Roker v. Twentieth Century Fox et al
Plaintiff: Damond J. Roker, Sr. d/b/a Bishop DJ Roker also known as D.J. Roker and D.J. Roker
Defendant: Fox Broadcasting Company/Fox Television Stations, Inc. d/b/a WHBQ-TV/Fox 13 (Memphis), Cox Media Group Northeast, LLC d/b/a WHBQ-TV, FOX 13, Fox Channel 13 (Mempis), Fox Television Stations, Inc. d/b/a Fox Channel 13(Fox 13) doing business as WHBQ-TV, Brett Fennell, News Corporation, Kim Guthrie, Jean C. Fuentes, Twentieth Century Fox, Fox Broadcasting Company, Cox Media Group, Inc. d/b/a WHBQ-TV, Fox 13 News doing business as WHBQ-TV, Fox 13 and Fox Entertainment Group
Case Number: 2:2021cv02411
Filed: June 16, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Tennessee
Presiding Judge: Samuel H Mays
Referring Judge: Tu M Pham
Nature of Suit: Mandamus & Other
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 21, 2023. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 7, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 147 Order Amending #134 ECF No. 134 Pursuant to #144 ECF No. 144, signed by Judge Samuel H. Mays, Jr. on 03/07/2023. (Mays, Samuel) (Main Document 147 replaced on 3/7/2023) (jpo).
March 7, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 146 USCA JUDGMENT as to #136 Notice of Appeal filed by Damond J. Roker, Sr. ENTRY OF JUDGMENT. COA case number 23-5067. (csf)
March 7, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 145 ORDER of USCA as to #136 Notice of Appeal filed by Damond J. Roker, Sr. ORDER filed to dismiss case for lack of jurisdiction. No mandate to issue, decision not for publication. COA case number 23-5067. (csf) (Main Document 145 replaced on 3/7/2023) (jpo). (Main Document 145 replaced on 3/8/2023) (csf).
March 6, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 148 MOTION for Leave to File a Response in Objection to Defendant WHBQ (Memphis) LLC's Motion and/or Reply in Support of It's Motion for Reconsideration by Damond J. Roker, Sr. (Attachments: #1 proposed Response, #2 envelope)(agj)
March 1, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 144 ORDER granting #138 Motion to Amend/Correct, signed by Judge Samuel H. Mays, Jr. on 03/1/2023. (Mays, Samuel)
February 21, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 143 MOTION for Leave to File a Reply in Support of its Motion for Reconsideration by Cox Media Group Northeast, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A to Motion - Reply in Support of Motion for Reconsideration, #2 Exhibit A to Reply - Declaration)(Drummond, Alexandre)
February 14, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 142 PRO SERESPONSE in Opposition re #140 MOTION for Reconsideration re #134 Order filed by Damond J. Roker, Sr. (Attachments: #1 envelope)(jae)
February 6, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 141 NOTICE to the clerk as to pending motions by Damond J. Roker, Sr (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 envelope)(jae)
January 30, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 140 MOTION for Reconsideration re #134 Order by Cox Media Group Northeast, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Declaration of Eric Dodson Greenberg)(Drummond, Alexandre)
January 26, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 139 USCA Case Number 23-2067 for #136 Notice of Appeal filed by Damond J. Roker, Sr.. Case held in abeyance pending a ruling on the motion to amend/correct filed in the district court on 1/24/2023 RE #138. (agj)
January 23, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 138 PRO SE MOTION to Amend/Correct #134 Order and Judgment to correct clerical mistakes by Damond J. Roker, Sr. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 envelope)(jae)
January 20, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 137 PRO SE MOTION for Leave to Appeal in forma pauperis by Damond J. Roker, Sr. (Attachments: #1 trust fund statement, #2 envelope)(jae)
January 20, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 136 NOTICE OF APPEAL as to #133 Order on Motion to Dismiss, Order on Sealed Motion, Order on Motion to Compel, Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief, by Damond J. Roker, Sr. (Attachments: #1 envelope)(jae)
January 13, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 135 Letter from Damond Roker, Sr requesting status of request for docket sheet, status of motion for entry of default and status of refund of overpayment of filing fees. (Attachments: #1 envelope) (jae)
January 9, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 134 ORDER Dismissing Federal Claims against all Defendants with Prejudice and Granting Leave to Amend the State-law claims, signed by Judge Samuel H. Mays, Jr. on 01/09/2023. (Mays, Samuel)
January 6, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 133 ORDER granting #64 WHBQ (Memphis) LLC's Motion to Dismiss; granting #65 WHBQ (Memphis) LLC's Sealed Motion; denying #83 Roker's Motion to Compel; granting #114 Roker's Motion to Recognize; granting #120 Roker's Motion to treat ECF No. 40 as the Operative Complaint; and denying #131 Roker's Motion to Incorporate, signed by Judge Samuel H. Mays, Jr. on 01/06/2023. (Mays, Samuel)
November 23, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 132 PRO SE MOTION to Appoint Counsel by Damond J. Roker, Sr. (Attachments: #1 envelope)(jae) (Main Document 132 replaced on 11/29/2022) (jae).
November 23, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 131 PRO SE MOTION to incorporate by reference the recent sixth circuit decision, an intervening change of controlling law specifically addressing the ripeness of state-law claims by Damond J. Roker, Sr. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 envelope)(jae)
November 14, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 130 MOTION to appear in court via video communication or by telephone by Damond J. Roker, Sr. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 envelope)(jae)
November 10, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 129 AFFIDAVIT in Support of Clerk's Entry of Default re #116 filed by Damond J. Roker, Sr. (mlk)
October 27, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 128 Per conversation with the financial department the fee referenced in #123 Order, the filing fee has been paid in full. (jae)
October 26, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 127 AFFIDAVIT in Support of Motion for Default Judgment against defendant Jean C. Fuentes by Damond J. Roker, Sr. (Attachments: #1 envelope)(jae)
October 24, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 126 AFFIDAVIT in Support of motion for default judgment against defendant Twentieth Century Fox by Damond J. Roker, Sr. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 envelope)(jae)
October 24, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 125 AFFIDAVIT in Support of motion for default judgment against defendant Fox Entertainment Group by Damond J. Roker, Sr. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 envelope)(jae)
September 26, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 124 PRO SE MOTION for amended Order reducing filing fee and extension of time to pay remaining balance by Damond J. Roker, Sr. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 envelope)(jae)
September 26, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 123 ORDER granting #122 Motion as to extension of time and denying #122 Motion as to reduction of the filing fee, signed by Judge Samuel H. Mays, Jr. on 09/26/2022 (Mays, Samuel)
September 23, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 122 EMERGENCY MOTION Requesting an Amended Order Reducing Filing Fees and EXTENSION of Time to Pay Remaining Balance by Damond J. Roker, Sr. (agj)
September 19, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 121 ORDER temporarily granting #61 Motion to Dismiss; temporarily granting #64 Motion to Dismiss; temporarily granting #65 Sealed Motion, signed by Judge Samuel H. Mays, Jr. on 09/19/2022. (Mays, Samuel)
September 1, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 120 PRO SE MOTION that DE #40 be the operative complaint and that DE #42 be deleted from the record by Damond J. Roker, Sr. (Attachments: #1 envelope)(jae)
September 1, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 118 RESPONSE to Motion re #114 MOTION requesting that the court recognizes WHBQ (Memphis), LLC ("WHBQ-TV") as being the same entity as Cox Media Group Northeast, LLC. filed by Cox Media Group Northeast, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Drummond, Alexandre)
August 31, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 119 PRO SE PLAINITIFF'S MOTION TO CORRECT/AMEND ORDER (D.E. 38), AND MEMORANDUM OF LAW IN SUPPORT THEREOF by Damond J. Roker, Sr. (Attachments: #1 General Sessions Criminal Court Records; and #2 Envelope) (jpw)
August 29, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 117 AFFIDAVIT re #116 MOTION for Entry of Default by Damond J. Roker, Sr. (Attachments: #1 attachments, #2 Envelope)(btg)
August 25, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 116 PRO SE MOTION for Entry of Default by Damond J. Roker, Sr. (Attachments: #1 envelope)(jae)
August 22, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 115 ATTACHMENT - CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE to #114 MOTION requesting that the court recognizes WHBQ (Memphis), LLC ("WHBQ-TV") as being the same entity as Cox Media Group Northeast, LLC. by Damond J. Roker, Sr.. (Attachments: #1 envelope)(jae)
August 18, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 114 PRO SE MOTION requesting that the court recognizes WHBQ (Memphis), LLC ("WHBQ-TV") as being the same entity as Cox Media Group Northeast, LLC. by Damond J. Roker, Sr. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 envelope)(jae)
August 11, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 113 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Cox Media Group Northeast, LLC identifying Corporate Parent CMG Media Corporation for Cox Media Group Northeast, LLC.. (Drummond, Alexandre)
August 1, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 112 PRO SE MOTION to Withdraw #101 MOTION to Amend/Correct by Damond J. Roker, Sr. (Attachments: #1 envelope)(jae)
July 20, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 111 ORDER granting #110 Motion for Leave to File. Signed by Judge Samuel H. Mays, Jr on 7/20/2022. (Mays, Samuel) (Main Document 111 replaced on 7/20/2022) (jns). (Main Document 111 replaced on 7/20/2022) (jns).
July 19, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 110 MOTION for Leave to File a Surreply to Plaintiff's Motion Requesting Leave to Add Additional Defendants by Cox Media Group Northeast, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Defendant WHBQ's [Proposed] Surreply to Plaintiff's Motion Requesting Leave to Add Additional Defendants, #2 Exhibit B - Proposed Order)(Drummond, Alexandre)
July 12, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 109 PRO SE REPLY to Response to Motion re #103 Response in Opposition to Motion filed by Damond J. Roker, Sr. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 envelope)(jae)
June 28, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 108 RESPONSE to Motion re #106 MOTION to Compel Compliance with the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure Service Requirements filed by Cox Media Group Northeast, LLC. (Drummond, Alexandre)
June 24, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 107 PRO SE MOTION for Default Judgment by Damond J. Roker, Sr. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit, #2 envelope)(jae)
June 23, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 106 PRO SE MOTION to Compel WHBQ LLC's Compliance with FRCvP Service Requirements by Damond J. Roker, Sr. (Attachments: #1 envelope)(jae)
June 22, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 105 ORDER finding as moot #51 Motion to Rename and Reissue Summons. Signed by Judge Samuel H. Mays, Jr. on 6/22/2022. (Mays, Samuel)
June 13, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 104 PRO SE AMENDED MOTION for Default Judgment by Damond J. Roker, Sr. (Attachments: #1 Exhibits, #2 Affidavit, #3 Corrected Affidavit, #4 Envelope)(jae)
May 31, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 103 RESPONSE in Opposition re #101 MOTION to Amend/Correct - Plaintiff's Motion for Leave to Add Additional Defendants filed by Cox Media Group Northeast, LLC. (Drummond, Alexandre)
May 27, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 102 Plaintiff's MOTION for Clerks' Entry of Default Against Fox Broadcasting Company & Fox Television Stations, Inc. and Memorandum in Support by Damond J. Roker, Sr. (Attachments: #1 envelope)(agj)
May 18, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 101 MOTION to Amend Complaint to add additional defendants by Damond J. Roker, Sr. (Attachments: #1 envelope)(jae)
May 18, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 100 ORDER granting #97 Motion for Entry of Default. Signed by Thomas M. Gould, Clerk of COurt on 5/18/2022. (agj)
May 12, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 99 ORDER denying #54 Motion for Reconsideration re #54 MOTION for Reconsideration re #46 Order on Motion for Default Judgment filed by Damond J. Roker, Sr.. Signed by Judge Samuel H. Mays, Jr on 5/12/2022. (Mays, Samuel)
May 12, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 98 ORDER finding as moot #49 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer re #49 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #42 Amended Complaint.. Signed by Judge Samuel H. Mays, Jr on 5/12/2022. (Mays, Samuel)
May 9, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 97 PRO SE MOTION for Entry of Default by Damond J. Roker, Sr. (Attachments: #1 envelope)(jae)
May 9, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 96 PRO SE REPLY to Response to Motion re #89 Response in Opposition to Motion filed by Damond J. Roker, Sr. (Attachments: #1 envelope)(jae)
May 5, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 95 AFFIDAVIT re #94 MOTION for Entry of Default by Damond J. Roker, Sr. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 envelope)(jae)
May 4, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 94 Pro Se MOTION for Entry of Default by Damond J. Roker, Sr. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 envelope)(jae)
May 4, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 93 ORDER granting #92 Motion to Dismiss. Signed by Judge Samuel H. Mays, Jr on 5/4/2022. (Mays, Samuel)
May 2, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 92 Joint MOTION to Dismiss Cox Media Group, LLC, Kim Guthrie, and Brett Fennell with Prejudice (proposed order submitted) by Cox Media Group, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A: April 14, 2022 D. Roker Agreement with Comments, #2 Exhibit B: April 28, 2022 D. Roker Agreement)(Harvey, Robb)
April 25, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 91 ORDER re #63 MOTION to Seal - Motion for Leave to File Portion of its Motion to Dismiss Plaintiff's Pro Se Fourth Amended Complaint and Confidential Exhibit B Under Seal filed by Cox Media Group Northeast, LLC, #77 MOTION for Leave to File filed by Damond J. Roker, Sr., #79 MOTION for Leave to File filed by Damond J. Roker, Sr.. Signed by Judge Samuel H. Mays, Jr on 4/25/2022. (Mays, Samuel)
April 25, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 90 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Cox Media Group Northeast, LLC identifying Other Affiliate Apollo Global Management, Inc., Other Affiliate Cox Enterprises, Inc., Other Affiliate WHBQ (Memphis), LLC, Other Affiliate CMG Media Corporation for Cox Media Group Northeast, LLC.. (Drummond, Alexandre)
April 25, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 89 RESPONSE in Opposition re #83 MOTION to Compel - Defendant WHBQ (Memphis), LLC's Response in Opposition to Plaintiff's Motion to Compel Arbitration filed by Cox Media Group Northeast, LLC. (Drummond, Alexandre)
April 21, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 88 RESPONSE to Motion re #77 MOTION for Leave to File, #79 MOTION for Leave to File - Defendant WHBQ (Memphis), LLC's Response to Plaintiff's Motions for Leave to File Portions of His Motion in Opposition Under Seal filed by Cox Media Group Northeast, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Drummond, Alexandre)
April 19, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 87 ORDER granting #84 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #61 MOTION to Dismiss. Responses due by 5/10/2022. Signed by Judge Samuel H. Mays, Jr on 4/19/2022. (Mays, Samuel)
April 18, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 86 SEALED REPLY to Response to Motion re #76 Response in Opposition to Motion, - Defendant WHBQ's Reply Brief in Support of Its Motion to Dismiss (re Dkt 65) filed by Cox Media Group Northeast, LLC. (Drummond, Alexandre)
April 18, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 85 REPLY to Response to Motion re #76 Response in Opposition to Motion, - Defendant WHBQ's Reply Brief in Support of Its Motion to Dismiss (redacted) filed by Cox Media Group Northeast, LLC. (Drummond, Alexandre)
April 15, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 84 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #61 MOTION to Dismiss (proposed order submitted) by Cox Media Group, Inc.. (Harvey, Robb)
April 11, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 83 PRO SE MOTION to Compel Arbitration by Damond J. Roker, Sr. (Attachments: #1 Exhibits, #2 envelope)(jae)
April 11, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 82 RESPONSE in Opposition re #81 MOTION for Entry of Default AND NOTICE REGARDING LACK OF SERVICE OF PROCESS ON PURPORTED DEFENDANTS KIM GUTHRIE AND BRETT FENNELL filed by Cox Media Group, Inc.. (Harvey, Robb)
April 8, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 81 PRO SE MOTION and Memorandum for Entry of Default by Damond J. Roker, Sr. (Attachments: #1 envelope)(jae)
April 8, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 80 Letter from Damond J. Roker, Sr. requesting accounting of total payments received. (Attachments: #1 envelope) (jae)
April 6, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 79 PRO SE MOTION for Leave to File Portions of his Motion in Opposition to DftWHBQ LLC's Motion to Dismiss by Damond J. Roker, Sr. (Attachments: #1 envelope)(jae)
April 5, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 78 Sealed exhibits to DE #77 . (jae)
April 5, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 77 PRO SE MOTION for Leave to File portions of motion in opposition to motion to dismiss by Damond J. Roker, Sr. (Attachments: #1 Exhibits, #2 envelope)(jae)
April 4, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 76 RESPONSE in Opposition re #65 SEALED MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's Pro Se Fourth Amended Complaint, #61 MOTION to Dismiss , #64 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's Pro Se Fourth Amended Complaint (Doc No. 42) filed by Damond J. Roker, Sr. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 envelope)(jae)
March 17, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 75 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Cox Media Group, Inc. identifying Corporate Parent Cox Enterprises, Inc. for Cox Media Group, Inc... (Harvey, Robb)
March 16, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 74 SUMMONS Returned Executed as to Kim Guthrie. (jae)
March 16, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 73 SUMMONS Returned Executed as to Brett Fennell. (jae)
March 16, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 72 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Fox Entertainment Group as to Fox Entertainment Group. (jae)
March 16, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 71 SUMMONS Returned Executed as to Cox Media Group, Inc.. (jae)
March 16, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 70 SUMMONS Returned Executed as to Jean C. Fuentes. (jae)
March 16, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 69 SUMMONS Returned Executed as to Cox Media Group Northeast, LLC. (jae)
March 16, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 68 SUMMONS Returned Executed as to Twentieth Century Fox. (jae)
March 16, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 67 SUMMONS Returned Executed as to Fox Broadcasting Company/Fox Television Stations, Inc.. (jae)
March 16, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 66 SUMMONS Returned Executed as to News Corporation. (jae)
March 14, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 65 SEALED MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's Pro Se Fourth Amended Complaint by Cox Media Group Northeast, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum of Law, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B, #4 Exhibit C, #5 Exhibit D)(Drummond, Alexandre)
March 14, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 64 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's Pro Se Fourth Amended Complaint (Doc No. 42) by Cox Media Group Northeast, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum of Law, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B, #4 Exhibit C, #5 Exhibit D)(Drummond, Alexandre)
March 14, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 63 MOTION to Seal - Motion for Leave to File Portion of its Motion to Dismiss Plaintiff's Pro Se Fourth Amended Complaint and Confidential Exhibit B Under Seal by Cox Media Group Northeast, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum of Law, #2 Proposed Order)(Drummond, Alexandre)
March 14, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 62 MEMORANDUM in Support re #61 MOTION to Dismiss filed by Cox Media Group, Inc.. (Harvey, Robb)
March 14, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 61 MOTION to Dismiss by Cox Media Group, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1: TDOC Rape Conviction, #2 Exhibit 2: Fox Article, #3 Exhibit 3: Moore Order of Dismissal, #4 Exhibit 4: City of Memphis Order of Dismissal, #5 Exhibit 5: Moore Appellate Dismissal)(Harvey, Robb)
March 4, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 60 Letter to the Clerk in re: return address on summons from Damond Julian Roker (Attachments: #1 envelope) (agj)
March 3, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 59 RESPONSE in Opposition re #54 MOTION for Reconsideration re #46 Order on Motion for Default Judgment filed by Cox Media Group Northeast, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A-Acknowledgment of Service)(Drummond, Alexandre)
February 25, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 58 Summons Issued as to Fox Entertainment Group. Summons, USM 285, Forth Amended Complaint and Order #38 placed in USM's inner office mail for service. (jae)
February 23, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 57 NOTICE of Discrepancies and request for clerk to correct the record by Damond J. Roker, Sr (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 envelope)(jae)
February 18, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 56 PRO SE MOTION for Entry of Default as to defendants New Corporation, Fox Broadcasting Company, Fox Television Stations, Inc. Fox Entertainment Group, Kim Guthrie, Brett Fenell and Jean C. Fuentes by Damond J. Roker, Sr. (Attachments: #1 envelope)(jae)
February 17, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 55 NOTICE of Ineffective Process of service effectuated upon defendant Cox Media Group, and plaintiff's reply to defendant Cox Media Group's motion for extension of time by Damond J. Roker, Sr (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 envelope)(jae)
February 17, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 54 PRO SE MOTION for Reconsideration re #46 Order on Motion for Default Judgment by Damond J. Roker, Sr. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 envelope)(jae)
February 14, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 53 Letter from Damon Roker asking if defendant Fox Entertainment Group was issued process of service. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 envelope) (jae)
February 14, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 52 Notice of Correction to #51 MOTION to reflect name correct name of defendant and to reissue summons. (Attachments: #1 envelope)(jae)
February 14, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 51 PRO SE MOTION to reflect name correct name of defendant and to reissue summons by Damond J. Roker, Sr. (Attachments: #1 envelope)(jae)
February 10, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 50 ORDER granting #44 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. Answer due 3/14/2022. Signed by Judge Samuel H. Mays, Jr on 2/10/2022. (Mays, Samuel)
February 10, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 49 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #42 Amended Complaint, Proposed Order Submitted by Cox Media Group, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1-1.20.22 Summons & Notice, #2 Exhibit 2-2.9.22 Cox Consultation ltr to Pl)(Harvey, Robb)
February 10, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 48 NOTICE of Appearance by Quynh-Anh D. Kibler on behalf of Cox Media Group, Inc. (Kibler, Quynh-Anh)
February 10, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 47 NOTICE of Appearance by Robb S. Harvey on behalf of Cox Media Group, Inc. (Harvey, Robb)
February 9, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 46 ORDER denying #43 Motion for Default Judgment. Signed by Thomas M. Gould, Clerk of Court on 2/9/2022. (agj)
February 9, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 45 COURTESY NOTICE: Pursuant to Rule 5 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure, document #44 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #42 Amended Complaint, or File a Responsive Pleading to Plaintiff's Fourth Amended Complaint filed by Cox Media Group Northeast, LLC has been filed. For future reference, please note the proposed order should be emailed to the presiding judge. Please refer to the #ECF User Manual and #ECF Policies and Procedures. Filer is not required to resubmit document. (agj)
February 8, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 44 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #42 Amended Complaint, or File a Responsive Pleading to Plaintiff's Fourth Amended Complaint by Cox Media Group Northeast, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Drummond, Alexandre)
February 2, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 43 PRO SE MOTION for Default Judgment by Damond J. Roker, Sr. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit, #2 envelope)(jae)
January 25, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 42 FIFTH AMENDED COMPLAINT against Cox Media Group Northeast, LLC, Cox Media Group, Inc., Brett Fennell, Fox Broadcasting Company/Fox Television Stations, Inc., Jean C. Fuentes, Kim Guthrie, News Corporation, Twentieth Century Fox, Fox Entertainment Group, filed by Damond J. Roker, Sr. (Attachments: #1 envelope)(jae)
January 20, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 41 Letter from Damond Roker (Attachments: #1 envelope) (jae)
January 20, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 40 FOURTH AMENDED COMPLAINT against All Defendants All Defendants., filed by Damond J. Roker, Sr. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5, #6 Exhibit 6, #7 Exhibit 7, #8 Exhibit 8, #9 Exhibit 9, #10 Exhibit 10-15, #11 Exhibit 16-20, #12 Exhibit 21-25) (jae)
January 5, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 39 Summons Issued as to Cox Media Group Northeast, LLC, Cox Media Group, Inc., Brett Fennell, Fox Broadcasting Company/Fox Television Stations, Inc., Jean C. Fuentes, Kim Guthrie, News Corporation, Twentieth Century Fox. (Pursuant to DE #38 the issued summonses, a copy of the Third amended complaint, a copy of DE #38 and completed USM form 285 forwarded to the US Marshal Service to perfect service.) (agj)
November 18, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 38 ORDER denying #33 Motion to Appoint Counsel ; granting #34 Motion to Effect Service. Signed by Judge Samuel H. Mays, Jr on 11/18/2021.(Mays, Samuel)
June 16, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 37 NOTICE OF CASE TRACKING ASSIGNMENT PURSUANT TO LOCAL RULE 16.2: Pursuant to Local Rule 16.2, this case has been assigned to the Pro Se Prisoner track. http://www.tnwd.uscourts.gov/pdf/content/LocalRules.pdf (csf)
June 16, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 36 Case transferred in from District of New York Southern; Case Number 1:20-cv-05350. Original file certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received. (Additional attachment(s) added on 6/16/2021: #2 Judicial Cards) (csf). (Additional attachment(s) added on 6/16/2021: #3 Judicial Cards) (csf).
June 10, 2021 Opinion or Order Mailed a copy of #35 Order to Damond J. Roker, Sr., #600497 at N.W.C.X, 960 State Route 212, Tiptonville, TN 38079. (kh) [Transferred from New York Southern on 6/16/2021.]
June 9, 2021 Opinion or Order CASE TRANSFERRED OUT ELECTRONICALLY from the U.S.D.C. Southern District of New York to the United States District Court - District of Western District of Tennessee. (sac) [Transferred from New York Southern on 6/16/2021.]
June 9, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 35 TRANSFER ORDER: The Clerk of Court is directed to transfer this action to the United States District Court for the Western District of Tennessee. A summons shall not issue from this Court. This order closes the case in the Southern District of New York. The Clerk of Court is directed to mail a copy of this order to Plaintiff and note service on the docket. (Signed by Judge Louis L. Stanton on 6/9/2021) (sac) Transmission to Docket Assistant Clerk for processing. Transmission to Office of the Clerk of Court for processing. [Transferred from New York Southern on 6/16/2021.]
June 8, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 34 PRO SE PLAINTIFF'S MOTION TO EFFECT SERVICE UPON THE DEFENDANTS VIA THE U.S. MARSHALS SERVICE. Document filed by Damond J. Roker, Sr.(sc) [Transferred from New York Southern on 6/16/2021.]
June 8, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 33 MOTION(Application) FOR APPOINTMENT OF COUNSEL, re: for the Court to Request Counsel. Document filed by Damond J. Roker, Sr.(sc) [Transferred from New York Southern on 6/16/2021.]
May 25, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 32 "THIRD" AMENDED COMPLAINT against Cox Media Group Northeast, LLC, Cox Media Group, Inc., Brett Fennell, Fox Broadcasting Company/Fox Television Stations, Inc., Jean C. Fuentes, Kim Guthrie, News Corporation, Twentieth Century Fox, re: amending #26 Amended Complaint, with JURY DEMAND.Document filed by Damond J. Roker, Sr. Related document: #26 Amended Complaint.(sc) [Transferred from New York Southern on 6/16/2021.]
May 12, 2021 Opinion or Order Pro Se Payment of Fee Processed: $25.00 Check processed by the Finance Department on 05/12/2021, Receipt Number 465401279270. (jgl) [Transferred from New York Southern on 6/16/2021.]
April 30, 2021 Opinion or Order Mailed a copy of #31 Order 30 Days Amended Complaint (case opening), Terminate Motions to Damond J. Roker, Sr., ID # 600497 at N.W.C.X, 960 State Route 212, Tiptonville, TN 38079. (kh) [Transferred from New York Southern on 6/16/2021.]
April 28, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 31 ORDER: The Clerk of Court is directed to mail a copy of this order to Plaintiff and note service on the docket. Plaintiff's motion for the Court to appoint counsel (ECF 29) is denied, and his motion for leave to amend his complaint (ECF 28) is granted. Plaintiff is granted leave to file an amended complaint that complies with the standards set forth above. Plaintiff must submit the amended complaint to this Court's Pro Se Intake Unit within thirty days of the date of this order, caption the document as a "Third Amended Complaint," and label the document with docket number 20-CV-5350 (LLS). An Amended Complaint form is attached to this order. No summons will issue at this time. If Plaintiff fails to comply within the time allowed, and he cannot show good cause to excuse such failure, the Court will deem the second amended complaint (ECF 16) the operative complaint. Motions terminated: #29 APPLICATION for the Court to Request Counsel, filed by Damond J. Roker, Sr.; #28 MOTION to Amend/Correct #16 Amended Complaint, filed by Damond J. Roker, Sr.; #21 APPLICATION for the Court to Request Counsel, filed by Damond J. Roker, Sr. (Signed by Judge Louis L. Stanton on 4/28/2021) (sac) Transmission to Docket Assistant Clerk for processing. [Transferred from New York Southern on 6/16/2021.]
April 28, 2021 Opinion or Order Pro Se Payment of Fee Processed: $50.00 Check processed by the Finance Department on 4/27/2021, Receipt Number 465401278535. (sw) [Transferred from New York Southern on 6/16/2021.]
April 27, 2021 Opinion or Order Request for Copies/Transcripts/Docket Sheet Processed: Mailed copy of Docket Sheet to Damond J. Roker, Sr. #600497 N.W.C.X 960 State Route 212 Tiptonville, TN 38079 on 4/27/2021. (aan) [Transferred from New York Southern on 6/16/2021.]
April 26, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 30 LETTER from D. Roker dated 4/21/21 re: STATUS ON PENDING MOTIONS, AND REQUEST FOR CIVIL SUMMONS(8 Copies). Document filed by Damond J. Roker, Sr.(sc) [Transferred from New York Southern on 6/16/2021.]
April 26, 2021 Opinion or Order Request for Copy of updated Docket Sheet Received: Re #30 Letter. Request for Docket Report, from D. Roker received on 4/26/21. Transmission to Pro Se Assistants for processing. (sc) [Transferred from New York Southern on 6/16/2021.]
April 12, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 29 MOTION FOR THE APPOINTMENT OF COUNSEL. Document filed by Damond J. Roker, Sr.(sc) [Transferred from New York Southern on 6/16/2021.]
March 9, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 28 MOTION FOR LEAVE TO AMEND, re: to Amend/Correct #16 Amended Complaint. Document filed by Damond J. Roker, Sr.(sc) [Transferred from New York Southern on 6/16/2021.]
March 4, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 27 LETTER from D. Roker, dated 2/24/21 re: Please find enclosed for filing: "Right to Sue" Notice, received from the EEOC(as indicated). Document filed by Damond J. Roker, Sr.(sc) [Transferred from New York Southern on 6/16/2021.]
January 28, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 26 (2nd) AMENDED COMPLAINT, re: amending #16 Amended Complaint, against Cox Media Group, Inc., Brett Fennell, Fox Broadcasting Company/Fox Television Stations, Inc., Jean C. Fuentes, Kim Guthrie, Twentieth Century Fox.Document filed by Damond J. Roker, Sr. Related document: #16 Amended Complaint.(sc) [Transferred from New York Southern on 6/16/2021.]
January 28, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 25 SUPPLEMENT(Appendix)TO PLAINTIFF'S BREACH OF CONTRACT CLAIMS/APPLICABLE LAW. Document filed by Damond J. Roker, Sr.(sc) [Transferred from New York Southern on 6/16/2021.]
January 20, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 24 SUPPLEMENT TO SECOND AMENDED COMPLAINT(Third Amended Complaint), re: amending #16 Amended Complaint, against Cox Media Group Inc., Brett Fennell, Fox Broadcasting Company/Fox Television Stations Inc., Jean C. Fuentes, Kim Guthrie, Twentieth Century Fox.Document filed by Damond J. Roker, Sr. Related document: #16 Amended Complaint.(sc) [Transferred from New York Southern on 6/16/2021.]
January 14, 2021 Opinion or Order Mailed a copy of #23 Order Reopening Case, Terminate Motions to Damond J. Roker, Sr., ID # 600497 at N.W.C.X, 960 State Route 212, Tiptonville, TN 38079. (kh) [Transferred from New York Southern on 6/16/2021.]
January 13, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 22 LETTER addressed to Clerk from Damond J. Roker dated 12/30/2020 re: The Plaintiff filed with the Clerk of Court, a motion to reinstate case after seeking a voluntary dismissal in error pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P.60(b). The Plaintiff also filed a motion to vacate the order to voluntarily dismiss his complaint...requests an update of the status of the case, and requests a copy of the civil docket of the same. Document filed by Damond J. Roker, Sr. (ok) [Transferred from New York Southern on 6/16/2021.]
January 13, 2021 Opinion or Order Request for Copies/Transcripts/Docket Sheet Received: Re #22 Letter. Request for Docket Report, from Damond J. Roker received on 1/13/2021. Transmission to Pro Se Assistants for processing. (ok) [Transferred from New York Southern on 6/16/2021.]
January 13, 2021 Opinion or Order Request for Copies/Transcripts/Docket Sheet Processed: Mailed copy of Docket Sheet to Damond J. Roker, Sr. #600497 N.W.C.X 960 State Route 212 Tiptonville, TN 38079 on 1/13/2021. (aan) [Transferred from New York Southern on 6/16/2021.]
October 2, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 23 ORDER: The Clerk of Court is directed to mail a copy of this order to Plaintiff and note service onthe docket. Plaintiff's motions for reconsideration (ECF Nos. 19-20) are granted. The Clerk ofCourt is further directed to vacate the order of dismissal (ECF No. 15 ) and reopen this matter. This action shall proceed with the Second Amended Complaint (ECF No. 16) as the operative complaint. Motions terminated: #19 MOTION for Reconsideration re; #16 Amended Complaint, filed by Damond J. Roker, Sr.; #20 MOTION to Vacate #15 Order of Dismissal, filed by Damond J. Roker, Sr. (Signed by Judge Louis L. Stanton on 10/2/2020) (sac) Transmission to Docket Assistant Clerk for processing. [Transferred from New York Southern on 6/16/2021.]
October 2, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 21 MOTION FOR THE APPOINTMENT OF COUNSEL, re: for the Court to Request Counsel. Document filed by Damond J. Roker, Sr.(sc) [Transferred from New York Southern on 6/16/2021.]
October 1, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 20 PLAINTIFF'S MOTION TO VACATE THE ORDER TO VOLUNTARILY DISMISS HIS COMPLAINT, #15 Order of Dismissal. Document filed by Damond J. Roker, Sr.(sc) [Transferred from New York Southern on 6/16/2021.]
October 1, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 19 PLAINTIFF'S MOTION TO REINSTATE CASE AFTER SEEKING A VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL IN ERROR (BY MISTAKE), re: for Reconsideration re; #16 Amended Complaint. Document filed by Damond J. Roker, Sr.(sc) [Transferred from New York Southern on 6/16/2021.]
September 22, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 18 THIRD CAUSE OF ACTION - CLAIMS FOR EMOTIONAL DISTRESS(2nd Amended Complaint)/Intentional Infliction of Emotional Distress(IIED). Document filed by Damond J. Roker, Sr. (sc) [Transferred from New York Southern on 6/16/2021.]
September 21, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 16 (2nd) AMENDED COMPLAINT, re: amending #3 Amended Complaint against Cox Media Group, Inc., Brett Fennell, Fox Broadcasting Company/Fox Television Stations, Inc., Kim Guthrie, Twentieth Century Fox, Jean C. Fuentes.Document filed by Damond J. Roker, Sr. Related document: #3 Amended Complaint.(sc) [Transferred from New York Southern on 6/16/2021.]
September 18, 2020 Opinion or Order Mailed a copy of #15 Order of Dismissal to Damond J. Roker, Sr., ID # 600497 at N.W.C.X, 960 State Route 212, Tiptonville, TN 38079. (kh) [Transferred from New York Southern on 6/16/2021.]
September 17, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 17 SECOND CAUSE OF ACTION - DEFAMATION OF CHARACTER(2nd Amended Complaint); False-Light Invasion of Privacy; Libel. Document filed by Damond J. Roker, Sr. (sc) (Main Document 17 replaced on 9/23/2020) (sc). [Transferred from New York Southern on 6/16/2021.]
September 17, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 15 Vacated as per Judges Order dated 10/2/2020, Doc. #23 ORDER OF DISMISSAL: The Clerk of Court is directed to mail a copy of this order to Plaintiff and note service on the docket. The complaint is voluntarily dismissed pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 41(a). (Signed by Judge Louis L. Stanton on 9/17/2020) (nb) Transmission to Docket Assistant Clerk for processing. Modified on 1/13/2021 (sac). [Transferred from New York Southern on 6/16/2021.]
September 15, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 14 MOTION TO VOLUNTARILY DISMISS CASE WITHOUT PREJUDICE. Document filed by Damond J. Roker, Sr..(sc) [Transferred from New York Southern on 6/16/2021.]
September 10, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 13 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Twentieth Century Fox(Fox Corp.),Fox Broadcasting Co./ Fox Television Stations, re: #1 Petition to Compel/Confirm/Modify/Stay/Vacate Arbitration. Document filed by Damond J. Roker, Sr. (sc) [Transferred from New York Southern on 6/16/2021.]
September 10, 2020 Opinion or Order Transmission to Pro Se Assistants. Transmitted re: #13 Request for Issuance of Summons, to the Pro Se Assistants for processing. (sc) [Transferred from New York Southern on 6/16/2021.]
September 9, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 12 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Cox Media Group, Inc., re: #3 Amended Complaint. Document filed by Damond J. Roker, Sr. (sc) [Transferred from New York Southern on 6/16/2021.]
September 9, 2020 Opinion or Order Transmission to Pro Se Assistants. Transmitted re: #12 Request for Issuance of Summons, to the Pro Se Assistants for processing. (sc) [Transferred from New York Southern on 6/16/2021.]
August 25, 2020 Opinion or Order Mailed a copy of #11 Order 60 Days Amended Complaint (case opening), Terminate Motions to Damond J. Roker, Sr., ID # 600497 at N.W.C.X, 960 State Route 212, Tiptonville, TN 38079. (kh) [Transferred from New York Southern on 6/16/2021.]
August 24, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER TO AMEND: The Clerk of Court is directed to mail a copy of this order to Plaintiff and note service on the docket. The Court denies Plaintiff request for pro bono counsel, without prejudice to renewal of his application.Plaintiff is granted leave to file a second amended complaint that complies with the standards set forth above. Plaintiff must submit the second amended complaint to this Court's Pro Se Intake Unit within sixty days of the date of this order, caption the document as a Second Amended Complaint, and label the document with docket number 20-CV-5350 (LLS). A Second Amended Complaint form is attached to this order. No summons will issue at this time. If Plaintiff fails to comply within the time allowed, and he cannot show good cause to excuse such failure, the federal claims in the amended complaint will be dismissed for failure to state a claim upon which relief may be granted, and the Court will consider whether to transfer the state law claims to the United States District Court for the Western District of Tennessee under 28 U.S.C. 1406. (Signed by Judge Louis L. Stanton on 8/25/2020) (nb) Transmission to Docket Assistant Clerk for processing. [Transferred from New York Southern on 6/16/2021.]
August 19, 2020 Opinion or Order NOTICE OF CASE REASSIGNMENT - SUA SPONTE to Judge Louis L. Stanton. Judge Colleen McMahon is no longer assigned to the case..(wb) [Transferred from New York Southern on 6/16/2021.]
August 12, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 10 MOTION TO COMPEL ARBITRATION. Document filed by Damond J. Roker, Sr.(sc) [Transferred from New York Southern on 6/16/2021.]
August 12, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 9 PRISONER AUTHORIZATION. Document filed by Damond J. Roker, Sr.(sc) [Transferred from New York Southern on 6/16/2021.]
August 10, 2020 Opinion or Order Mailed a copy of #8 Order Granting IFP Application in Prisoner Case to Damond J. Roker, Sr., #600497, and Kevin Genovese, Warden of Northwest Correctional Complex, at N.W.C.X, 960 State Route 212, Tiptonville, TN 38079. (kh) [Transferred from New York Southern on 6/16/2021.]
August 7, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER GRANTING IFP APPLICATION IN PRISONER CASE: The Clerk of Court is directed to send a copy of this order and the prisoner authorization to the agency having custody of Plaintiff. That agency is directed to forward copies of Plaintiff's prison trust fund account for the past six months and to disburse the payments required under 28 U.S.C. 1915 to the United States District Court for the Southern District of New York and to include the above docket number on the disbursement before sending it to the Court. If Plaintiff is transferred to another facility, the current facility shall provide a copy of this order to the facility to which Plaintiff is transferred. The Clerk of Court is also directed to send a copy of this order to Plaintiff and note service on the docket. Finally, it is Plaintiff's obligation to promptly submit a written notification to the Court if Plaintiff's address changes, and the Court may dismiss the action if Plaintiff fails to do so. (Signed by Judge Colleen McMahon on 8/7/2020) (vn) Transmission to Docket Assistant Clerk for processing. [Transferred from New York Southern on 6/16/2021.]
July 28, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 7 APPLICATION TO PROCEED WITHOUT PREPAYING FEES OR COSTS. Document filed by Damond J. Roker, Sr.(sc) [Transferred from New York Southern on 6/16/2021.]
July 28, 2020 Opinion or Order Mailed a copy of #6 Order Directing Prisoner Authorization (Attachments: # 1 prisoner authorization), to Damond J. Roker, Sr. at #600497, N.W.C.X, 960 State Route 212, Tiptonville, TN 38079. (dsh) [Transferred from New York Southern on 6/16/2021.]
July 27, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER DIRECTING PRISONER AUTHORIZATION: Plaintiff is directed to submit a completed and signed Prisoner Authorization Form to this Court's Pro Se Office as directed in the July 13, 2020 Order. The Clerk of Court is directed to assign this matter to my docket. The Court certifies, pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 1915(a)(3), that any appeal from this Order would not be taken in good faith, and therefore in forma pauperis status is denied for the purpose of an appeal. See Coppedge v. United States, 369 U.S. 438, 444-45 (1962). Prisoner Authorization Form due by 8/26/2020. (Signed by Judge Colleen McMahon on 7/27/2020) (Attachments: #1 prisoner authorization) (keb) Transmission to Docket Assistant Clerk for processing. [Transferred from New York Southern on 6/16/2021.]
July 16, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 5 MOTION FOR THE APPOINTMENT OF COUNSEL, re: for the Court to Request Counsel. Document filed by Damond J. Roker, Sr.(sc) [Transferred from New York Southern on 6/16/2021.]
July 16, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 4 APPLICATION TO PROCEED IN FORMA PAUPERIS AND AFFIDAVIT OF POVERTY. Document filed by Damond J. Roker, Sr.(sc) [Transferred from New York Southern on 6/16/2021.]
July 16, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 3 AMENDED COMPLAINT against Cox Media Group, Inc., Brett Fennell, Fox Broadcasting Company/Fox Television Stations, Inc., Kim Guthrie with JURY DEMAND.Document filed by Damond J. Roker, Sr.(sc) [Transferred from New York Southern on 6/16/2021.]
July 14, 2020 Opinion or Order Mailed a copy of #2 Order Directing Payment of Fee or IFP Application & Prisoner Authorization, with Attachments: # 1 prisoner authorization, # 2 IFP application, to Damond J. Roker, Sr. at #600497, N.W.C.X, 960 State Route 212, Tiptonville, TN 38079. (dsh) [Transferred from New York Southern on 6/16/2021.]
July 13, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 2 ORDER DIRECTING PAYMENT OF FEE OR IFP APPLICATION & PRISONER AUTHORIZATION: Plaintiff is directed to render payment of the filing fee or submit an IFP application & Prisoner Authorization to this Court's Pro Se Office within thirty (30) days of the date of this Order. The Clerk of Court is directed to assign this matter to my docket. The Court certifies, pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 1915(a)(3), that any appeal from this Order would not be taken in good faith, and therefore in forma pauperis status is denied for the purpose of an appeal. See Coppedge v. United States, 369 U.S. 438, 444-45 (1962). Filing Fee due by 8/12/2020. In Forma Pauperis (IFP) Application due by 8/12/2020. Prisoner Authorization Form due by 8/12/2020. (Signed by Judge Colleen McMahon on 7/13/2020) (Attachments: #1 prisoner authorization, #2 IFP application) (keb) Transmission to Docket Assistant Clerk for processing. [Transferred from New York Southern on 6/16/2021.]
July 13, 2020 Opinion or Order NOTICE OF CASE ASSIGNMENT - SUA SPONTE to Judge Colleen McMahon. Judge Unassigned is no longer assigned to the case..(bcu) [Transferred from New York Southern on 6/16/2021.]
July 7, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 1 MOTION TO COMPEL ARBITRATION..Document filed by Damond J. Roker, Sr.(rdz) [Transferred from New York Southern on 6/16/2021.]
July 7, 2020 Opinion or Order Case Designated ECF. (rdz) [Transferred from New York Southern on 6/16/2021.]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Tennessee Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Roker v. Twentieth Century Fox et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Damond J. Roker, Sr. d/b/a Bishop DJ Roker also known as D.J. Roker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: D.J. Roker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Fox Broadcasting Company/Fox Television Stations, Inc. d/b/a WHBQ-TV/Fox 13 (Memphis)
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cox Media Group Northeast, LLC d/b/a WHBQ-TV, FOX 13
Represented By: Alexandre De Souza Drummond
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Fox Channel 13 (Mempis)
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Fox Television Stations, Inc. d/b/a Fox Channel 13(Fox 13) doing business as WHBQ-TV
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Brett Fennell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: News Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kim Guthrie
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jean C. Fuentes
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Twentieth Century Fox
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Fox Broadcasting Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cox Media Group, Inc. d/b/a WHBQ-TV, Fox 13 News doing business as WHBQ-TV, Fox 13
Represented By: Quynh-Anh D. Kibler
Represented By: Robb S. Harvey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Fox Entertainment Group
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?