Robinson v. Outlaw et al
Plaintiff: Mario K Robinson
Defendant: Chris Griste, Rikki Outlaw and State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company
Not Classified By Court: Temiika Gipson
Case Number: 2:2021cv02106
Filed: February 22, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Tennessee
Presiding Judge: Annie T Christoff
Referring Judge: Thomas L Parker
Nature of Suit: Motor Vehicle
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1441
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 9, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 9, 2021 Filing 15 ANSWER to Complaint with Jury Demand by State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company.(Spragins, Hal)
March 26, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 14 [**TEXT ORDER ONLY- - NO IMAGE ATTACHED**]: Defendant Chris Griste moves unopposed for an extension of time of 90 days to respond to the complaint. (ECF No. 13.) For good cause shown, the Court GRANTS Defendants motion. Defendant shall have through June 24, 2021, to respond to the complaint. Signed by Judge Thomas L. Parker on 3/26/2021. (kll)
March 26, 2021 Filing 13 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer (proposed Order submitted) by Chris Griste. (Wackerfuss, Richard)
March 26, 2021 Filing 12 NOTICE of Appearance by Richard Wallace Wackerfuss on behalf of Chris Griste (Wackerfuss, Richard)
March 19, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER GRANTING JOINT MOTION TO CONSOLIDATE #10 . Signed by Judge Thomas L. Parker on 3/19/2021. (kll)
March 18, 2021 Filing 10 Joint MOTION to Consolidate Cases Proposed Order Submitted by Rikki Outlaw. Associated Cases: 2:21-cv-02104-TLP-atc, 2:21-cv-02105-TLP-atc, 2:21-cv-02106-TLP-atc(Slager, Jennifer)
March 18, 2021 Filing 9 NOTICE of Appearance by Robert Deniger Cobb on behalf of Mario K Robinson (Cobb, Robert)
March 18, 2021 Filing 8 NOTICE of Appearance by Hal S. Spragins, Jr on behalf of State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company (Spragins, Hal)
March 1, 2021 Filing 7 ANSWER to Complaint with Jury Demand by Rikki Outlaw.(Slager, Jennifer)
March 1, 2021 Filing 6 NOTICE by Chris Griste, Rikki Outlaw re #1 Notice of Removal, Amended Notice of Removal (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Exhibit)(Slager, Jennifer)
February 22, 2021 Filing 5 NOTICE OF RIGHT TO CONSENT TO THE EXERCISE OF CIVIL JURISDICTION BY A MAGISTRATE JUDGE Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 636(c), Fed.R.Civ.P.73, and Local Rule 72.1, this Court has designated the Magistrate Judges of this District to conduct trials and otherwise dispose of any civil case that is filed in this Court. Your decision to consent, or not consent, to the referral of your case to a United States Magistrate Judge for trial and entry of a final judgment must be entirely voluntary. The judge or magistrate judge to whom the case has been assigned will not be informed of your decision unless all parties agree that the case may be referred to a magistrate judge for these specific purposes. A less than unanimous decision will not be communicated by this office to either the judge or magistrate judge. The consent form is available on the courts website at https://www.tnwd.uscourts.gov/forms-and-applications.php (agj)
February 22, 2021 Filing 4 NOTICE OF CASE TRACKING ASSIGNMENT PURSUANT TO LOCAL RULE 16.2: Pursuant to Local Rule 16.2, this case has been assigned to the Standard track. http://www.tnwd.uscourts.gov/pdf/content/LocalRules.pdf (agj)
February 22, 2021 Filing 3 NOTICE TO COMPLY WITH PLAN FOR ALTERNATE DISPUTE RESOLUTION (ADR): Pursuant to Section to 2.1 of the ADR Plan, all civil cases filed on or after Sept. 1, 2014, shall be referred automatically for ADR. For compliance requirements, refer to the ADR Plan at: http://www.tnwd.uscourts.gov/pdf/content/ADRPlan.pdf (agj)
February 22, 2021 Filing 2 Judge Thomas L. Parker and Magistrate Judge Annie T. Christoff added. (agj) (agj).
February 22, 2021 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Rikki Outlaw from Shelby County Circuit Court, case number CT-0232-21 (Filing fee $ 402 receipt number ATNWDC-3550082), filed by Rikki Outlaw. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Exhibit, #3 Civil Cover Sheet)(Slager, Jennifer)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Tennessee Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Robinson v. Outlaw et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Chris Griste
Represented By: Richard Wallace Wackerfuss
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Rikki Outlaw
Represented By: Jennifer Sutch Slager
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company
Represented By: Hal S. Spragins, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mario K Robinson
Represented By: Nathan C. Williams
Represented By: David W. Hill
Represented By: Robert Deniger Cobb
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Not classified by court: Temiika Gipson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?