Ferreira v. Soares
Plaintiff: Cimara Fortes Ferreira
Defendant: Marcus Kimminau Soares
Not Classified By Court: Temiika Gipson
Case Number: 2:2021cv02127
Filed: March 3, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Tennessee
Presiding Judge: Charmiane G Claxton
Referring Judge: Thomas L Parker
Nature of Suit: Constitutional - State Statute
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 5, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 5, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER Granting Plaintiff's Motion to Remand and Remanding to the Circuit Court of Shelby County, Tennessee for the Thirtieth Judicial District. Signed by Judge Thomas L. Parker on 3/5/2021. (ljt)
March 4, 2021 Filing 8 First MOTION to Remand to State Court proposed order submitted by Cimara Fortes Ferreira. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum to remand and for atty fees, #2 Exhibit Attorney fee affidavit)(Laizure, Kathy)
March 3, 2021 Filing 7 NOTICE OF RIGHT TO CONSENT TO THE EXERCISE OF CIVIL JURISDICTION BY A MAGISTRATE JUDGE Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 636(c), Fed.R.Civ.P.73, and Local Rule 72.1, this Court has designated the Magistrate Judges of this District to conduct trials and otherwise dispose of any civil case that is filed in this Court. Your decision to consent, or not consent, to the referral of your case to a United States Magistrate Judge for trial and entry of a final judgment must be entirely voluntary. The judge or magistrate judge to whom the case has been assigned will not be informed of your decision unless all parties agree that the case may be referred to a magistrate judge for these specific purposes. A less than unanimous decision will not be communicated by this office to either the judge or magistrate judge. The consent form is available on the courts website at https://www.tnwd.uscourts.gov/forms-and-applications.php (jae)
March 3, 2021 Filing 6 NOTICE TO COMPLY WITH PLAN FOR ALTERNATE DISPUTE RESOLUTION (ADR): Pursuant to Section to 2.1 of the ADR Plan, all civil cases filed on or after Sept. 1, 2014, shall be referred automatically for ADR. For compliance requirements, refer to the ADR Plan at: http://www.tnwd.uscourts.gov/pdf/content/ADRPlan.pdf (jae)
March 3, 2021 Filing 5 NOTICE OF CASE TRACKING ASSIGNMENT PURSUANT TO LOCAL RULE 16.2: Pursuant to Local Rule 16.2, this case has been assigned to the Standard track. http://www.tnwd.uscourts.gov/pdf/content/LocalRules.pdf (jae)
March 3, 2021 Filing 4 Judge Thomas L. Parker and Magistrate Judge Charmiane G. Claxton added. (jae)
March 3, 2021 Filing 3 First MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice (Filing fee $ 150 receipt number ATNWDC-3557410) by Marcus Kimminau Soares. (Soares, Marcus)
March 3, 2021 Filing 2 First MOTION for Protective Order , First MOTION to Seal , First MOTION to Seal Case , First MOTION to Seal Document #1 Notice of Removal, by Marcus Kimminau Soares. (Soares, Marcus)
March 3, 2021 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by All Defendants Marcus Kimminau Soares from Shelby Circuit Court, case number CT-3552-20 (Filing fee $ 402 receipt number ATNWDC-3557346), filed by All Defendants. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Supplement, #3 Supplement)(Soares, Marcus)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Tennessee Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Ferreira v. Soares
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Marcus Kimminau Soares
Represented By: Marcus Kimminau Soares
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Cimara Fortes Ferreira
Represented By: Kathy L. Laizure
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Not classified by court: Temiika Gipson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?