Millennium Outdoors, LLC v. The Wise Company, Inc.
Plaintiff: Millennium Outdoors, LLC
Defendant: The Wise Company, Inc.
Case Number: 2:2021cv02388
Filed: June 10, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Tennessee
Presiding Judge: Jon Phipps McCalla
Referring Judge: Thomas L Parker
2 Judge: Tu M Pham
Nature of Suit: Patent
Cause of Action: 35 U.S.C. ยง 271
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 5, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 5, 2021 Filing 17 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice of Angela Holt on behalf of Millenium Outdoors, LLC (Filing fee $ 150 receipt number ATNWDC-3672043) by Millennium Outdoors, LLC. (Holt, Angela)
August 4, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER GRANTING #15 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. */ TEXT GRANT ONLY - NO PDF */ Signed by Judge Jon Phipps McCalla on 8/4/2021. (pa)
August 3, 2021 Filing 15 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice (proposed order submitted) (Filing fee $ 150 receipt number ATNWDC-3670217) by The Wise Company, Inc.. (DeLoach, Juanita)
July 22, 2021 Filing 14 SETTING LETTER: A Telephonic Scheduling Conference has been set for Monday, 8/16/2021 at 9:30 AM before Judge Jon Phipps McCalla. To access the telephonic conference parties will dial 888-675-2535 and enter access code 7360481. Please call at least 5 minutes in advance of the conference time. (jrs)
July 21, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER GRANTING #12 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. */ TEXT GRANT ONLY - NO PDF */ Signed by Judge Jon Phipps McCalla on 7/21/2021. (pa)
July 16, 2021 Filing 12 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer (proposed order submitted) by The Wise Company, Inc.. (Jenkins, Mark)
July 16, 2021 Filing 11 Corporate Disclosure Statement by The Wise Company, Inc.. (Jenkins, Mark)
July 15, 2021 Filing 10 NOTICE of Appearance by Mark David Jenkins on behalf of The Wise Company, Inc. (Jenkins, Mark)
June 10, 2021 Filing 9 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Millennium Outdoors, LLC. (Gipson, Jake)
June 10, 2021 Filing 8 Summons Issued as to The Wise Company, Inc.. The filer has been notified electronically that the summons has been issued, and the new docket entry reflects this. Upon notification of the new docket entry, the filer is to print the issued summons in order to effect service. (agj)
June 10, 2021 Filing 7 Report to the Commissioner of Patents and Trademarks for Patent/Trademark Number(s) D727, 046 S; D727, 047 S; . (Gipson, Jake)
June 10, 2021 Filing 6 NOTICE OF RIGHT TO CONSENT TO THE EXERCISE OF CIVIL JURISDICTION BY A MAGISTRATE JUDGE Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 636(c), Fed.R.Civ.P.73, and Local Rule 72.1, this Court has designated the Magistrate Judges of this District to conduct trials and otherwise dispose of any civil case that is filed in this Court. Your decision to consent, or not consent, to the referral of your case to a United States Magistrate Judge for trial and entry of a final judgment must be entirely voluntary. The judge or magistrate judge to whom the case has been assigned will not be informed of your decision unless all parties agree that the case may be referred to a magistrate judge for these specific purposes. A less than unanimous decision will not be communicated by this office to either the judge or magistrate judge. The consent form is available on the courts website at https://www.tnwd.uscourts.gov/forms-and-applications.php (agj)
June 10, 2021 Filing 5 NOTICE OF CASE TRACKING ASSIGNMENT PURSUANT TO LOCAL RULE 16.2: Pursuant to Local Rule 16.2, this case has been assigned to the Standard track. http://www.tnwd.uscourts.gov/pdf/content/LocalRules.pdf (agj)
June 10, 2021 Filing 4 NOTICE TO COMPLY WITH PLAN FOR ALTERNATE DISPUTE RESOLUTION (ADR): Pursuant to Section to 2.1 of the ADR Plan, all civil cases filed on or after Sept. 1, 2014, shall be referred automatically for ADR. For compliance requirements, refer to the ADR Plan at: http://www.tnwd.uscourts.gov/pdf/content/ADRPlan.pdf (agj)
June 10, 2021 Filing 3 Judge Jon P. McCalla and Chief Magistrate Judge Tu M. Pham added. (agj) (Main Document 3 replaced on 6/11/2021) (agj).
June 10, 2021 Filing 2 NOTICE of Summons by Jake M Gipson on behalf of Millennium Outdoors, LLC. (Gipson, Jake)
June 10, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against The Wise Company, Inc. (Filing fee $ 402 receipt number ATNWDC-3629324), filed by Millennium Outdoors, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A through D to Complaint, #2 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet)(Gipson, Jake)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Tennessee Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Millennium Outdoors, LLC v. The Wise Company, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Millennium Outdoors, LLC
Represented By: Jake M Gipson
Represented By: Angela Holt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The Wise Company, Inc.
Represented By: Mark David Jenkins
Represented By: Juanita DeLoach
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?