Chester Adams v. Felipe Martinez, Jr.
Petitioner: Chester Adams
Respondent: Felipe Martinez, Jr.
Case Number: 2:2020cv02738
Filed: September 30, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Tennessee
Presiding Judge: Annie T Christoff
Referring Judge: Sheryl H Lipman
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Vacate Sentence
Cause of Action: 28:2255
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 1, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 1, 2020 Filing 7 NOTICE OF CASE TRACKING ASSIGNMENT PURSUANT TO LOCAL RULE 16.2: Pursuant to Local Rule 16.2, this case has been assigned to the Pro Se Prisoner track. http://www.tnwd.uscourts.gov/pdf/content/LocalRules.pdf (jae)
October 1, 2020 Filing 6 Case transferred in from District of California Central; Case Number 2:20-cv-05060. Original file certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received. (Additional attachment(s) added on 10/1/2020: #2 Judicial assignment card) (jae).
September 29, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER (1) AMENDING AND RECHARACTERIZING AMENDED PETITION AS 28 U.S.C. 2255 MOTION; AND (2) TRANSFERRING ACTION TO U.S. DISTRICT COURT FOR THE WESTERN DISTRICT OF TENNESSEE by Judge Philip S. Gutierrez. (MD JS-6. Case Terminated.) (es) [Transferred from California Central on 10/1/2020.]
September 15, 2020 Filing 4 RESPONSE to Document No. 3 Entered on 8/26/2020 filed 8/25/2020 Requesting this Matter to be Transferred to Western District of Tennessee in its Original Form with the Following Added Arguments and Recharacterized as a Section 2255 filed by Petitioner Chester Adams(es) [Transferred from California Central on 10/1/2020.]
August 25, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 3 NOTICE OF INTENT TO RECHARACTERIZE PETITION AS 28 U.S.C. 2255 MOTION AND TO TRANSFER ACTION TO U.S. DISTRICT COURT FOR THE WESTERN DISTRICT OF TENNESSEE, CAUTIONING PETITIONER REGARDING THE SAME, AND AFFORDING HIM OPPORTUNITY TO WITHDRAW PETITION OR TO AMEND PETITION PRIOR TO TRANSFER ORDER DIRECTING PETITIONER TO FILE RESPONSE by Judge Phillip S. Gutierrez. *See document for details.* (es) [Transferred from California Central on 10/1/2020.]
June 8, 2020 Filing 2 NOTICE OF REFERENCE to a U.S. Magistrate Judge. This case has been assigned to the calendar of the Honorable District Judge Philip S. Gutierrez and referred to Magistrate Judge Jacqueline Chooljian, who is authorized to consider preliminary matters and conduct all further hearings as may be appropriate or necessary. Pursuant to Local Rule 83-2.4, the Court must be notified within five (5) days of any address change. See notice for additional details. (Attachments: #1 CV-111) (lh) [Transferred from California Central on 10/1/2020.]
June 8, 2020 Filing 1 PETITION for Writ of Habeas Corpus by a Person In Federal Custody (28:2241). Case assigned to Judge Philip S. Gutierrez and referred to Magistrate Judge Jacqueline Chooljian. (Filing Fee $5 Due), filed by Petitioner Chester Adams. (lh) [Transferred from California Central on 10/1/2020.]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Tennessee Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Chester Adams v. Felipe Martinez, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Felipe Martinez, Jr.
Represented By: 2255 AUSA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Chester Adams
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?