Trugreen Limited Partnership v. Steitz, Jr. et al
Plaintiff: Trugreen Limited Partnership
Defendant: Kevin Smith, Mathew VanHouten, James Stryker and James Steitz, Jr.
Case Number: 2:2021cv02251
Filed: April 20, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Tennessee
Presiding Judge: Sheryl H Lipman
Referring Judge: Tu M Pham
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 15, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 15, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 18 ORDER GRANTING SECOND UNOPPOSED MOTION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME #17 . Signed by Judge Sheryl H. Lipman on 6/15/21. (shl)
June 11, 2021 Filing 17 Consent MOTION to Extend Deadline to Answer or Otherwise Respond (PROPOSED ORDER SUBMITTED) by Kevin Smith, James Steitz, Jr., James Stryker, Mathew VanHouten. (Feibelman, Jef)
May 7, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER GRANTING UNOPPOSED MOTION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME #15 . Signed by Judge Sheryl H. Lipman on 5/7/21. (shl)
May 7, 2021 Filing 15 Consent MOTION to Extend Deadline to Answer or Otherwise Respond to Plaintiff's Complaint (PROPOSED ORDER SUBMITTED) by All Defendants. (Feibelman, Jef)
May 5, 2021 Filing 14 NOTICE of Appearance by William David Irvine on behalf of All Defendants (Irvine, William)
May 4, 2021 Filing 13 NOTICE of Appearance by Jef Feibelman on behalf of All Defendants (Feibelman, Jef)
April 23, 2021 Filing 12 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Trugreen Limited Partnership as to Mathew VanHouten. (Mathis, Andre)
April 23, 2021 Filing 11 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Trugreen Limited Partnership as to Kevin Smith. (Mathis, Andre)
April 23, 2021 Filing 10 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Trugreen Limited Partnership as to James Stryker. (Mathis, Andre)
April 23, 2021 Filing 9 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Trugreen Limited Partnership as to James Steitz, Jr.. (Mathis, Andre)
April 21, 2021 Filing 8 NOTICE of Appearance by Yasmin A. Mohammad on behalf of Trugreen Limited Partnership (Mohammad, Yasmin)
April 21, 2021 Filing 7 NOTICE of Appearance by Jennifer Svilar on behalf of Trugreen Limited Partnership (Svilar, Jennifer)
April 21, 2021 Filing 6 Summons Issued as to Kevin Smith, James Steitz, Jr., James Stryker, Mathew VanHouten. The filer has been notified electronically that the summons has been issued, and the new docket entry reflects this. Upon notification of the new docket entry, the filer is to print the issued summons in order to effect service. (Attachments: #1 summons, #2 summons, #3 summons)(jae)
April 21, 2021 Filing 5 NOTICE OF RIGHT TO CONSENT TO THE EXERCISE OF CIVIL JURISDICTION BY A MAGISTRATE JUDGE Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 636(c), Fed.R.Civ.P.73, and Local Rule 72.1, this Court has designated the Magistrate Judges of this District to conduct trials and otherwise dispose of any civil case that is filed in this Court. Your decision to consent, or not consent, to the referral of your case to a United States Magistrate Judge for trial and entry of a final judgment must be entirely voluntary. The judge or magistrate judge to whom the case has been assigned will not be informed of your decision unless all parties agree that the case may be referred to a magistrate judge for these specific purposes. A less than unanimous decision will not be communicated by this office to either the judge or magistrate judge. The consent form is available on the courts website at https://www.tnwd.uscourts.gov/forms-and-applications.php (jae)
April 21, 2021 Filing 4 NOTICE TO COMPLY WITH PLAN FOR ALTERNATE DISPUTE RESOLUTION (ADR): Pursuant to Section to 2.1 of the ADR Plan, all civil cases filed on or after Sept. 1, 2014, shall be referred automatically for ADR. For compliance requirements, refer to the ADR Plan at: http://www.tnwd.uscourts.gov/pdf/content/ADRPlan.pdf (jae)
April 21, 2021 Filing 3 NOTICE OF CASE TRACKING ASSIGNMENT PURSUANT TO LOCAL RULE 16.2: Pursuant to Local Rule 16.2, this case has been assigned to the Standard track. http://www.tnwd.uscourts.gov/pdf/content/LocalRules.pdf (jae)
April 20, 2021 Filing 2 Judge Sheryl H. Lipman and Chief Magistrate Judge Tu M. Pham added. (jae)
April 20, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT (Verified) for Declaratory, Injunctive & Monetary Relief against Kevin Smith, James Steitz, Jr., James Stryker, Mathew VanHouten (Filing fee $ 402 receipt number ATNWDC-3592158), filed by Trugreen Limited Partnership. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Civil Cover Sheet, #6 Summons -James Steitz, Jr., #7 Summons -Mathew VanHouten, #8 Summons -James Stryker, #9 Summons -Kevin Smith)(Mathis, Andre)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Tennessee Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Trugreen Limited Partnership v. Steitz, Jr. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kevin Smith
Represented By: Jef Feibelman
Represented By: William David Irvine
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mathew VanHouten
Represented By: Jef Feibelman
Represented By: William David Irvine
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: James Stryker
Represented By: Jef Feibelman
Represented By: William David Irvine
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: James Steitz, Jr.
Represented By: Jef Feibelman
Represented By: William David Irvine
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Trugreen Limited Partnership
Represented By: Andre B. Mathis
Represented By: Jennifer Svilar
Represented By: Yasmin A. Mohammad
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?