Montanez-Gomez et al v. Outlaw et al
Plaintiff: Maria Montanez-Gomez, Moises Montanez and Jose Olvera
Defendant: Chris Griste, Rikki Outlaw and Trexis Insurance Corporation
Not Classified By Court: Temiika Gipson
Case Number: 2:2021cv02105
Filed: February 22, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Tennessee
Presiding Judge: Annie T Christoff
Referring Judge: Thomas L Parker
Nature of Suit: Motor Vehicle
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1441
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 8, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 8, 2021 Filing 18 NOTICE OF CANCELLATION - The Telephonic Scheduling Conference set on TUESDAY, MAY 18, 2021 at 9:00 A.M. (CDT) before Judge Thomas L. Parker IS HEREBY CANCELLED and will be set again at a later date. (jpw)
April 7, 2021 Filing 17 SETTING LETTER: A TELEPHONIC SCHEDULING CONFERENCE pursuant to Rule 16(b) of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure has been SET for TUESDAY, MAY 18, 2021 at 9:00 A.M. (CDT) before Judge Thomas L. Parker. If the parties consent to have the case heard by the magistrate, please file your consent and this conference will be cancelled.Please call 877-336-1839 to dial into the conference call. The access code is 6517215.Counsel should be prepared to discuss all pending motions.PLEASE REVIEW THE ATTACHED INSTRUCTIONS. (jpw)
April 1, 2021 Filing 16 ANSWER to Complaint by Trexis Insurance Corporation.(Whittemore, Kip)
April 1, 2021 Filing 15 DEFICIENCY NOTICE: Pursuant to Rule 5 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure, document #14 Answer to Complaint filed by Trexis Insurance Corporation has been filed. However, the following deficiency has been found: the pleading has a "wet" signature and not the required electronic signature. Please refer to the #ECF User Manual and #ECF Policies and Procedures. The filer has one business day to correct the deficiency. (agj)
March 31, 2021 Filing 14 ANSWER to Complaint by Trexis Insurance Corporation.(Whittemore, Kip)
March 26, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 13 [**TEXT ORDER ONLY- - NO IMAGE ATTACHED**]: Defendant Chris Griste moves unopposed for an extension of time of 90 days to respond to the complaint. (ECF No. 12.) For good cause shown, the Court GRANTS Defendants motion. Defendant shall have through June 24, 2021, to respond to the complaint. Signed by Judge Thomas L. Parker on 3/26/2021. (kll)
March 26, 2021 Filing 12 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer (proposed Order submitted) by Chris Griste. (Wackerfuss, Richard)
March 26, 2021 Filing 11 NOTICE of Appearance by Richard Wallace Wackerfuss on behalf of Chris Griste (Wackerfuss, Richard)
March 19, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER GRANTING JOINT MOTION TO CONSOLIDATE. Signed by Judge Thomas L. Parker on 3/19/2021. (kll)
March 18, 2021 Filing 9 Joint MOTION to Consolidate Cases Proposed Order Submitted by Rikki Outlaw. Associated Cases: 2:21-cv-02104-TLP-atc, 2:21-cv-02105-TLP-atc, 2:21-cv-02106-TLP-atc(Slager, Jennifer)
March 18, 2021 Filing 8 NOTICE of Appearance by Robert Deniger Cobb on behalf of All Plaintiffs (Cobb, Robert)
March 1, 2021 Filing 7 ANSWER to Complaint with Jury Demand by Rikki Outlaw.(Slager, Jennifer)
March 1, 2021 Filing 6 NOTICE by Chris Griste, Rikki Outlaw re #1 Notice of Removal, Amended Notice of Removal (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Exhibit)(Slager, Jennifer)
February 22, 2021 Filing 5 NOTICE OF RIGHT TO CONSENT TO THE EXERCISE OF CIVIL JURISDICTION BY A MAGISTRATE JUDGE Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 636(c), Fed.R.Civ.P.73, and Local Rule 72.1, this Court has designated the Magistrate Judges of this District to conduct trials and otherwise dispose of any civil case that is filed in this Court. Your decision to consent, or not consent, to the referral of your case to a United States Magistrate Judge for trial and entry of a final judgment must be entirely voluntary. The judge or magistrate judge to whom the case has been assigned will not be informed of your decision unless all parties agree that the case may be referred to a magistrate judge for these specific purposes. A less than unanimous decision will not be communicated by this office to either the judge or magistrate judge. The consent form is available on the courts website at https://www.tnwd.uscourts.gov/forms-and-applications.php (jae)
February 22, 2021 Filing 4 NOTICE TO COMPLY WITH PLAN FOR ALTERNATE DISPUTE RESOLUTION (ADR): Pursuant to Section to 2.1 of the ADR Plan, all civil cases filed on or after Sept. 1, 2014, shall be referred automatically for ADR. For compliance requirements, refer to the ADR Plan at: http://www.tnwd.uscourts.gov/pdf/content/ADRPlan.pdf (jae)
February 22, 2021 Filing 3 NOTICE OF CASE TRACKING ASSIGNMENT PURSUANT TO LOCAL RULE 16.2: Pursuant to Local Rule 16.2, this case has been assigned to the Standard track. http://www.tnwd.uscourts.gov/pdf/content/LocalRules.pdf (jae)
February 22, 2021 Filing 2 Judge Thomas L. Parker and Magistrate Judge Annie T. Christoff added. (jae) (jae).
February 22, 2021 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Rikki Outlaw from Shelby County Circuit Court, case number CT-0290-21 (Filing fee $ 402 receipt number ATNWDC-3550034), filed by Rikki Outlaw. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Exhibit, #3 Civil Cover Sheet)(Slager, Jennifer)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Tennessee Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Montanez-Gomez et al v. Outlaw et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Maria Montanez-Gomez
Represented By: Nathan C. Williams
Represented By: David W. Hill
Represented By: Robert Deniger Cobb
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Moises Montanez
Represented By: Nathan C. Williams
Represented By: David W. Hill
Represented By: Robert Deniger Cobb
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jose Olvera
Represented By: Nathan C. Williams
Represented By: David W. Hill
Represented By: Robert Deniger Cobb
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Chris Griste
Represented By: Richard Wallace Wackerfuss
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Rikki Outlaw
Represented By: Jennifer Sutch Slager
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Trexis Insurance Corporation
Represented By: Kip Elliott Whittemore
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Not classified by court: Temiika Gipson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?