O'Meara v. Fidelity Investments et al
Plaintiff: Jeffrey O'Meara, as next friend of Thomas J. OMeara, Individually and as Grantor, Trustee and Beneficiary of The Thomas J. and Gail A. O'Meara Revocable Trust Dated January 25, 2002
Defendant: American Express National Bank, SunTrust Bank and Fidelity Investments
Not Classified By Court: Clerk W. Aaron Hall
Case Number: 2:2020cv02838
Filed: November 18, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Tennessee
Presiding Judge: Charmiane G Claxton
Referring Judge: Jon Phipps McCalla
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 10, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 14, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 27 SCHEDULING ORDER and ORDER GRANTING #6 , #18 DEFENDANTS FIDELITY INVESTMENT'S AND AMERICAN EXPRESS NATIONAL BANK'S MOTIONS TO COMPEL ARBITRATION and ORDER DENYING #17 JOINT MOTION TO STAY. Signed by Judge Jon Phipps McCalla on 1/14/2021. (joj)
January 13, 2021 Filing 26 SETTING LETTER: A Telephonic Status Conference is set for Thursday, 2/11/2021 at 9:30 AM before Judge Jon Phipps McCalla. To access the telephonic conference parties will dial 888-675-2535 and enter access code 7360481. Please call at least 5 minutes in advance of the conference time. (jrs)
January 13, 2021 Filing 25 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Jon Phipps McCalla: Telephonic Scheduling Conference held on 1/13/2021. Amber Griffin Shaw and Laura Martin appeared with new associate, Russell Born, for the Plaintiff. Joshua Jones, Jordan Caralisa Connell, Zachary Kisber, and Robert Tom appeared for the Defendants. Arguments heard as to Motions' to Compel Arbitration [6, 18, 24]. Sun Trust Response to Plaintiff's Motion to Compel #24 will be due by Tuesday, 1/19/2021. Plaintiff will reply by Friday, 1/22/2021. Case proportionality reviewed in re: to remaining monies in the trust. Court will grant defendants' motions (Fidelity and American Express) to compel arbitration [6, 18]. Rule 26(a)(1) disclosures will proceed as to Plaintiff and defendant, Sun Trust. Initial disclosures will be due by 1/27/2021. Other parties to join are not anticipated. Plaintiff anticipates amending complaint. Additional schedule will be set. The court set a follow-up Telephonic Status/Scheduling Conference for Thursday, 2/11/2021 at 9:30 a.m. An Order will be entered. (Court Reporter: Kristi Heasley) (jrs)
January 11, 2021 Filing 24 MOTION to Compel Arbitration as to Defendant SunTrust by Jeffrey O'Meara, as next friend of Thomas J. OMeara, Individually and as Grantor, Trustee and Beneficiary of The Thomas J. and Gail A. O'Meara Revocable Trust Dated January 25, 2002. (Martin, Laura)
January 8, 2021 Filing 23 REPORT of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting Joint Rule 26(f) Planning Report (proposed order submitted). (Kisber, Zachary)
December 14, 2020 Filing 22 MOTION to Dismiss Complaint for Breach of Contract with Prejudice by SunTrust Bank. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum)(Kisber, Zachary)
December 11, 2020 Filing 21 SETTING LETTER: The Scheduling Conference is RESET to Wednesday, 1/13/2021 at 9:30 AM before Judge Jon Phipps McCalla. To access the telephonic conference parties will dial 888-675-2535 and enter access code 7360481. Please call at least 5 minutes in advance of the conference time. (jrs)
December 10, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 20 ORDER RESETTING TELEPHONIC SCHEDULING CONFERENCE AND ORDER REQUIRING DISCLOSURE OF ARBITRATION AGREEMENTS. Signed by Judge Jon Phipps McCalla on 12/10/2020. (joj)
December 9, 2020 Filing 19 MEMORANDUM in Support re #18 MOTION to Compel Arbitration filed by American Express National Bank. (Connell, Jordan)
December 9, 2020 Filing 18 MOTION to Compel Arbitration by American Express National Bank. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A- Declaration of Keith Herr)(Connell, Jordan)
December 8, 2020 Filing 17 Joint MOTION to Stay Scheduling Conference and Other Rule 26 Duties(proposed order submitted) by SunTrust Bank. (Kisber, Zachary)
December 3, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER GRANTING #15 PLAINTIFF'S UNOPPOSED MOTION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME TO RESPOND TO MOTION TO COMPEL ARBITRATION AND TO STAY PENDING ARBITRATION. Signed by Judge Jon Phipps McCalla on 12/3/2020. (joj)
December 3, 2020 Filing 15 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply proposed order submitted by Jeffrey O'Meara, as next friend of Thomas J. OMeara, Individually and as Grantor, Trustee and Beneficiary of The Thomas J. and Gail A. O'Meara Revocable Trust Dated January 25, 2002. (Shaw, Amber)
November 24, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 14 *TEXT ORDER* GRANTING #13 MOTION TO EXTEND TIME FOR AMERICAN EXPRESS NATIONAL BANK TO FILE RESPONSIVE PLEADING TO PLAINTIFF'S COMPLAINT. DEFENDANT AMERICAN EXPRESS NATIONAL BANK SHALL FILE ITS RESPONSIVE PLEADING BY NO LATER THAN WEDNESDAY, DECEMBER 9, 2020. Signed by Judge Jon Phipps McCalla on 11/24/2020. (joj)
November 24, 2020 Filing 13 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer Proposed Order Submitted by American Express National Bank. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Proposed Order)(Connell, Jordan)
November 24, 2020 Filing 12 NOTICE of Appearance by Jordan Caralisa Connell on behalf of American Express National Bank (Connell, Jordan)
November 24, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER GRANTING #10 DEFENDANT TRUIST BANK'S UNOPPOSED MOTION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME TO RESPOND TO COMPLAINT. Signed by Judge Jon Phipps McCalla on 11/24/2020. (joj)
November 23, 2020 Filing 10 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply to Complaint (proposed order submitted) by SunTrust Bank. (Tom, Robert)
November 20, 2020 Filing 9 SETTING LETTER: A Telephonic Scheduling Conference is set for Tuesday, 12/15/2020 at 9:30 AM before Judge Jon Phipps McCalla. To access the telephonic conference parties will dial 888-675-2535 and enter access code 7360481. Please call at least 5 minutes in advance of the conference time. (jrs) (Main Document 9 replaced on 11/20/2020 - correction of day) (jrs).
November 20, 2020 Filing 8 NOTICE of Appearance by Zachary A. Kisber on behalf of SunTrust Bank (Kisber, Zachary)
November 19, 2020 Filing 7 MEMORANDUM in Support re #6 MOTION to Compel Arbitration and Stay Pending Arbitration filed by Fidelity Investments. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Jones, Joshua)
November 19, 2020 Filing 6 MOTION to Compel Arbitration and Stay Pending Arbitration by Fidelity Investments. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Jones, Joshua)
November 18, 2020 Filing 5 NOTICE OF RIGHT TO CONSENT TO THE EXERCISE OF CIVIL JURISDICTION BY A MAGISTRATE JUDGE Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 636(c), Fed.R.Civ.P.73, and Local Rule 72.1, this Court has designated the Magistrate Judges of this District to conduct trials and otherwise dispose of any civil case that is filed in this Court. Your decision to consent, or not consent, to the referral of your case to a United States Magistrate Judge for trial and entry of a final judgment must be entirely voluntary. The judge or magistrate judge to whom the case has been assigned will not be informed of your decision unless all parties agree that the case may be referred to a magistrate judge for these specific purposes. A less than unanimous decision will not be communicated by this office to either the judge or magistrate judge. The consent form is available on the courts website at https://www.tnwd.uscourts.gov/forms-and-applications.php (jld)
November 18, 2020 Filing 4 NOTICE TO COMPLY WITH PLAN FOR ALTERNATE DISPUTE RESOLUTION (ADR): Pursuant to Section to 2.1 of the ADR Plan, all civil cases filed on or after Sept. 1, 2014, shall be referred automatically for ADR. For compliance requirements, refer to the ADR Plan at: http://www.tnwd.uscourts.gov/pdf/content/ADRPlan.pdf (jld)
November 18, 2020 Filing 3 NOTICE OF CASE TRACKING ASSIGNMENT PURSUANT TO LOCAL RULE 16.2: Pursuant to Local Rule 16.2, this case has been assigned to the Standard track. http://www.tnwd.uscourts.gov/pdf/content/LocalRules.pdf (jld)
November 18, 2020 Filing 2 Judge Jon Phipps McCalla and Magistrate Judge Charmiane G. Claxton added. (jld)
November 18, 2020 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by SunTrust Bank from Chancery Court of Shelby County Tennessee, case number CH-20-1283-II (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number ATNWDC-3486851), filed by SunTrust Bank. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A-Summons and Complaint, #2 Civil Cover Sheet)(Tom, Robert)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Tennessee Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: O'Meara v. Fidelity Investments et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: American Express National Bank
Represented By: Jordan Caralisa Connell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SunTrust Bank
Represented By: Robert F. Tom
Represented By: Zachary A. Kisber
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Fidelity Investments
Represented By: Joshua Jones
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Not classified by court: Clerk W. Aaron Hall
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jeffrey O'Meara, as next friend of Thomas J. OMeara, Individually and as Grantor, Trustee and Beneficiary of The Thomas J. and Gail A. O'Meara Revocable Trust Dated January 25, 2002
Represented By: Laura S. Martin
Represented By: Amber Griffin Shaw
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?