Castleman Ferryman, LLC et al v. Bridge SFR Loans, LLC
Plaintiff: Danville Ferryman, LLC, Castleman Ferryman, LLC, Midtown Witney, LLC, Plum Marsh, LLC, Midtown Reginald, LLC, Gull Patras, LLC, Egyptian George, LLC, Kaspa Properties, LLC and Midtown 10 Turnley, LLC
Defendant: Bridge SFR Loans, LLC
Not Classified By Court: Clerk W. Aaron Hall
Case Number: 2:2021cv02446
Filed: July 2, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Tennessee
Presiding Judge: Annie T Christoff
Referring Judge: Jon Phipps McCalla
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1330
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 20, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 20, 2021 Filing 19 AMENDED COMPLAINT against All Defendants All Defendants., filed by All Plaintiffs. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Assignments of Promissory Note and Security Instrument, #2 Exhibit Annual Tax and Interest Statements) (Cates, Taylor)
August 17, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 18 ORDER GRANTING #17 PLAINTIFFS' MOTION FOR LEAVE TO AMEND. Signed by Magistrate Judge Annie T. Christoff on 8/17/2021. (mpk)
August 16, 2021 Filing 17 First MOTION to Amend/Correct Complaint proposed order submitted by All Plaintiffs. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Proposed Amended Complaint, #2 Exhibit Exhibit A to Amended Complaint, #3 Exhibit Exhibit B to Amended Complaint)(Stuart, Sarah)
August 16, 2021 Filing 16 NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by Midtown Witney, LLC (Stuart, Sarah)
August 10, 2021 Filing 15 SETTING LETTER: Jury Trial set for 8/8/2022 09:00 AM in Courtroom 5 - Memphis before Magistrate Judge Annie T. Christoff. Pretrial Conference set for 8/1/2022 10:00 AM in Courtroom 5 - Memphis before Magistrate Judge Annie T. Christoff. Proposed Pretrial Order due by 7/25/2022. (mpk)
August 10, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 14 SCHEDULING ORDER: Final Pretrial Conference set for 8/1/2022 10:00 AM in Courtroom 5 - Memphis before Magistrate Judge Annie T. Christoff. ADR deadline is 10/28/2021. Amended Pleadings due by 10/4/2021. Discovery due by 4/29/2022. Joinder of Parties due by 10/4/2021. Proposed Pretrial Order due by 7/25/2022. Jury Trial set for 8/8/2022 09:00 AM in Courtroom 5 - Memphis before Magistrate Judge Annie T. Christoff. Signed by Magistrate Judge Annie T. Christoff on 8/10/2021. (mpk)
August 10, 2021 Filing 13 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Annie T. Christoff: Scheduling Conference held on 8/10/2021. Taylor A. Cates and Sarah Elizabeth Stuart, counsel for Plaintiffs, and Joseph B. Baker, counsel for Defendant, appeared via Microsoft Teams. Case deadlines and Local Rules requirements were discussed. Scheduling Order to be entered. Trial is expected to last three days. Defendant shall file, by October 11, 2021, a joint or individual notice demonstrating that jurisdiction is properly before the Court based on the complete diversity of the parties. (mpk)
August 6, 2021 Filing 12 RESPONSE in Opposition re #7 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM filed by All Plaintiffs. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Certificates of Existence)(Cates, Taylor)
August 5, 2021 Filing 11 NOTICE of Appearance by Sarah Elizabeth Stuart on behalf of All Plaintiffs (Stuart, Sarah)
August 2, 2021 Filing 10 SETTING LETTER: Scheduling Conference set for Tuesday, 8/10/2021 at 11:00 AM via Teams before Magistrate Judge Annie T. Christoff. The proceeding will be done via Microsoft Teams video conference. The Court will email the parties an invitation for the video conference prior to the proceeding.Counsel should submit any exhibits to be offered to the Judge's ECF mailbox prior to the proceeding.The public may also access the video proceeding. If the public and/or media wish to attend in the video proceeding, please click on the following link to request access information: #https://www.tnwd.uscourts.gov/videohearings The access information will be delivered via email to the email address from which the request originated.Parties should consult the instructions for #Joining a Meeting in Teams or #Joining a Meeting Without a Teams Account. Please email Vallonda Pettway at vallonda_pettway@tnwd.courts.gov for any questions. (tlh)
July 30, 2021 Filing 9 REPORT of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting . (Baker, Joseph)
July 29, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER REFERRING CASE TO MAGISTRATE JUDGE (AO85). Signed by Judge Jon Phipps McCalla on 7/29/2021. (Attachments: # A) (joj) (Additional attachment(s) added on 7/30/2021: #2 Judicial Card) (btg).
July 9, 2021 Filing 7 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM by Bridge SFR Loans, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B, #4 Exhibit C, #5 Exhibit D, #6 Exhibit E, #7 Exhibit F, #8 Exhibit G, #9 Exhibit H)(Baker, Joseph)
July 2, 2021 Filing 6 SETTING LETTER: A Telephonic Scheduling Conference is set for Thursday, 8/5/2021 at 2:30 PM before Judge Jon Phipps McCalla. To access the telephonic conference parties will dial 888-675-2535 and enter access code 7360481. Please call at least 5 minutes in advance of the conference time. (jrs)
July 2, 2021 Filing 5 NOTICE OF RIGHT TO CONSENT TO THE EXERCISE OF CIVIL JURISDICTION BY A MAGISTRATE JUDGE Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 636(c), Fed.R.Civ.P.73, and Local Rule 72.1, this Court has designated the Magistrate Judges of this District to conduct trials and otherwise dispose of any civil case that is filed in this Court. Your decision to consent, or not consent, to the referral of your case to a United States Magistrate Judge for trial and entry of a final judgment must be entirely voluntary. The judge or magistrate judge to whom the case has been assigned will not be informed of your decision unless all parties agree that the case may be referred to a magistrate judge for these specific purposes. A less than unanimous decision will not be communicated by this office to either the judge or magistrate judge. The consent form is available on the courts website at https://www.tnwd.uscourts.gov/forms-and-applications.php (agj)
July 2, 2021 Filing 4 NOTICE OF CASE TRACKING ASSIGNMENT PURSUANT TO LOCAL RULE 16.2: Pursuant to Local Rule 16.2, this case has been assigned to the Standard track. http://www.tnwd.uscourts.gov/pdf/content/LocalRules.pdf (agj)
July 2, 2021 Filing 3 NOTICE TO COMPLY WITH PLAN FOR ALTERNATE DISPUTE RESOLUTION (ADR): Pursuant to Section to 2.1 of the ADR Plan, all civil cases filed on or after Sept. 1, 2014, shall be referred automatically for ADR. For compliance requirements, refer to the ADR Plan at: http://www.tnwd.uscourts.gov/pdf/content/ADRPlan.pdf (agj)
July 2, 2021 Filing 2 Judge Jon Phipps McCalla and Magistrate Judge Annie T. Christoff added. (agj)
July 2, 2021 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Bridge SFR Loans, LLC from Shelby County Chancery Court, case number CH-21-0783 (Filing fee $ 402 receipt number ATNWDC-3646330), filed by Bridge SFR Loans, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Civil Cover Sheet)(Baker, Joseph)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Tennessee Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Castleman Ferryman, LLC et al v. Bridge SFR Loans, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Not classified by court: Clerk W. Aaron Hall
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Danville Ferryman, LLC
Represented By: Taylor A. Cates
Represented By: Sarah Elizabeth Stuart
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Castleman Ferryman, LLC
Represented By: Taylor A. Cates
Represented By: Sarah Elizabeth Stuart
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Midtown Witney, LLC
Represented By: Taylor A. Cates
Represented By: Sarah Elizabeth Stuart
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Plum Marsh, LLC
Represented By: Taylor A. Cates
Represented By: Sarah Elizabeth Stuart
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Midtown Reginald, LLC
Represented By: Taylor A. Cates
Represented By: Sarah Elizabeth Stuart
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Gull Patras, LLC
Represented By: Taylor A. Cates
Represented By: Sarah Elizabeth Stuart
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Egyptian George, LLC
Represented By: Taylor A. Cates
Represented By: Sarah Elizabeth Stuart
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kaspa Properties, LLC
Represented By: Taylor A. Cates
Represented By: Sarah Elizabeth Stuart
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Midtown 10 Turnley, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bridge SFR Loans, LLC
Represented By: Joseph B. Baker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?