Jacobs v. DOE-1 et al
Plaintiff: Jalysa Jacobs
Defendant: JOHN DOE-1, Sysco Corporation and Sysco Memphis, LLC
Not Classified By Court: Temiika Gipson
Case Number: 2:2021cv02150
Filed: March 11, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Tennessee
Presiding Judge: Annie T Christoff
Referring Judge: Jon Phipps McCalla
Nature of Suit: Motor Vehicle
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 20, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 20, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 23 SCHEDULING ORDER. Signed by Judge Jon Phipps McCalla on 4/20/2021. (joj)
April 19, 2021 Filing 22 NOTICE by Sysco Memphis, LLC of service of First Set of Interrogatories and Requests for Production of Documents to Plaintiff (Murrell, Jerrick)
April 15, 2021 Filing 21 SETTING LETTER: Jury Trial set for Monday, 3/14/2022 at 9:30 AM before Judge Jon Phipps McCalla. Proposed Joint Pretrial Order due by 4:30 PM on 2/25/2022. Pretrial Conference set for Monday, 3/7/2022 at 2:00 PM before Judge Jon Phipps McCalla. (jrs)
April 15, 2021 Filing 20 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Jon Phipps McCalla: TelephonicScheduling Conference held on 4/15/2021. Allen Morgan Gressett appeared for the Plaintiff. Mason Wilson appeared for the Defendant. The Court reviewed the nature of the suit and case information. The Court discussed the dates and deadlines with the parties. The Jury Trial is set for Monday, 3/14/2022 at 9:30 AM before Judge Jon Phipps McCalla. The trial is estimated to take 3 days. The Proposed Joint Pretrial Order is due by 4:30 PM on 2/25/2022. The Pretrial Conference is set for Monday, 3/7/2022 at 2:00 PM before Judge Jon Phipps McCalla. A Scheduling Order will be entered. (Court Reporter: Tina Gibson) (jrs)
April 14, 2021 Filing 19 NOTICE by Sysco Memphis, LLC of service of Rule 26(a)(1)(A) Initial Disclosures (Murrell, Jerrick)
April 8, 2021 Filing 18 NOTICE of Appearance by Jerrick D. Murrell on behalf of Sysco Memphis, LLC (Murrell, Jerrick)
April 8, 2021 Filing 17 REPORT of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting Joint Rule 26(f) Planning Report (proposed order submitted). (Wilson, Mason)
April 7, 2021 Filing 16 NOTICE by Jalysa Jacobs Serving Initial Rule 26 Disclosures (Gressett, Allen)
April 2, 2021 Filing 15 INTERROGATORIES Propounded to Sysco Memphis, LLC by All Plaintiffs.(Gressett, Allen)
April 1, 2021 Filing 14 ANSWER to Complaint with Jury Demand by Sysco Corporation.(Wilson, Mason)
March 31, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER SUBSTITUTING DEFENDANT. Sysco Memphis, LLC will be substituted for Sysco Corporation on the docket. Sysco Corporation terminated. Signed by Judge Jon Phipps McCalla on 3/31/2021. (joj)
March 25, 2021 Filing 12 MOTION to Substitute Party and Proposed Order Submitted by All Plaintiffs. (Gressett, Allen)
March 18, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER GRANTING #9 SYSCO CORPORATION'S UNOPPOSED MOTION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME TO RESPOND TO COMPLAINT. Signed by Judge Jon Phipps McCalla on 3/18/2021. (joj)
March 17, 2021 Filing 10 COURTESY NOTICE: Pursuant to Rule 5 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure, document #9 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer filed by Sysco Corporation has been filed. For future reference, please note : Filer failed to indicate in docket text "Proposed Order Submitted" as required by local rules. If no order previously emailed to chambers, please do so upon receipt of this notice. Please refer to the #ECF User Manual and #ECF Policies and Procedures. Filer is not required to resubmit document. (jae)
March 16, 2021 Filing 9 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer by Sysco Corporation. (Wilson, Mason)
March 12, 2021 Filing 8 SETTING LETTER: A Telephonic Scheduling Conference is set for Thursday, 4/15/2021 at 9:30 AM (CT) before Judge Jon Phipps McCalla. To access the telephonic conference parties will dial 888-675-2535 and enter access code 7360481. Please call at least 5 minutes in advance of the conference time. (jrs)
March 12, 2021 Filing 7 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Sysco Corporation. (Wilson, Mason)
March 12, 2021 Filing 6 COURTESY NOTICE: Pursuant to Rule 5 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure, document #1 Notice of Removal, filed by Sysco Corporation has been filed. For future reference, please note Civil cover sheet has 'wet' signature of attorney; all signatures must be electronic. Please refer to the #ECF User Manual and #ECF Policies and Procedures. Filer is not required to resubmit document. (btg)
March 12, 2021 Filing 5 NOTICE OF RIGHT TO CONSENT TO THE EXERCISE OF CIVIL JURISDICTION BY A MAGISTRATE JUDGE Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 636(c), Fed.R.Civ.P.73, and Local Rule 72.1, this Court has designated the Magistrate Judges of this District to conduct trials and otherwise dispose of any civil case that is filed in this Court. Your decision to consent, or not consent, to the referral of your case to a United States Magistrate Judge for trial and entry of a final judgment must be entirely voluntary. The judge or magistrate judge to whom the case has been assigned will not be informed of your decision unless all parties agree that the case may be referred to a magistrate judge for these specific purposes. A less than unanimous decision will not be communicated by this office to either the judge or magistrate judge. The consent form is available on the courts website at https://www.tnwd.uscourts.gov/forms-and-applications.php (btg)
March 12, 2021 Filing 4 NOTICE TO COMPLY WITH PLAN FOR ALTERNATE DISPUTE RESOLUTION (ADR): Pursuant to Section to 2.1 of the ADR Plan, all civil cases filed on or after Sept. 1, 2014, shall be referred automatically for ADR. For compliance requirements, refer to the ADR Plan at: http://www.tnwd.uscourts.gov/pdf/content/ADRPlan.pdf (btg)
March 12, 2021 Filing 3 NOTICE OF CASE TRACKING ASSIGNMENT PURSUANT TO LOCAL RULE 16.2: Pursuant to Local Rule 16.2, this case has been assigned to the Standard track. http://www.tnwd.uscourts.gov/pdf/content/LocalRules.pdf (btg)
March 11, 2021 Filing 2 Judge Jon Phipps McCalla and Magistrate Judge Annie T. Christoff added. (btg)
March 11, 2021 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Sysco Corporation from Circuit Court of Shelby County Tennessee, case number CT-0484-21 (Filing fee $ 402 receipt number ATNWDC-3564689), filed by Sysco Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit A-Complaint, #3 Exhibit B-Notice of Filing Notice of Removal)(Wilson, Mason)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Tennessee Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Jacobs v. DOE-1 et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jalysa Jacobs
Represented By: Allen Morgan Gressett
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JOHN DOE-1
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sysco Corporation
Represented By: Mason W. Wilson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sysco Memphis, LLC
Represented By: Jerrick D. Murrell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Not classified by court: Temiika Gipson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?