Buurma Farms, Inc. v. Walter Palazola Produce Company, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Buurma Farms, Inc.
Defendant: Walter Palazola Produce Company, Inc., Anna Palazola and Thomas R. Palazola
Case Number: 2:2020cv02929
Filed: December 23, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Tennessee
Presiding Judge: Charmiane G Claxton
Referring Judge: Samuel H Mays
Nature of Suit: Agriculture Acts
Cause of Action: 07 U.S.C. ยง 499
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 15, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 15, 2021 Filing 15 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Buurma Farms, Inc.. Anna Palazola waiver sent on 2/12/2021, answer due 4/13/2021. (Amendola, Mark)
February 15, 2021 Filing 14 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Buurma Farms, Inc.. Thomas R. Palazola waiver sent on 2/12/2021, answer due 4/13/2021. (Amendola, Mark)
February 15, 2021 Filing 13 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Buurma Farms, Inc.. Walter Palazola Produce Company, Inc. waiver sent on 2/12/2021, answer due 4/13/2021. (Amendola, Mark)
January 4, 2021 Filing 12 NOTICE of Lis Pendens by Buurma Farms, Inc. (Amendola, Mark)
December 29, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER Granting Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Signed by Judge Samuel H. Mays, Jr on 12/29/2020. (Mays, Samuel)
December 28, 2020 Filing 10 ATTACHMENT / Certificate of Good Standing from Northern District of Ohio to 9 Deficiency Notice,, by Buurma Farms, Inc... (Amendola, Mark)
December 23, 2020 Filing 9 DEFICIENCY NOTICE: Pursuant to Rule 5 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure, document #8 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice (proposed order submitted) (Filing fee $ 150 receipt number ATNWDC-3511403) filed by Buurma Farms, Inc. has been filed. However, the following deficiency has been found: : Filer failed to include the required TWO certificates of good standing. This motion will be termed, pending correct submission. Please refer to the #ECF User Manual and #ECF Policies and Procedures. The filer has one business day to correct the deficiency. (jae)
December 23, 2020 Filing 8 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice (proposed order submitted) (Filing fee $ 150 receipt number ATNWDC-3511403) by Buurma Farms, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit List of Courts Admitted, #2 Exhibit Certificate of Good Standing)(Amendola, Mark)
December 23, 2020 Filing 7 Summons Issued as to Anna Palazola, Thomas R. Palazola, Walter Palazola Produce Company, Inc.. The filer has been notified electronically that the summons has been issued, and the new docket entry reflects this. Upon notification of the new docket entry, the filer is to print the issued summons in order to effect service. (Attachments: #1 summons, #2 summons)(jae)
December 23, 2020 Filing 6 NOTICE OF RIGHT TO CONSENT TO THE EXERCISE OF CIVIL JURISDICTION BY A MAGISTRATE JUDGE Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 636(c), Fed.R.Civ.P.73, and Local Rule 72.1, this Court has designated the Magistrate Judges of this District to conduct trials and otherwise dispose of any civil case that is filed in this Court. Your decision to consent, or not consent, to the referral of your case to a United States Magistrate Judge for trial and entry of a final judgment must be entirely voluntary. The judge or magistrate judge to whom the case has been assigned will not be informed of your decision unless all parties agree that the case may be referred to a magistrate judge for these specific purposes. A less than unanimous decision will not be communicated by this office to either the judge or magistrate judge. The consent form is available on the courts website at https://www.tnwd.uscourts.gov/forms-and-applications.php (jae)
December 23, 2020 Filing 5 NOTICE TO COMPLY WITH PLAN FOR ALTERNATE DISPUTE RESOLUTION (ADR): Pursuant to Section to 2.1 of the ADR Plan, all civil cases filed on or after Sept. 1, 2014, shall be referred automatically for ADR. For compliance requirements, refer to the ADR Plan at: http://www.tnwd.uscourts.gov/pdf/content/ADRPlan.pdf (jae)
December 23, 2020 Filing 4 NOTICE OF CASE TRACKING ASSIGNMENT PURSUANT TO LOCAL RULE 16.2: Pursuant to Local Rule 16.2, this case has been assigned to the Standard track. http://www.tnwd.uscourts.gov/pdf/content/LocalRules.pdf (jae)
December 23, 2020 Filing 3 Judge Samuel H. Mays, Jr and Magistrate Judge Charmiane G. Claxton added. (jae)
December 23, 2020 Filing 2 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Buurma Farms, Inc.. (Amendola, Mark)
December 23, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Anna Palazola, Thomas R. Palazola, Walter Palazola Produce Company, Inc. (Filing fee $ 402 receipt number ATNWDC-3511346), filed by Buurma Farms, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons for Corporate Defendant, #3 Summons for Thomas R. Palazola, #4 Summons for Anna Palazola, #5 Exhibit Statement of Account)(Amendola, Mark)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Tennessee Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Buurma Farms, Inc. v. Walter Palazola Produce Company, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Buurma Farms, Inc.
Represented By: Mark A Amendola
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Walter Palazola Produce Company, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Anna Palazola
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Thomas R. Palazola
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?