issued as to Mark Goins, Mary Mancini, Linda Phillips. The filer has been notified electronically that the summons has been issued, and the new docket entry reflects this. Upon notification of the new docket entry, the filer is to print the issued summons in order to effect service. (Attachments: #1 summons, #2 summons)(jae)
September 24, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 5 NOTICE OF RIGHT TO CONSENT TO THE EXERCISE OF CIVIL JURISDICTION BY A MAGISTRATE JUDGE Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 636(c), Fed.R.Civ.P.73, and Local Rule 72.1, this Court has designated the Magistrate Judges of this District to conduct trials and otherwise dispose of any civil case that is filed in this Court. Your decision to consent, or not consent, to the referral of your case to a United States Magistrate Judge for trial and entry of a final judgment must be entirely voluntary. The judge or magistrate judge to whom the case has been assigned will not be informed of your decision unless all parties agree that the case may be referred to a magistrate judge for these specific purposes. A less than unanimous decision will not be communicated by this office to either the judge or magistrate judge. The consent form is available on the courts website at https://www.tnwd.uscourts.gov/forms-and-applications.php (jae)
September 24, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 4 NOTICE TO COMPLY WITH PLAN FOR ALTERNATE DISPUTE RESOLUTION (ADR): Pursuant to Section to 2.1 of the ADR Plan, all civil cases filed on or after Sept. 1, 2014, shall be referred automatically for ADR. For compliance requirements, refer to the ADR Plan at: http://www.tnwd.uscourts.gov/pdf/content/ADRPlan.pdf (jae)
September 24, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 3 NOTICE OF CASE TRACKING ASSIGNMENT PURSUANT TO LOCAL RULE 16.2: Pursuant to Local Rule 16.2, this case has been assigned to the Standard track. http://www.tnwd.uscourts.gov/pdf/content/LocalRules.pdf (jae)
September 24, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 2 Judge Mark S. Norris and Magistrate Judge Annie T. Christoff added. (jae)
September 24, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants, filed by All Plaintiffs ($400 filing fee - Rec# ATNWDC 3444336) . (Attachments: #1 Summons, #2 Summons, #3 Summons, #4 Civil Cover Sheet)(Robinson, Paul) Modified on 9/24/2020 to add payment information (jae).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Tennessee Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Williams v. Mancini, et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mary Mancini
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Linda Phillips
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mark Goins
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Marion LaTroy Williams
Represented By: Paul Anthony Robinson, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?