Wright Medical Technology, Inc. et al v. Allman et al
Plaintiff: Wright Medical Technology, Inc. and Wright Medical Group, Inc.
Defendant: 608 Surgical, LLC, Nathan Allman, 540 Surgical, LLC, Medline Industries, Inc. and Brock Boynton
Case Number: 2:2021cv02364
Filed: June 1, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Tennessee
Presiding Judge: Charmiane G Claxton
Referring Judge: Thomas L Parker
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1330
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 6, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 6, 2021 Filing 41 NOTICE ON CANCELLATION - of Hearing re: #19 Motion for Expedite Discovery set for 7/7/21 at 2:00 PM. (mlk)
July 6, 2021 Filing 40 NOTICE OF FILING OF OFFICIAL TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings held on June 17, 2021 before Judge Thomas L. Parker. Court Reporter Catherine J. Phillips, Telephone number 901-495-1535. Notice is hereby given that an official transcript of a proceeding has been filed by the court reporter in this matter. The parties have seven (7) calendar days to file with the court a Notice of Intent to Request Redaction of this transcript, and twenty-one (21) calendar days to file a Request for Redaction. Redaction is the responsibility of the attorneys and pro se litigants who attended the hearing to which the transcription applies. Each party is responsible for reviewing and requesting redaction of testimony of witnesses that were called for the party and for that party's own statements. Any party needing a copy of the transcript to review for redaction purposes may purchase a copy from the court reporter or view the document at the clerk's office public terminal.. Notice of Intent to Request Redaction due 7/12/2021. Redaction Request due 7/27/2021. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 10/4/2021. (cjp)
July 1, 2021 Filing 39 JUDGMENT and Permanent Injunction. Signed by Judge Thomas L. Parker on 7/1/2021. (ljt)
July 1, 2021 Filing 38 SEALED JUDGMENT and Permanent Injunction. Signed by Judge Thomas L. Parker on 7/1/2021. (ljt)
July 1, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 37 [**TEXT ORDER ONLY--NO DOCUMENT ATTACHED**] The parties jointly move the Court to enter an agreed joint judgment and permanent injunction. (ECF No. #36 at PageID 276.) For good cause shown, the Court GRANTS the parties' motion. The Court will enter both a sealed version and a public version of the parties' agreed joint judgment and permanent injunction. Signed by Judge Thomas L. Parker on 7/1/2021. (ljt)
July 1, 2021 Filing 36 Joint MOTION for Permanent Injunction and Judgment, proposed order submitted by Wright Medical Group, Inc., Wright Medical Technology, Inc.. (Wilson, Cecil)
June 23, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 35 Stipulated Order Setting Discovery and Other Deadlines. Signed by Judge Thomas L. Parker on 6/23/2021. (ljt)
June 23, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 34 [**TEXT ORDER ONLY--NO DOCUMENT ATTACHED**] The parties jointly move the Court to enter a Stipulated Order Setting Discovery and Other Deadlines. (ECF No. #33 .) For good cause shown, the Court GRANTS the parties' motion. The Court will enter the parties' stipulated order in a separate docket entry. Signed by Judge Thomas L. Parker on 6/23/2021. (ljt)
June 23, 2021 Filing 33 Consent MOTION Consent Motion for Entry of Proposed Order Setting Discovery and Other Deadlines Proposed Order Submitted by All Defendants. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Proposed Order)(Alpert, Jeremy)
June 23, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 32 ORDER Granting #30 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Signed by Judge Thomas L. Parker on 6/23/2021. (ljt)
June 23, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 31 ORDER Granting #27 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Signed by Judge Thomas L. Parker on 6/23/2021. (ljt)
June 23, 2021 Filing 30 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice (proposed Order submitted) (Filing fee $ 150 receipt number ATNWDC-3638089) by All Defendants. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Good Standing, #2 Certificate of Good Standing)(Satterwhite, Rodney)
June 23, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 29 Protective and Confidentiality Order. Signed by Judge Thomas L. Parker on 6/23/2021. (ljt) (Main Document 29 replaced on 6/23/2021) (ljt).
June 23, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 28 [**TEXT ORDER ONLY--NO DOCUMENT ATTACHED**] The parties jointly move for a Protective and Confidentiality Order regarding confidential information exchanged during discovery. (ECF No. #26 .) For good cause shown, the Court GRANTS the parties' motion. The Court will enter the parties' proposed Protective and Confidentiality Order in a separate docket entry. Signed by Judge Thomas L. Parker on 6/23/2021. (ljt)
June 23, 2021 Filing 27 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Elizabeth P. Redpath (Fee paid as part of previous filing) by 540 Surgical, LLC, 608 Surgical, LLC, Nathan Allman, Brock Boynton, Medline Industries, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 EDVa Certificate of Good Standing, #2 Supreme Court of Va Certificate of Good Standing)(Redpath, Elizabeth)
June 22, 2021 Filing 26 Joint MOTION for Protective Order proposed order submitted by Wright Medical Group, Inc., Wright Medical Technology, Inc.. (Gola, Akhil)
June 22, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 25 [**TEXT ORDER ONLY--NO DOCUMENT ATTACHED**] Defendants Nathan Allman, Brock Boynton, 540 Surgical, LLC, 608 Surgical, LLC, and Medline Industries, Inc., move for an extension of time to respond to Plaintiffs' complaint. (See ECF No. #24 .) Plaintiffs do not oppose the motion. (Id. at PageID 212-13.) For good cause shown, the Court GRANTS the motion. Defendant Medline has through July 23, 2021, to respond to Plaintiffs' complaint. And the other Defendants have through July 26, 2021, to respond. Signed by Judge Thomas L. Parker on 6/22/2021. (ljt)
June 21, 2021 Filing 24 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer Proposed Order Submitted by All Defendants. (Alpert, Jeremy)
June 21, 2021 Filing 23 SETTING LETTER - TEXT ONLY, NO IMAGE ATTACHED: Hearing re: #19 Motion to Expedite Discovery Hearing set for 7/7/2021 at 02:00 PM before Judge Thomas L. Parker. The proceeding will be done via Microsoft Teams video conference. The Court will email the parties an invitation for the video conference prior to the proceeding.Counsel should submit any exhibits to be offered to the Judge's ECF mailbox prior to the proceeding.The public may also access the video proceeding. If the public and/or media wish to attend in the video proceeding, please click on the following link to request access information: #https://www.tnwd.uscourts.gov/videohearings The access information will be delivered via email to the email address from which the request originated.Parties should consult the instructions for #Joining a Meeting in Teams or #Joining a Meeting Without a Teams Account. Please email Milton Knox at milton_knox@tnwd.uscourts.gov for any questions.(mlk)
June 17, 2021 Filing 22 Minute Entry for Status Conference held via Teams before Judge Thomas L. Parker on 6/17/2021, Cecil Wilson and Akhil Gola appeared for the Plaintiff and Jeremy Alpert and Rod Satterwhite appeared for the Defendants. Defendants have been served. Defendants do not oppose Discovery prior to hearing; however, three of the five Defendants question jurisdiction. Plaintiff would like: 1) to request documents from defendants Nathan Allman and Brock Boynton and 2)Sales records, invoices, communication with Medline and customers. Hearing on Motion to Expedite Discovery set for 7/7/2021 at 02:00 PM in Courtroom 2 - Memphis before Judge Thomas L. Parker. (Court Reporter, Catherine Phillips) (mlk) Modified on 6/22/2021 (Parker, Thomas).
June 17, 2021 Filing 21 NOTICE of Appearance by Jeremy G. Alpert on behalf of All Defendants (Alpert, Jeremy)
June 14, 2021 Filing 20 SETTING LETTER - TEXT ONLY, NO IMAGE ATTACHED; Status Conference set for 6/17/2021 at 03:00 PM before Judge Thomas L. Parker. p>The proceeding will be done via Microsoft Teams video conference. The Court will email the parties an invitation for the video conference prior to the proceeding.Counsel should submit any exhibits to be offered to the Judge's ECF mailbox prior to the proceeding.The public may also access the video proceeding. If the public and/or media wish to attend in the video proceeding, please click on the following link to request access information: #https://www.tnwd.uscourts.gov/videohearings The access information will be delivered via email to the email address from which the request originated.Parties should consult the instructions for #Joining a Meeting in Teams or #Joining a Meeting Without a Teams Account. Please email Milton Knox at milton_knox@tnwd.uscourts.gov for any questions. (mlk)
June 10, 2021 Filing 19 MOTION to Expedite Discovery and proposed order submitted by Wright Medical Group, Inc., Wright Medical Technology, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum, #2 Exhibit, #3 Exhibit)(Wilson, Cecil)
June 10, 2021 Filing 18 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction and proposed order submitted by Wright Medical Group, Inc., Wright Medical Technology, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum, #2 Exhibit, #3 Exhibit, #4 Exhibit, #5 Exhibit, #6 Exhibit, #7 Exhibit, #8 Exhibit)(Wilson, Cecil)
June 10, 2021 Filing 17 NOTICE of Appearance by Akhil Gola on behalf of Wright Medical Group, Inc., Wright Medical Technology, Inc. (Gola, Akhil)
June 10, 2021 Filing 16 AFFIDAVIT of Service for Summons and Complaint served on Brock Boynton on 06/04/2021, filed by Wright Medical Group, Inc., Wright Medical Technology, Inc.. (Wilson, Cecil)
June 10, 2021 Filing 15 AFFIDAVIT of Service for Summons and Complaint served on Nathan Allman on 06/04/2021, filed by Wright Medical Group, Inc., Wright Medical Technology, Inc.. (Wilson, Cecil)
June 10, 2021 Filing 14 AFFIDAVIT of Service for Summons and Complaint served on 540 Surgical, LLC on 06/04/2021, filed by Wright Medical Group, Inc., Wright Medical Technology, Inc.. (Wilson, Cecil)
June 10, 2021 Filing 13 AFFIDAVIT of Service for Summons and Complaint served on 608 Surgical, LLC on 06/03/2021, filed by Wright Medical Group, Inc., Wright Medical Technology, Inc.. (Wilson, Cecil)
June 4, 2021 Filing 12 AFFIDAVIT of Service for Complaint and Exhibits served on Medline Industries, Inc. on 06/02/2021, filed by Wright Medical Group, Inc., Wright Medical Technology, Inc.. (Wilson, Cecil)
June 2, 2021 Filing 11 Summons Issued as to Medline Industries, Inc.. The filer has been notified electronically that the summons has been issued, and the new docket entry reflects this. Upon notification of the new docket entry, the filer is to print the issued summons in order to effect service. (agj)
June 2, 2021 Filing 10 Summons Issued as to Brock Boynton. The filer has been notified electronically that the summons has been issued, and the new docket entry reflects this. Upon notification of the new docket entry, the filer is to print the issued summons in order to effect service. (agj)
June 2, 2021 Filing 9 Summons Issued as to Nathan Allman. The filer has been notified electronically that the summons has been issued, and the new docket entry reflects this. Upon notification of the new docket entry, the filer is to print the issued summons in order to effect service. (agj)
June 2, 2021 Filing 8 Summons Issued as to 608 Surgical, LLC. The filer has been notified electronically that the summons has been issued, and the new docket entry reflects this. Upon notification of the new docket entry, the filer is to print the issued summons in order to effect service. (agj)
June 2, 2021 Filing 7 Summons Issued as to 540 Surgical, LLC. The filer has been notified electronically that the summons has been issued, and the new docket entry reflects this. Upon notification of the new docket entry, the filer is to print the issued summons in order to effect service. (agj)
June 1, 2021 Filing 6 NOTICE OF RIGHT TO CONSENT TO THE EXERCISE OF CIVIL JURISDICTION BY A MAGISTRATE JUDGE Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 636(c), Fed.R.Civ.P.73, and Local Rule 72.1, this Court has designated the Magistrate Judges of this District to conduct trials and otherwise dispose of any civil case that is filed in this Court. Your decision to consent, or not consent, to the referral of your case to a United States Magistrate Judge for trial and entry of a final judgment must be entirely voluntary. The judge or magistrate judge to whom the case has been assigned will not be informed of your decision unless all parties agree that the case may be referred to a magistrate judge for these specific purposes. A less than unanimous decision will not be communicated by this office to either the judge or magistrate judge. The consent form is available on the courts website at https://www.tnwd.uscourts.gov/forms-and-applications.php (agj)
June 1, 2021 Filing 5 NOTICE OF CASE TRACKING ASSIGNMENT PURSUANT TO LOCAL RULE 16.2: Pursuant to Local Rule 16.2, this case has been assigned to the Standard track. http://www.tnwd.uscourts.gov/pdf/content/LocalRules.pdf (agj)
June 1, 2021 Filing 4 NOTICE TO COMPLY WITH PLAN FOR ALTERNATE DISPUTE RESOLUTION (ADR): Pursuant to Section to 2.1 of the ADR Plan, all civil cases filed on or after Sept. 1, 2014, shall be referred automatically for ADR. For compliance requirements, refer to the ADR Plan at: http://www.tnwd.uscourts.gov/pdf/content/ADRPlan.pdf (agj)
June 1, 2021 Filing 3 Judge Thomas L. Parker and Magistrate Judge Charmiane G. Claxton added. (agj)
June 1, 2021 Filing 2 NOTICE by Wright Medical Group, Inc., Wright Medical Technology, Inc. Corporate Disclosure Statement (Wilson, Cecil)
June 1, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants (Filing fee $ 402 receipt number ATNWDC-3621895), filed by All Plaintiffs. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons 540 Surgical, LLC, #3 Summons 608 Surgical, LLC, #4 Summons Allman, #5 Summons Boynton, #6 Summons Medline, #7 Exhibit 1 to Complaint - Allman Contract, #8 Exhibit 2 to Complaint - Boynton Contract)(Wilson, Cecil)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Tennessee Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Wright Medical Technology, Inc. et al v. Allman et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: 608 Surgical, LLC
Represented By: Elizabeth Redpath
Represented By: Jeremy G. Alpert
Represented By: Rodney Allen Satterwhite
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Nathan Allman
Represented By: Elizabeth Redpath
Represented By: Jeremy G. Alpert
Represented By: Rodney Allen Satterwhite
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: 540 Surgical, LLC
Represented By: Elizabeth Redpath
Represented By: Jeremy G. Alpert
Represented By: Rodney Allen Satterwhite
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Medline Industries, Inc.
Represented By: Elizabeth Redpath
Represented By: Jeremy G. Alpert
Represented By: Rodney Allen Satterwhite
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Brock Boynton
Represented By: Elizabeth Redpath
Represented By: Jeremy G. Alpert
Represented By: Rodney Allen Satterwhite
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Wright Medical Technology, Inc.
Represented By: Cecil Bryan Wilson
Represented By: Akhil Gola
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Wright Medical Group, Inc.
Represented By: Cecil Bryan Wilson
Represented By: Akhil Gola
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?