Higginbotham v. State Farm Fire and Casualty Company
Plaintiff: LB Higginbotham
Defendant: State Farm Fire and Casualty Company
Not Classified By Court: Temiika Gipson
Case Number: 2:2021cv02460
Filed: July 9, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Tennessee
Presiding Judge: Charmiane G Claxton
Referring Judge: Mark S Norris
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1441
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 24, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 24, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 12 [**TEXT ORDER ONLY - NO IMAGE ATTACHED**] ORDER GRANTING #11 JOINT MOTION FOR A CONTINUANCE OF THE INITIAL CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE. The parties' joint motion is hereby GRANTED. The Scheduling Conference in this matter currently set for Friday, September 24, 2021 at 9:30 a.m. is CONTINUED to Friday, November 19, 2021 at 9:30 a.m. Signed by Judge Mark S. Norris on 8/24/2021. (Norris, Mark)
August 23, 2021 Filing 11 Joint MOTION to Continue Initial Case Management Conference by State Farm Fire and Casualty Company. (Evans, Matthew)
July 12, 2021 Filing 10 NOTICE of Appearance by Adam Duggan on behalf of State Farm Fire and Casualty Company (Duggan, Adam)
July 12, 2021 Filing 9 SETTING LETTER: Scheduling Conference set for Friday, 09/24/2021 at 09:30 AM in Courtroom 4 - Memphis before Judge Mark S. Norris. (zsf)
July 12, 2021 Filing 8 ANSWER to Complaint with Jury Demand by State Farm Fire and Casualty Company.(Evans, Matthew)
July 9, 2021 Filing 7 NOTICE OF RIGHT TO CONSENT TO THE EXERCISE OF CIVIL JURISDICTION BY A MAGISTRATE JUDGE Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 636(c), Fed.R.Civ.P.73, and Local Rule 72.1, this Court has designated the Magistrate Judges of this District to conduct trials and otherwise dispose of any civil case that is filed in this Court. Your decision to consent, or not consent, to the referral of your case to a United States Magistrate Judge for trial and entry of a final judgment must be entirely voluntary. The judge or magistrate judge to whom the case has been assigned will not be informed of your decision unless all parties agree that the case may be referred to a magistrate judge for these specific purposes. A less than unanimous decision will not be communicated by this office to either the judge or magistrate judge. The consent form is available on the courts website at https://www.tnwd.uscourts.gov/forms-and-applications.php (agj)
July 9, 2021 Filing 6 NOTICE OF CASE TRACKING ASSIGNMENT PURSUANT TO LOCAL RULE 16.2: Pursuant to Local Rule 16.2, this case has been assigned to the Standard track. http://www.tnwd.uscourts.gov/pdf/content/LocalRules.pdf (agj)
July 9, 2021 Filing 5 NOTICE TO COMPLY WITH PLAN FOR ALTERNATE DISPUTE RESOLUTION (ADR): Pursuant to Section to 2.1 of the ADR Plan, all civil cases filed on or after Sept. 1, 2014, shall be referred automatically for ADR. For compliance requirements, refer to the ADR Plan at: http://www.tnwd.uscourts.gov/pdf/content/ADRPlan.pdf (agj)
July 9, 2021 Filing 4 Judge Mark S. Norris and Magistrate Judge Charmiane G. Claxton added. (agj)
July 9, 2021 Filing 3 Corporate Disclosure Statement by State Farm Fire and Casualty Company. (Evans, Matthew)
July 9, 2021 Filing 2 Corporate Disclosure Statement by State Farm Fire and Casualty Company. (Evans, Matthew)
July 9, 2021 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by State Farm Fire and Casualty Company from Shelby County Circuit Court, case number CT-2316-21 (Filing fee $ 402 receipt number ATNWDC-3650405), filed by State Farm Fire and Casualty Company. (Attachments: #1 Civil cover sheet, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B)(Evans, Matthew)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Tennessee Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Higginbotham v. State Farm Fire and Casualty Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Not classified by court: Temiika Gipson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: LB Higginbotham
Represented By: Alexandria Fisher
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: State Farm Fire and Casualty Company
Represented By: Matthew Joshua Evans
Represented By: Adam Duggan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?