Stanley v. Old Dominion Freight Line, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Bryan Stanley
Defendant: John Does 1-5, Old Dominion Freight Line, Inc. and Isaac Stovall
Case Number: 2:2021cv02369
Filed: June 3, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Tennessee
Presiding Judge: Annie T Christoff
Referring Judge: Jon Phipps McCalla
Nature of Suit: Motor Vehicle
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 14, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 14, 2021 Filing 24 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Proposed Order Submitted (Fee paid as part of previous filing) by Bryan Stanley. (Moore, John)
July 13, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 23 ORDER GRANTING #7 Motion for Leave. Signed by Judge Jon Phipps McCalla on 7/13/2021. (pa)
July 13, 2021 Filing 22 SETTING LETTER: A Telephonic Scheduling Conference is set for Monday, 8/9/2021 at 11:00 AM before Judge Jon Phipps McCalla. To access the telephonic conference parties will dial 888-675-2535 and enter access code 7360481. Please call at least 5 minutes in advance of the conference time. (jrs)
July 8, 2021 Filing 21 DEFICIENCY NOTICE: Pursuant to Rule 5 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure, document #20 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice John A. Moore (Filing fee $ 150 receipt number ATNWDC-3649344) filed by Bryan Stanley has been filed. However, the following deficiency has been found: Attorneys are required to file their own PHV motion. This motion will be termed pending correct submission. Please have them select "Fee paid as part of pervious submission" when asked. Please review the instructions on our website for. Please refer to the #ECF User Manual and #ECF Policies and Procedures. The filer has one business day to correct the deficiency. (jae)
July 8, 2021 Filing 20 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice John A. Moore (Filing fee $ 150 receipt number ATNWDC-3649344) by Bryan Stanley. (Manis, Howard)
July 8, 2021 Filing 19 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Old Dominion Freight Line, Inc.. (Wyatt, Carl)
July 2, 2021 Filing 18 ANSWER to #13 Amended Complaint by Old Dominion Freight Line, Inc., Isaac Stovall.(Wyatt, Carl)
July 1, 2021 Filing 17 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Bryan Stanley as to Old Dominion Freight Line, Inc.. (Manis, Howard)
June 29, 2021 Filing 16 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Bryan Stanley as to Isaac Stovall. (Manis, Howard)
June 24, 2021 Filing 15 Summons Issued as to Isaac Stovall. The filer has been notified electronically that the summons has been issued, and the new docket entry reflects this. Upon notification of the new docket entry, the filer is to print the issued summons in order to effect service. (jae)
June 24, 2021 Filing 14 Summons Reissued as to Old Dominion Freight Line, Inc.. The filer has been notified electronically that the summons has been issued, and the new docket entry reflects this. Upon notification of the new docket entry, the filer is to print the issued summons in order to effect service. (jae)
June 23, 2021 Filing 13 AMENDED COMPLAINT for Damages against Old Dominion Freight Line, Inc., Isaac Stovall, filed by Bryan Stanley. (Attachments: #1 Summons to Old Dominion Freight Line, Inc., #2 Summons to Isaac Stovall)(Manis, Howard)
June 23, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER GRANTING #8 Unopposed Motion to Add and Drop Parties. */ TEXT GRANT ONLY - NO PDF */ Signed by Judge Jon Phipps McCalla on 6/23/2021. (pa)
June 22, 2021 Filing 11 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Bryan Stanley as to Old Dominion Freight Line, Inc.. (Manis, Howard)
June 22, 2021 Filing 10 RESPONSE in Opposition re #7 MOTION for Leave to File Propound and Serve Special Interrogatories filed by Old Dominion Freight Line, Inc.. (Wyatt, Carl)
June 22, 2021 Filing 9 NOTICE of Appearance by Carl Wyatt on behalf of Old Dominion Freight Line, Inc. (Wyatt, Carl)
June 15, 2021 Filing 8 MOTION Motion to Add and Drop Parties pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. 21 (unopposed) (Proposed order submitted) by Bryan Stanley. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit First Amended Complaint)(Manis, Howard)
June 8, 2021 Filing 7 MOTION for Leave to File Propound and Serve Special Interrogatories by Bryan Stanley. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Plaintiff's Special Interrogatories to Defendant Old Dominion, #2 Exhibit B - Proposed Order)(Manis, Howard)
June 3, 2021 Filing 6 Summons Issued as to Old Dominion Freight Line, Inc.. The filer has been notified electronically that the summons has been issued, and the new docket entry reflects this. Upon notification of the new docket entry, the filer is to print the issued summons in order to effect service. (jae)
June 3, 2021 Filing 5 NOTICE OF RIGHT TO CONSENT TO THE EXERCISE OF CIVIL JURISDICTION BY A MAGISTRATE JUDGE Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 636(c), Fed.R.Civ.P.73, and Local Rule 72.1, this Court has designated the Magistrate Judges of this District to conduct trials and otherwise dispose of any civil case that is filed in this Court. Your decision to consent, or not consent, to the referral of your case to a United States Magistrate Judge for trial and entry of a final judgment must be entirely voluntary. The judge or magistrate judge to whom the case has been assigned will not be informed of your decision unless all parties agree that the case may be referred to a magistrate judge for these specific purposes. A less than unanimous decision will not be communicated by this office to either the judge or magistrate judge. The consent form is available on the courts website at https://www.tnwd.uscourts.gov/forms-and-applications.php (jae)
June 3, 2021 Filing 4 NOTICE TO COMPLY WITH PLAN FOR ALTERNATE DISPUTE RESOLUTION (ADR): Pursuant to Section to 2.1 of the ADR Plan, all civil cases filed on or after Sept. 1, 2014, shall be referred automatically for ADR. For compliance requirements, refer to the ADR Plan at: http://www.tnwd.uscourts.gov/pdf/content/ADRPlan.pdf (jae)
June 3, 2021 Filing 3 NOTICE OF CASE TRACKING ASSIGNMENT PURSUANT TO LOCAL RULE 16.2: Pursuant to Local Rule 16.2, this case has been assigned to the Standard track. http://www.tnwd.uscourts.gov/pdf/content/LocalRules.pdf (jae)
June 3, 2021 Filing 2 Judge Jon Phipps McCalla and Magistrate Judge Annie T. Christoff added. (jae)
June 3, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT for Damages against All Defendants (Filing fee $ 402 receipt number ATNWDC-3623803), filed by Bryan Stanley. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons Old Dominion Freight Line, Inc., #3 Summons John Does 1-5)(Manis, Howard)
June 3, 2021 NOTICE re #1 Complaint: Summons for John Does 1-5 cannot be issued. Once identity of these John Does is discovered, filer may file an amended complaint and attach summons for the John Doe. (jae)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Tennessee Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Stanley v. Old Dominion Freight Line, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Does 1-5
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Old Dominion Freight Line, Inc.
Represented By: Carl Wyatt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Isaac Stovall
Represented By: Carl Wyatt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Bryan Stanley
Represented By: Howard Brett Manis
Represented By: John Moore
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?