Covington v. Roberts
Plaintiff: Curtis J. Covington
Defendant: Thomas Roberts and Nationwide Affinity Insurance Company of America
Not Classified By Court: Temiika Gipson
Case Number: 2:2021cv02177
Filed: March 26, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Tennessee
Presiding Judge: Annie T Christoff
Referring Judge: Mark S Norris
Nature of Suit: Motor Vehicle
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 2, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 2, 2021 Filing 12 NOTICE by Curtis J. Covington Notice of Service Responses to Roggs from Attny Jenkins (Cheek, William)
March 30, 2021 Filing 11 NOTICE of Appearance by Forrest Robert Jenkins on behalf of Nationwide Affinity Insurance Company of America (Jenkins, Forrest)
March 30, 2021 Filing 10 SETTING LETTER: Scheduling Conference set for Friday, 06/04/2021 at 10:30 AM in Courtroom 4 - Memphis before Judge Mark S. Norris. (zsf)
March 26, 2021 Filing 9 Answer of Thomas Roberts ANSWER to Complaint with Jury Demand Answer of Thomas Roberts by Thomas Roberts.(Adkins, Terrill)
March 26, 2021 Filing 8 NOTICE OF RIGHT TO CONSENT TO THE EXERCISE OF CIVIL JURISDICTION BY A MAGISTRATE JUDGE Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 636(c), Fed.R.Civ.P.73, and Local Rule 72.1, this Court has designated the Magistrate Judges of this District to conduct trials and otherwise dispose of any civil case that is filed in this Court. Your decision to consent, or not consent, to the referral of your case to a United States Magistrate Judge for trial and entry of a final judgment must be entirely voluntary. The judge or magistrate judge to whom the case has been assigned will not be informed of your decision unless all parties agree that the case may be referred to a magistrate judge for these specific purposes. A less than unanimous decision will not be communicated by this office to either the judge or magistrate judge. The consent form is available on the courts website at https://www.tnwd.uscourts.gov/forms-and-applications.php (jae)
March 26, 2021 Filing 7 NOTICE TO COMPLY WITH PLAN FOR ALTERNATE DISPUTE RESOLUTION (ADR): Pursuant to Section to 2.1 of the ADR Plan, all civil cases filed on or after Sept. 1, 2014, shall be referred automatically for ADR. For compliance requirements, refer to the ADR Plan at: http://www.tnwd.uscourts.gov/pdf/content/ADRPlan.pdf (jae)
March 26, 2021 Filing 6 NOTICE OF CASE TRACKING ASSIGNMENT PURSUANT TO LOCAL RULE 16.2: Pursuant to Local Rule 16.2, this case has been assigned to the Standard track. http://www.tnwd.uscourts.gov/pdf/content/LocalRules.pdf (jae)
March 26, 2021 Filing 5 Judge Mark S. Norris and Magistrate Judge Annie T. Christoff added. (jae)
March 26, 2021 Filing 4 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Thomas Roberts Certificate of Filing of Notice of Filing of Notice of Removal from IN THE CIRCUIT COURT OF TENNESSEE FOR THE THIRTIETH JUDICIAL DISTRICT AT MEMPHIS, case number CT-0023-21 (Filing fee $ 402 receipt number ATNWDC-3574750), filed by Thomas Roberts.(Adkins, Terrill)
March 26, 2021 Filing 3 *This is the Circuit Court Complaint* NOTICE by Terrill L. Adkins re #2 Notice (Other), #1 Notice (Other) Complaint (Adkins, Terrill) Modified on 3/26/2021 (jae).
March 26, 2021 Filing 2 NOTICE by Terrill L. Adkins re #1 Notice (Other) Certificate of Filing of Notice of Filing of Notice of Removal (Adkins, Terrill)
March 26, 2021 Filing 1 NOTICE by Terrill L. Adkins Civil Cover Sheet (Adkins, Terrill)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Tennessee Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Covington v. Roberts
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Thomas Roberts
Represented By: Terrill L. Adkins
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Nationwide Affinity Insurance Company of America
Represented By: Forrest Robert Jenkins
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Curtis J. Covington
Represented By: William David Cheek
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Not classified by court: Temiika Gipson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?