Metz et al v. Hankins et al
Plaintiff: George Metz and Barbara Metz
Defendant: M&A Transport, LLC, Michael Hankins and State Farm Automobile Insurance Company
Not Classified By Court: Temiika Gipson
Case Number: 2:2021cv02093
Filed: February 10, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Tennessee
Presiding Judge: Annie T Christoff
Referring Judge: Jon Phipps McCalla
Nature of Suit: Motor Vehicle
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 6, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 6, 2021 Filing 17 NOTICE by Barbara Metz, George Metz Notice Service 26a1 disclosures (Peel, David)
March 25, 2021 Filing 16 NOTICE by Michael Hankins, M&A Transport, LLC Service of Rule 26 Initial Disclosures (Wyatt, Carl)
March 17, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 15 SCHEDULING ORDER. Signed by Judge Jon Phipps McCalla on 3/17/2021. (pa)
March 16, 2021 Filing 14 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Jon Phipps McCalla: Telephonic Scheduling Conference held on 3/16/2021. David Peel appeared for the Plaintiff. Carl Wyatt and Dawn Davis Carson appeared for the Defendants. Plaintiff filed a voluntary dismissal as to State Farm #11 . This is a diversity-personal injury case related to 2:20-cv-2576-JPM. The Court reviewed case information, damage claims, and extent of plaintiffs injuries. A Rule 12 motion is not expected. A resolution of this and related case is (20-2576) pending. An Order will be entered. (Court Reporter: Tina Gibson) (jrs)
March 15, 2021 Filing 13 REPORT of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting . (Wyatt, Carl)
March 15, 2021 Filing 12 COURTESY NOTICE: Pursuant to Rule 5 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure, document #11 Notice of Voluntary Dismissal filed by George Metz, Barbara Metz has been filed. For future reference, please note Proposed order should not be published to CM/ECF, but only emailed to chambers. If no proposed order previously emailed to chambers, please do so upon receipt of this notice. Please refer to the #ECF User Manual and #ECF Policies and Procedures. Filer is not required to resubmit document. (jae)
March 15, 2021 Filing 11 NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by Barbara Metz, George Metz (Attachments: #1 consent ORDER)(Peel, David)
March 1, 2021 Filing 10 NOTICE of Appearance by Dawn Davis Carson on behalf of State Farm Automobile Insurance Company (Carson, Dawn)
February 17, 2021 Filing 9 ANSWER to Complaint with Jury Demand by Michael Hankins, M&A Transport, LLC.(Wyatt, Carl)
February 16, 2021 Filing 8 SETTING LETTER: A Telephonic Scheduling Conference is set for Tuesday, 3/16/2021 at 9:30 AM before Judge Jon Phipps McCalla. To access the telephonic conference parties will dial 888-675-2535 and enter access code 7360481. Please call at least 5 minutes in advance of the conference time. (jrs)
February 10, 2021 Filing 7 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Michael Hankins, M&A Transport, LLC. (Wyatt, Carl)
February 10, 2021 Filing 6 NOTICE of Appearance by Carl Wyatt on behalf of All Defendants (Wyatt, Carl)
February 10, 2021 Filing 5 NOTICE OF RIGHT TO CONSENT TO THE EXERCISE OF CIVIL JURISDICTION BY A MAGISTRATE JUDGE Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 636(c), Fed.R.Civ.P.73, and Local Rule 72.1, this Court has designated the Magistrate Judges of this District to conduct trials and otherwise dispose of any civil case that is filed in this Court. Your decision to consent, or not consent, to the referral of your case to a United States Magistrate Judge for trial and entry of a final judgment must be entirely voluntary. The judge or magistrate judge to whom the case has been assigned will not be informed of your decision unless all parties agree that the case may be referred to a magistrate judge for these specific purposes. A less than unanimous decision will not be communicated by this office to either the judge or magistrate judge. The consent form is available on the courts website at https://www.tnwd.uscourts.gov/forms-and-applications.php (jae)
February 10, 2021 Filing 4 NOTICE TO COMPLY WITH PLAN FOR ALTERNATE DISPUTE RESOLUTION (ADR): Pursuant to Section to 2.1 of the ADR Plan, all civil cases filed on or after Sept. 1, 2014, shall be referred automatically for ADR. For compliance requirements, refer to the ADR Plan at: http://www.tnwd.uscourts.gov/pdf/content/ADRPlan.pdf (jae)
February 10, 2021 Filing 3 NOTICE OF CASE TRACKING ASSIGNMENT PURSUANT TO LOCAL RULE 16.2: Pursuant to Local Rule 16.2, this case has been assigned to the Standard track. http://www.tnwd.uscourts.gov/pdf/content/LocalRules.pdf (jae)
February 10, 2021 Filing 2 Judge Jon Phipps McCalla and Magistrate Judge Annie T. Christoff added. (jae)
February 10, 2021 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by M&A Transport, LLC, Michael Hankins from Shelby County Circuit, case number CT-5385-20 (Filing fee $ 402 receipt number ATNWDC-3544202), filed by M&A Transport, LLC, Michael Hankins. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit State Court Complaint, #3 Exhibit Summons Michael Hankins)(Wyatt, Carl)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Tennessee Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Metz et al v. Hankins et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: George Metz
Represented By: David Britton Peel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Barbara Metz
Represented By: David Britton Peel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: M&A Transport, LLC
Represented By: Carl Wyatt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Michael Hankins
Represented By: Carl Wyatt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: State Farm Automobile Insurance Company
Represented By: Dawn Davis Carson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Not classified by court: Temiika Gipson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?