SouthernCarlson, Inc. v. Bird's Fastener and Tool Co., L.L.C.
Plaintiff: SouthernCarlson, Inc.
Defendant: Bird's Fastener and Tool Co., L.L.C.
Case Number: 2:2021cv02166
Filed: March 19, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Tennessee
Presiding Judge: John T Fowlkes
Referring Judge: Tu M Pham
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 12, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
May 12, 2021 Filing 12 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint, (proposed order submitted) by Bird's Fastener and Tool Co., L.L.C.. (Busey, Zachary)
April 15, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER granting Defendant's Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to Answer Plaintiff's Complaint. Signed by Judge John T. Fowlkes, Jr. on 4/15/2021. (Fowlkes, J.)
April 14, 2021 Filing 10 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint, or Otherwise Respond by Bird's Fastener and Tool Co., L.L.C.. (Busey, Zachary)
April 14, 2021 Filing 9 NOTICE of Appearance by Zachary B. Busey on behalf of Bird's Fastener and Tool Co., L.L.C. (Busey, Zachary)
March 30, 2021 Filing 8 SUMMONS Returned Executed by SouthernCarlson, Inc. as to Bird's Fastener and Tool Co., L.L.C.. (Floyd, Amanda)
March 22, 2021 Filing 7 Summons Issued as to Bird's Fastener and Tool Co., L.L.C.. The filer has been notified electronically that the summons has been issued, and the new docket entry reflects this. Upon notification of the new docket entry, the filer is to print the issued summons in order to effect service. (agj)
March 19, 2021 Filing 6 NOTICE OF RIGHT TO CONSENT TO THE EXERCISE OF CIVIL JURISDICTION BY A MAGISTRATE JUDGE Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 636(c), Fed.R.Civ.P.73, and Local Rule 72.1, this Court has designated the Magistrate Judges of this District to conduct trials and otherwise dispose of any civil case that is filed in this Court. Your decision to consent, or not consent, to the referral of your case to a United States Magistrate Judge for trial and entry of a final judgment must be entirely voluntary. The judge or magistrate judge to whom the case has been assigned will not be informed of your decision unless all parties agree that the case may be referred to a magistrate judge for these specific purposes. A less than unanimous decision will not be communicated by this office to either the judge or magistrate judge. The consent form is available on the courts website at https://www.tnwd.uscourts.gov/forms-and-applications.php (agj)
March 19, 2021 Filing 5 NOTICE OF CASE TRACKING ASSIGNMENT PURSUANT TO LOCAL RULE 16.2: Pursuant to Local Rule 16.2, this case has been assigned to the Standard track. http://www.tnwd.uscourts.gov/pdf/content/LocalRules.pdf (agj)
March 19, 2021 Filing 4 NOTICE TO COMPLY WITH PLAN FOR ALTERNATE DISPUTE RESOLUTION (ADR): Pursuant to Section to 2.1 of the ADR Plan, all civil cases filed on or after Sept. 1, 2014, shall be referred automatically for ADR. For compliance requirements, refer to the ADR Plan at: http://www.tnwd.uscourts.gov/pdf/content/ADRPlan.pdf (agj)
March 19, 2021 Filing 3 Judge John T. Fowlkes, Jr and Chief Magistrate Judge Tu M. Pham added. (agj)
March 19, 2021 Filing 2 Corporate Disclosure Statement by SouthernCarlson, Inc.. (Floyd, Amanda)
March 19, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Bird's Fastener and Tool Co., L.L.C. (Filing fee $ 402 receipt number ATNWDC-3570518), filed by SouthernCarlson, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons Summons, #3 Exhibit Exhibit A, #4 Exhibit Exhibit B, #5 Exhibit Exhibit C, #6 Exhibit Exhibit D)(Floyd, Amanda)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Tennessee Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: SouthernCarlson, Inc. v. Bird's Fastener and Tool Co., L.L.C.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: SouthernCarlson, Inc.
Represented By: Amanda Strickland Floyd
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bird's Fastener and Tool Co., L.L.C.
Represented By: Zachary B. Busey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?