Roy v. Penske Truck Leasing Co. et al
Plaintiff: Lejulian Roy
Defendant: Penske Truck Leasing Co., L.P., Penske Truck Leasing Co., Mervin Crigler and Jewell Trucking, LLC
Not Classified By Court: Temiika Gipson
Case Number: 2:2021cv02009
Filed: January 6, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Tennessee
Presiding Judge: Sheryl H Lipman
Referring Judge: Tu M Pham
Nature of Suit: Motor Vehicle
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1441
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 24, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 24, 2021 Filing 19 NOTICE by Jewell Trucking, LLC (Feeney, John)
February 24, 2021 Filing 18 NOTICE by Penske Truck Leasing Co., L.P. Notice of Service of Penske Defendants' Rule 26(a)(1)(A) Initial Disclosures (Lebair, Harry)
February 24, 2021 Filing 17 NOTICE by Lejulian Roy of Filing Initial Disclosures (Shaw, Amber)
February 23, 2021 Filing 16 SETTING LETTER: A Joint Status/Scheduling Conference set for Friday, March 12, 2021 at 9:30 AM via Skype Video Conference before Judge Sheryl H. Lipman. The proceeding will be done via Skype for Business video conference. The Court will email the parties an invitation for the video conference prior to the proceeding.Counsel should submit any exhibits to be offered to the Judge's ECF mailbox prior to the proceeding.The public may also access the video proceeding. If the public and/or media wish to attend in the video proceeding, please click on the following link to request access information: #https://www.tnwd.uscourts.gov/videohearings The access information will be delivered via email to the email address from which the request originated.Parties shall consult the #Skype for Business webpage for instructions on downloading the proper extensions for their computer.Please email Sandra McClain at sandra_mcclain@tnwd.uscourts.gov for any questions. (smm)
February 17, 2021 Filing 15 ANSWER to #8 Answer to Complaint, Crossclaim, #7 Answer to Complaint, Crossclaim , ANSWER to #8 Answer to Complaint, Crossclaim, #7 Answer to Complaint, Crossclaim by Jewell Trucking, LLC.(Feeney, John)
February 10, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 14 SCHEDULING ORDER. Signed by Judge Sheryl H. Lipman on 02/10/2021. (shl)
February 10, 2021 Filing 13 NOTICE SETTING TRIAL WITH PRETRIAL PROCEDURES: Jury Trial set for Monday, February 14, 2022 at 9:30 AM in Courtroom 1 - Memphis before Judge Sheryl H. Lipman. Trial is estimated to last 2-3 days. Joint Proposed Pretrial Order due by Friday, January 28, 2022. Pretrial Conference set for Friday, February 4, 2022 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom 1 - Memphis before Judge Sheryl H. Lipman. (smm)
February 10, 2021 Filing 12 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Sheryl H. Lipman: Scheduling Conference was held via Microsoft Teams Video Conferencing on 02/10/2021. Amber G. Shaw appeared for the plaintiff(s). Harry W. Lebair, IV, John T. Feeney, III and Melanie M. Stewart appeared for the defendant(s). The court discussed the dates and deadlines with the parties. Mr. John T. Feeney's oral motion to extend time to file answer to Cross Claim was granted. The answer is due by close of business on Friday, February 19, 2021. Jury Trial set for Monday, February 14, 2022 at 9:30 AM in Courtroom 1 - Memphis before Judge Sheryl H. Lipman. Trial is estimated to last 2-3 days. Joint Proposed Pretrial Order due by Friday, January 28, 2022. Pretrial Conference set for Friday, February 4, 2022 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom 1 - Memphis before Judge Sheryl H. Lipman. Scheduling Order to be entered. (Court Reporter: Candace Covey)) (smm)
February 2, 2021 Filing 11 REPORT of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting . (Shaw, Amber)
January 26, 2021 Filing 10 NOTICE of Appearance by Melanie M. Stewart on behalf of Mervin Crigler (Stewart, Melanie)
January 11, 2021 Filing 9 ANSWER to Complaint with Jury Demand by Jewell Trucking, LLC.(Feeney, John)
January 11, 2021 Filing 8 ANSWER to Complaint , CROSSCLAIM against Jewell Trucking, LLC by Penske Truck Leasing Co.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Rental Agreement, #2 Exhibit Certificate of Insurance)(Lebair, Harry)
January 11, 2021 Filing 7 ANSWER to Complaint , CROSSCLAIM against Jewell Trucking, LLC by Penske Truck Leasing Co., L.P.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Rental Agreement, #2 Exhibit Certificate of Insurance)(Lebair, Harry)
January 7, 2021 Filing 6 SETTING LETTER: A Scheduling Conference has been set for Wednesday, February 10, 2021 at 10:00 AM via Microsoft Teams Video Conference before Judge Sheryl H. Lipman. The proceeding will be done via Microsoft Teams video conference. The Court will email the parties an invitation for the video conference prior to the proceeding.Counsel should submit any exhibits to be offered to the Judge's ECF mailbox prior to the proceeding.The public may also access the video proceeding. If the public and/or media wish to attend in the video proceeding, please click on the following link to request access information: #https://www.tnwd.uscourts.gov/videohearings The access information will be delivered via email to the email address from which the request originated.Parties should consult the instructions for #Joining a Meeting in Teams or #Joining a Meeting Without a Teams Account. Please email Sandra McClain at sandra_mcclain@tnwd.uscourts.gov for any questions. (smm)
January 6, 2021 Filing 5 NOTICE OF RIGHT TO CONSENT TO THE EXERCISE OF CIVIL JURISDICTION BY A MAGISTRATE JUDGE Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 636(c), Fed.R.Civ.P.73, and Local Rule 72.1, this Court has designated the Magistrate Judges of this District to conduct trials and otherwise dispose of any civil case that is filed in this Court. Your decision to consent, or not consent, to the referral of your case to a United States Magistrate Judge for trial and entry of a final judgment must be entirely voluntary. The judge or magistrate judge to whom the case has been assigned will not be informed of your decision unless all parties agree that the case may be referred to a magistrate judge for these specific purposes. A less than unanimous decision will not be communicated by this office to either the judge or magistrate judge. The consent form is available on the courts website at https://www.tnwd.uscourts.gov/forms-and-applications.php (jae)
January 6, 2021 Filing 4 NOTICE TO COMPLY WITH PLAN FOR ALTERNATE DISPUTE RESOLUTION (ADR): Pursuant to Section to 2.1 of the ADR Plan, all civil cases filed on or after Sept. 1, 2014, shall be referred automatically for ADR. For compliance requirements, refer to the ADR Plan at: http://www.tnwd.uscourts.gov/pdf/content/ADRPlan.pdf (jae)
January 6, 2021 Filing 3 NOTICE OF CASE TRACKING ASSIGNMENT PURSUANT TO LOCAL RULE 16.2: Pursuant to Local Rule 16.2, this case has been assigned to the Standard track. http://www.tnwd.uscourts.gov/pdf/content/LocalRules.pdf (jae)
January 6, 2021 Filing 2 Judge Sheryl H. Lipman and Chief Magistrate Judge Tu M. Pham added. (jae)
January 6, 2021 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Penske Truck Leasing Co., L.P. from Shelby Circuit, case number CT-4680-20 (Filing fee $ 402 receipt number ATNWDC-3517347), filed by Penske Truck Leasing Co., L.P.. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit Exhibit A Complaint, #3 Exhibit Exhibit B Summons to Penske, #4 Exhibit Exhibit C Summons to Jewell, #5 Exhibit Exhibit D Notice of Filing)(Lebair, Harry)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Tennessee Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Roy v. Penske Truck Leasing Co. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lejulian Roy
Represented By: Amber Griffin Shaw
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Penske Truck Leasing Co., L.P.
Represented By: Harry W. Lebair, IV
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Penske Truck Leasing Co.
Represented By: Harry W. Lebair, IV
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mervin Crigler
Represented By: Melanie M. Stewart
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jewell Trucking, LLC
Represented By: John Thomas Feeney, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Not classified by court: Temiika Gipson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?