Baker et al v. Smith et al
Plaintiff: Alexander Baker, Jr. and Jennifer Baker
Defendant: New Prime, Inc., Khaleele Smith and Scott Peatross
Not Classified By Court: Clerk Temiika Gipson
Case Number: 2:2020cv02716
Filed: September 24, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Tennessee
Presiding Judge: Charmiane G Claxton
Referring Judge: Thomas L Parker
Nature of Suit: Motor Vehicle
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 18, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 18, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 23 [**TEXT ORDER ONLY--NO DOCUMENT ATTACHED**] Plaintiffs move for an extension of time--specifically, until January 17, 2021--to serve Defendant Khaleele J. Smith. (ECF Nos. #21 & #22 .) Plaintiffs request this extension because they have had difficulty locating Defendant Smith. (ECF No. #22 at PageID 122.) Defendants do not oppose the motion. (Id. at PageID 122-23.) For good cause shown, the Court GRANTS Plaintiffs' motion. Plaintiffs have until January 17, 2021, to serve Defendant Smith. Signed by Judge Thomas L. Parker on 11/18/2020. (ljt)
November 18, 2020 Filing 22 Amended MOTION for Extension of Time to Serve Defendant Smith (Proposed Order Submitted) by All Plaintiffs. (Rosenblum, Jeffrey)
November 17, 2020 Filing 21 MOTION for Extension of Time to Serve Defendant Smith (Proposed Order Submitted) by Alexander Baker, Jr, Jennifer Baker. (Rosenblum, Jeffrey)
November 10, 2020 Filing 20 NOTICE of Appearance by Hal S. Spragins, Jr on behalf of Scott Peatross (Spragins, Hal)
November 5, 2020 Filing 19 AFFIDAVIT of Service for Summons in a Civil Action served on Scott Peatross as Administrator Ad Litem of the Estate of Latricia Taylor, Deceased on 10/27/2020, filed by Alexander Baker, Jr. (Rosenblum, Jeffrey)
October 26, 2020 Filing 18 ANSWER to Complaint with Jury Demand First Amended Complaint by New Prime, Inc..(Tarpley, John)
October 26, 2020 Filing 17 DEFICIENCY NOTICE: Pursuant to Rule 5 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure, document #16 Answer to Amended Complaint filed by New Prime, Inc. has been filed. However, the following deficiency has been found: the CM/ECF user name does not match the electronic signature. Please refer to the #ECF User Manual and #ECF Policies and Procedures. The filer has one business day to correct the deficiency. (agj)
October 23, 2020 Filing 16 Answer of Defendant New Prime, Inc. ANSWER to #12 Amended Complaint First Amended Complaint by New Prime, Inc..(Tarpley, John)
October 23, 2020 Filing 15 Summons Issued as to Khaleele Smith. The filer has been notified electronically that the summons has been issued, and the new docket entry reflects this. Upon notification of the new docket entry, the filer is to print the issued summons in order to effect service. (agj)
October 22, 2020 Filing 14 NOTICE of Summons by Jeffrey S. Rosenblum on behalf of All Plaintiffs. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(Rosenblum, Jeffrey)
October 13, 2020 Filing 13 Summons Issued as to Scott Peatross. The filer has been notified electronically that the summons has been issued, and the new docket entry reflects this. Upon notification of the new docket entry, the filer is to print the issued summons in order to effect service. (agj)
October 9, 2020 Filing 12 AMENDED COMPLAINT against All Defendants All Defendants., filed by All Plaintiffs. (Attachments: #1 Summons Scott Peatross)(Rosenblum, Jeffrey)
October 5, 2020 Filing 11 NOTICE of Appearance by Matthew Thomas May on behalf of All Plaintiffs (May, Matthew)
October 1, 2020 Filing 10 NOTICE of Appearance by John R. Tarpley on behalf of New Prime, Inc. (Tarpley, John)
October 1, 2020 Filing 9 ANSWER to Complaint with Jury Demand by New Prime, Inc..(Chapman, David)
September 24, 2020 Filing 8 Corporate Disclosure Statement by New Prime, Inc.. (Chapman, David)
September 24, 2020 Filing 7 NOTICE by New Prime, Inc. re 6 Deficiency Notice,, (Chapman, David)
September 24, 2020 Filing 6 DEFICIENCY NOTICE: Pursuant to Rule 5 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure, document #1 Notice of Removal, filed by New Prime, Inc. has been filed. However, the following deficiency has been found: The attorney filing the removal and the attorney who signed the removal do not match. A attorney's login and password are part of the attorney's electronic signature. Please refer to the #ECF User Manual and #ECF Policies and Procedures. The filer has one business day to correct the deficiency. (jld)
September 24, 2020 Filing 5 NOTICE TO COMPLY WITH PLAN FOR ALTERNATE DISPUTE RESOLUTION (ADR): Pursuant to Section to 2.1 of the ADR Plan, all civil cases filed on or after Sept. 1, 2014, shall be referred automatically for ADR. For compliance requirements, refer to the ADR Plan at: http://www.tnwd.uscourts.gov/pdf/content/ADRPlan.pdf (jld)
September 24, 2020 Filing 4 NOTICE TO COMPLY WITH PLAN FOR ALTERNATE DISPUTE RESOLUTION (ADR): Pursuant to Section to 2.1 of the ADR Plan, all civil cases filed on or after Sept. 1, 2014, shall be referred automatically for ADR. For compliance requirements, refer to the ADR Plan at: http://www.tnwd.uscourts.gov/pdf/content/ADRPlan.pdf (jld)
September 24, 2020 Filing 3 NOTICE OF CASE TRACKING ASSIGNMENT PURSUANT TO LOCAL RULE 16.2: Pursuant to Local Rule 16.2, this case has been assigned to the Standard track. http://www.tnwd.uscourts.gov/pdf/content/LocalRules.pdf (jld)
September 24, 2020 Filing 2 Judge Thomas L. Parker and Magistrate Judge Charmiane G. Claxton added. (jld)
September 24, 2020 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by New Prime, Inc. from Shelby County Circuit Court, case number CT-3418-20 (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number ATNWDC-3444484), filed by New Prime, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit)(Chapman, David)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Tennessee Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Baker et al v. Smith et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: New Prime, Inc.
Represented By: David Allen Chapman
Represented By: John R. Tarpley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Khaleele Smith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Scott Peatross
Represented By: Hal S. Spragins, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Not classified by court: Clerk Temiika Gipson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Alexander Baker, Jr.
Represented By: Jeffrey S. Rosenblum
Represented By: Matthew Thomas May
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jennifer Baker
Represented By: Jeffrey S. Rosenblum
Represented By: Matthew Thomas May
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?