Hopkins et al v. Nutrien AG Solutions, Inc.
Plaintiff: Glenn Hopkins doing business as Hopkins & Hopkins Farms and Troy Hopkins doing business as Troy Hopkins Farms
Defendant: Nutrien AG Solutions, Inc.
Not Classified By Court: Mike Forbess
Case Number: 2:2021cv02435
Filed: June 28, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Tennessee
Presiding Judge: Annie T Christoff
Referring Judge: John T Fowlkes
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 20, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 20, 2021 Filing 17 SETTING LETTER: Status Conference set for Wednesday, 4/27/2022 09:15 AM before Judge John T. Fowlkes Jr. The proceeding will be held via Microsoft Teams video conference. The Court will email the parties an invitation for the video conference 1 day prior to the proceeding.Counsel should submit any exhibits to be offered to the Judge's ECF mailbox prior to the proceeding.The public may also access the video proceeding. If the public and/or media wish to attend in the video proceeding, please click on the following link to request access information: #https://www.tnwd.uscourts.gov/videohearings The access information will be delivered via email to the email address from which the request originated.Parties should consult the instructions for #Joining a Meeting in Teams or #Joining a Meeting Without a Teams Account. Please email Ross Herrin at ross_herrin@tnwd.uscourts.gov for any questions. (wrh)
August 20, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER FOR MEDIATION. Signed by Judge John T. Fowlkes, Jr. on 08/20/2021. (Fowlkes, John)
August 20, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 15 SCHEDULING ORDER: Status Conference set for Wednesday, 4/27/20222 09:15 AM before Judge John T. Fowlkes Jr.. ADR deadline is 4/5/2022. Amended Pleadings due by 9/20/2021. Discovery due by 4/12/2022. Joinder of Parties due by 9/20/2021. Motions due by 5/12/2022. Signed by Judge John T. Fowlkes, Jr. on 08/20/2021. (Fowlkes, John)
August 20, 2021 Filing 14 NOTICE OF CANCELLATION: The Scheduling Conference set Thursday, 8/26/2021 at 9:00 AM before Judge, John T. Fowlkes, Jr. is CANCELLED. A Status Conference will be set via separate notice. (wrh)
July 30, 2021 Filing 13 SETTING LETTER: A Scheduling Conference is set for THURSDAY 8/26/2021 at 9:00 AM via TEAMS before Judge John T. Fowlkes, Jr. A JOINT proposed scheduling order in WORD format should be submitted at least 4 days prior to the scheduling conference to the ECF propdocs email address, ECF_Judge_Fowlkes@tnwd.uscourts.gov. Please follow Judge Fowlkes' scheduling guidelines at the website @https://connection.tnwd.circ6.dcn. Counsel should be prepared to set case deadlines and discuss case status and all pending motions at the conference. Following the scheduling conference, the approved order will be filed by the Case Manager.(ljf)
July 30, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER granting #11 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. [**TEXT-ONLY ORDER--NO IMAGE ATTACHED.**] Signed by Magistrate Judge Annie T. Christoff on 07/30/2021. (jad)
July 29, 2021 Filing 11 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice (Fee paid as part of previous filing) by Nutrien AG Solutions, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 USDC Certificate of Good Standing, #2 Colorado Supreme Court Certificate of Good Standing)(Lopach, Paul)
July 28, 2021 Filing 10 DEFICIENCY NOTICE: Pursuant to Rule 5 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure, document #9 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Paul J. Lopach (proposed order submitted) (Filing fee $ 150 receipt number ATNWDC-3665753) filed by Nutrien AG Solutions, Inc. has been filed. However, the following deficiency has been found: : Pro Hac Vice motions must be filed by the attorney seeking admission. This motion will be termed pending correct filing. Attorney should review the instructions on our website for instructions on how to file pro hac vice motions. Please refer to the #ECF User Manual and #ECF Policies and Procedures. The filer has one business day to correct the deficiency. (jae)
July 28, 2021 Filing 9 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Paul J. Lopach (proposed order submitted) (Filing fee $ 150 receipt number ATNWDC-3665753) by Nutrien AG Solutions, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Certificate of Good Standing, State of Colorado, #2 Exhibit Certificate of Good Standing, D. Colo.)(Chapski, Robert)
July 28, 2021 Filing 8 ANSWER to Complaint and Affirmative Defenses by Nutrien AG Solutions, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Sworn Complaint, Case No. 35941, #2 Exhibit B - First Judgment, #3 Exhibit C - Sworn Complaint, Case No. 35943, #4 Exhibit D - Second Judgment)(Chapski, Robert)
July 1, 2021 Filing 7 STIPULATION of Extension of Time to Respond to Complaint by Nutrien AG Solutions, Inc.. (Chapski, Robert)
June 28, 2021 Filing 6 NOTICE OF RIGHT TO CONSENT TO THE EXERCISE OF CIVIL JURISDICTION BY A MAGISTRATE JUDGE Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 636(c), Fed.R.Civ.P.73, and Local Rule 72.1, this Court has designated the Magistrate Judges of this District to conduct trials and otherwise dispose of any civil case that is filed in this Court. Your decision to consent, or not consent, to the referral of your case to a United States Magistrate Judge for trial and entry of a final judgment must be entirely voluntary. The judge or magistrate judge to whom the case has been assigned will not be informed of your decision unless all parties agree that the case may be referred to a magistrate judge for these specific purposes. A less than unanimous decision will not be communicated by this office to either the judge or magistrate judge. The consent form is available on the courts website at https://www.tnwd.uscourts.gov/forms-and-applications.php (jae)
June 28, 2021 Filing 5 NOTICE TO COMPLY WITH PLAN FOR ALTERNATE DISPUTE RESOLUTION (ADR): Pursuant to Section to 2.1 of the ADR Plan, all civil cases filed on or after Sept. 1, 2014, shall be referred automatically for ADR. For compliance requirements, refer to the ADR Plan at: http://www.tnwd.uscourts.gov/pdf/content/ADRPlan.pdf (jae)
June 28, 2021 Filing 4 NOTICE OF CASE TRACKING ASSIGNMENT PURSUANT TO LOCAL RULE 16.2: Pursuant to Local Rule 16.2, this case has been assigned to the Standard track. http://www.tnwd.uscourts.gov/pdf/content/LocalRules.pdf (jae)
June 28, 2021 Filing 3 Judge John T. Fowlkes, Jr and Magistrate Judge Annie T. Christoff added. (jae)
June 28, 2021 Filing 2 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Nutrien AG Solutions, Inc. identifying Corporate Parent United Agri Products, Inc. for Nutrien AG Solutions, Inc... (Chapski, Robert)
June 28, 2021 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Nutrien AG Solutions, Inc. from Tipton County Circuit Court, case number 7680 (Filing fee $ 402 receipt number ATNWDC-3641972), filed by Nutrien AG Solutions, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A - Summons and Complaint, #2 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet)(Chapski, Robert)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Tennessee Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Hopkins et al v. Nutrien AG Solutions, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Nutrien AG Solutions, Inc.
Represented By: Robert F. Chapski
Represented By: Paul J Lopach
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Glenn Hopkins doing business as Hopkins & Hopkins Farms
Represented By: Bryan Russell Huffman
Represented By: David Anthony Stowers
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Troy Hopkins doing business as Troy Hopkins Farms
Represented By: Bryan Russell Huffman
Represented By: David Anthony Stowers
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Not classified by court: Mike Forbess
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?