Williams et al v. Deutsche Bank National Trust Company
Plaintiff: Marion Williams and Nell Williams
Defendant: Deutsche Bank National Trust Company, as Trustee for Home Equity Mortgage Loan Asset-Backed Trust Series INABS 2005-D, Home Equity Mortgage Loan Asset-Backed Certificates Series Inabs 2005-D, PHH Mortgage Corporation and Deutsche Bank National Trust Company
Not Classified By Court: Clerk W. Aaron Hall
Case Number: 2:2020cv02919
Filed: December 21, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Tennessee
Presiding Judge: Charmiane G Claxton
Referring Judge: Sheryl H Lipman
Nature of Suit: Real Property: Foreclosure
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 28, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 28, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 23 SCHEDULING ORDER. Signed by Judge Sheryl H. Lipman on 1/28/21. (Lipman, Sheryl)
January 28, 2021 Filing 22 NOTICE SETTING TRIAL WITH PRETRIAL PROCEDURES: Jury Trial set for Monday, January 24, 2022 at 9:30 AM in Courtroom 1 - Memphis before Judge Sheryl H. Lipman. Trial is estimated to last 2 days. Joint Proposed Pretrial Order due by Friday, January 7, 2022. Pretrial Conference set for Friday, January 14, 2022 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom 1 - Memphis before Judge Sheryl H. Lipman. (smm)
January 28, 2021 Filing 21 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Sheryl H. Lipman: Scheduling Conference was held via Microsoft Teams Video Conferencing on 1/28/2021. Paul Anthony Robinson Jr. appeared for the plaintiff(s). Joseph V. Ronderos Jr., appeared for the defendant(s). The court discussed the dates and deadlines with the parties. Response to the Motion to Dismiss is due by Friday, February 26, 2021. Plaintiff's Motion to Remand to State Court #16 was denied. Jury Trial set for Monday, January 24, 2022 at 9:30 AM in Courtroom 1 - Memphis before Judge Sheryl H. Lipman. Trial is estimated to last 2 days. Joint Proposed Pretrial Order due by Friday, January 7, 2022. Pretrial Conference set for Friday, January 14, 2022 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom 1 - Memphis before Judge Sheryl H. Lipman. Scheduling Order to be entered. (Court Reporter: Candace Covey) (smm)
January 22, 2021 Filing 20 RESPONSE in Opposition re #16 MOTION to Remand to State Court (proposed order submitted) filed by Deutsche Bank National Trust Company, PHH Mortgage Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum of Law in Support of Defendants' Opposition to Motion to Remand)(Ronderos, Joseph)
January 21, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 19 ORDER GRANTING MOTION TO EXTEND TIME IN PART. Signed by Judge Sheryl H. Lipman on 01/21/2021. (shl)
January 20, 2021 Filing 18 REPORT of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting (proposed order submitted). (Ronderos, Joseph)
January 20, 2021 Filing 17 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #12 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM by All Plaintiffs. (Robinson, Paul)
January 20, 2021 Filing 16 MOTION to Remand to State Court by All Plaintiffs. (Robinson, Paul)
January 6, 2021 Filing 15 NOTICE of Appearance by Shaun Kevin Ramey on behalf of Deutsche Bank National Trust Company, PHH Mortgage Corporation (Ramey, Shaun)
January 6, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER DENYING #13 MOTION TO WITHDRAW AS COUNSEL. Signed by Judge Sheryl H. Lipman on 01/06/2021. (shl)
December 31, 2020 Filing 13 MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney Paul Robinson by Marion Williams, Nell Williams. (Robinson, Paul)
December 22, 2020 Filing 12 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM by Deutsche Bank National Trust Company, PHH Mortgage Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum of Law in Support of Motion to Dismiss, #2 Exhibit 1-Deed of Trust, #3 Exhibit 2-Trustee's Deed, #4 Exhibit 3-Certificate of Merger)(Ronderos, Joseph)
December 22, 2020 Filing 11 NOTICE of Appearance by Joseph V. Ronderos, Jr on behalf of Deutsche Bank National Trust Company, PHH Mortgage Corporation (Ronderos, Joseph)
December 22, 2020 Filing 10 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Deutsche Bank National Trust Company. (Ronderos, Joseph)
December 22, 2020 Filing 9 Corporate Disclosure Statement by PHH Mortgage Corporation. (Ronderos, Joseph)
December 22, 2020 Filing 8 ATTACHMENT Exhibit 3 to #2 Notice of Removal,, by Deutsche Bank National Trust Company.. (Ronderos, Joseph)
December 22, 2020 Filing 7 SETTING LETTER: A Scheduling Conference has been set for Thursday, January 28, 2021 at 2:00 PM via Microsoft Teams Video Conference before Judge Sheryl H. Lipman. The proceeding will be done via Microsoft Teams video conference. The Court will email the parties an invitation for the video conference prior to the proceeding.Counsel should submit any exhibits to be offered to the Judge's ECF mailbox prior to the proceeding.The public may also access the video proceeding. If the public and/or media wish to attend in the video proceeding, please click on the following link to request access information: #https://www.tnwd.uscourts.gov/videohearings The access information will be delivered via email to the email address from which the request originated.Parties should consult the instructions for #Joining a Meeting in Teams or #Joining a Meeting Without a Teams Account. Please email Sandra McClain at sandra_mcclain@tnwd.uscourts.gov for any questions. (smm)
December 22, 2020 Filing 6 NOTICE OF RIGHT TO CONSENT TO THE EXERCISE OF CIVIL JURISDICTION BY A MAGISTRATE JUDGE Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 636(c), Fed.R.Civ.P.73, and Local Rule 72.1, this Court has designated the Magistrate Judges of this District to conduct trials and otherwise dispose of any civil case that is filed in this Court. Your decision to consent, or not consent, to the referral of your case to a United States Magistrate Judge for trial and entry of a final judgment must be entirely voluntary. The judge or magistrate judge to whom the case has been assigned will not be informed of your decision unless all parties agree that the case may be referred to a magistrate judge for these specific purposes. A less than unanimous decision will not be communicated by this office to either the judge or magistrate judge. The consent form is available on the courts website at https://www.tnwd.uscourts.gov/forms-and-applications.php (jae)
December 22, 2020 Filing 5 NOTICE TO COMPLY WITH PLAN FOR ALTERNATE DISPUTE RESOLUTION (ADR): Pursuant to Section to 2.1 of the ADR Plan, all civil cases filed on or after Sept. 1, 2014, shall be referred automatically for ADR. For compliance requirements, refer to the ADR Plan at: http://www.tnwd.uscourts.gov/pdf/content/ADRPlan.pdf (jae)
December 22, 2020 Filing 4 NOTICE OF CASE TRACKING ASSIGNMENT PURSUANT TO LOCAL RULE 16.2: Pursuant to Local Rule 16.2, this case has been assigned to the Standard track. http://www.tnwd.uscourts.gov/pdf/content/LocalRules.pdf (jae)
December 21, 2020 Filing 3 Judge Sheryl H. Lipman and Magistrate Judge Charmiane G. Claxton added. (jae)
December 21, 2020 Filing 2 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Deutsche Bank National Trust Company, as Trustee for Home Equity Mortgage Loan Asset-Backed Trust Series INABS 2005-D, Home Equity Mortgage Loan Asset-Backed Certificates Series Inabs 2005-D from Chancery Court for Shelby County, TN, case number CH-20-0988 (Filing fee $ 402 receipt number ATNWDC-3510048), filed by Deutsche Bank National Trust Company, as Trustee for Home Equity Mortgage Loan Asset-Backed Trust Series INABS 2005-D, Home Equity Mortgage Loan Asset-Backed Certificates Series Inabs 2005-D. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit Exhibit 1 - State Court Pleadings, #3 Exhibit Exhibit 2 -Trustee's Deed)(Ronderos, Joseph)
December 21, 2020 Filing 1 NOTICE by Deutsche Bank National Trust Company, as Trustee for Home Equity Mortgage Loan Asset-Backed Trust Series INABS 2005-D, Home Equity Mortgage Loan Asset-Backed Certificates Series Inabs 2005-D (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit Exhibit 1 and 2)(Ronderos, Joseph)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Tennessee Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Williams et al v. Deutsche Bank National Trust Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Marion Williams
Represented By: Paul Anthony Robinson, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Nell Williams
Represented By: Paul Anthony Robinson, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Deutsche Bank National Trust Company, as Trustee for Home Equity Mortgage Loan Asset-Backed Trust Series INABS 2005-D, Home Equity Mortgage Loan Asset-Backed Certificates Series Inabs 2005-D
Represented By: Joseph V. Ronderos, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: PHH Mortgage Corporation
Represented By: Joseph V. Ronderos, Jr
Represented By: Shaun Kevin Ramey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Deutsche Bank National Trust Company
Represented By: Joseph V. Ronderos, Jr
Represented By: Shaun Kevin Ramey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Not classified by court: Clerk W. Aaron Hall
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?