Swift v. Old Dominion Freight Line, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Andre Swift
Defendant: George Allison and Old Dominion Freight Line, Inc.
Not Classified By Court: Temiika Gipson
Case Number: 2:2020cv02758
Filed: October 12, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Tennessee
Presiding Judge: Mark S Norris
Referring Judge: Tu M Pham
Nature of Suit: Motor Vehicle
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1391
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 23, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 23, 2020 Filing 12 REPORT of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting . (Wyatt, Carl)
November 12, 2020 Filing 11 NOTICE by George Allison, Old Dominion Freight Line, Inc. Service of Rule 26 Initial Disclosures (Wyatt, Carl)
October 19, 2020 Filing 10 SETTING LETTER: Scheduling Conference set for Friday, 01/22/2021 at 09:00 AM in Courtroom 4 - Memphis before Judge Mark S. Norris. (zsf)
October 19, 2020 Filing 9 ANSWER to Complaint with Jury Demand by All Defendants.(Wyatt, Carl)
October 16, 2020 Filing 8 NOTICE of Appearance by Brenna Lynn Sanchez on behalf of All Plaintiffs (Sanchez, Brenna)
October 13, 2020 Filing 7 NOTICE OF RIGHT TO CONSENT TO THE EXERCISE OF CIVIL JURISDICTION BY A MAGISTRATE JUDGE Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 636(c), Fed.R.Civ.P.73, and Local Rule 72.1, this Court has designated the Magistrate Judges of this District to conduct trials and otherwise dispose of any civil case that is filed in this Court. Your decision to consent, or not consent, to the referral of your case to a United States Magistrate Judge for trial and entry of a final judgment must be entirely voluntary. The judge or magistrate judge to whom the case has been assigned will not be informed of your decision unless all parties agree that the case may be referred to a magistrate judge for these specific purposes. A less than unanimous decision will not be communicated by this office to either the judge or magistrate judge. The consent form is available on the courts website at https://www.tnwd.uscourts.gov/forms-and-applications.php (jae)
October 13, 2020 Filing 6 NOTICE TO COMPLY WITH PLAN FOR ALTERNATE DISPUTE RESOLUTION (ADR): Pursuant to Section to 2.1 of the ADR Plan, all civil cases filed on or after Sept. 1, 2014, shall be referred automatically for ADR. For compliance requirements, refer to the ADR Plan at: http://www.tnwd.uscourts.gov/pdf/content/ADRPlan.pdf (jae)
October 13, 2020 Filing 5 NOTICE OF CASE TRACKING ASSIGNMENT PURSUANT TO LOCAL RULE 16.2: Pursuant to Local Rule 16.2, this case has been assigned to the Standard track. http://www.tnwd.uscourts.gov/pdf/content/LocalRules.pdf (jae)
October 13, 2020 Filing 4 Judge Mark S. Norris and Chief Magistrate Judge Tu M. Pham added. (jae)
October 13, 2020 Filing 3 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Old Dominion Freight Line, Inc. from Shelby County Circuit, case number CT-3698-20, filed by Old Dominion Freight Line, Inc. Filing fee $400 paid, receipt ATNWDC-3458478 (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit State Court Complaint)(Wyatt, Carl) Added receipt info on 10/13/2020 (cbs).
October 12, 2020 Filing 2 NOTICE of Appearance by Carl Wyatt on behalf of George Allison, Old Dominion Freight Line, Inc. (Wyatt, Carl)
October 12, 2020 Filing 1 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Old Dominion Freight Line, Inc.. (Wyatt, Carl)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Tennessee Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Swift v. Old Dominion Freight Line, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: George Allison
Represented By: Carl Wyatt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Old Dominion Freight Line, Inc.
Represented By: Carl Wyatt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Andre Swift
Represented By: Michelle Ford
Represented By: Brenna Lynn Sanchez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Not classified by court: Temiika Gipson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?