Fields et al v. Gebrekidan et al
Plaintiff: Jabria Fields and Chivon Fields
Defendant: Mengestab Gebrekidan and Bisrat Dispatching, LLC
Not Classified By Court: Temiika Gipson
Case Number: 2:2021cv02489
Filed: July 23, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Tennessee
Presiding Judge: Charmiane G Claxton
Referring Judge: Jon Phipps McCalla
Nature of Suit: Motor Vehicle
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 7, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 7, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 13 CONSENT PROTECTIVE ORDER. Signed by Judge Jon Phipps McCalla on 09/07/2021. (mab)
August 26, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 12 SCHEDULING ORDER and DISMISSAL of LOSS of CONSORTIUM CLAIM. Signed by Judge Jon Phipps McCalla on 08/26/2021. (mab)
August 25, 2021 Filing 11 SETTING LETTER: Jury Trial set for Monday, 9/12/2022 at 9:30 AM before Judge Jon Phipps McCalla. Video Pretrial Conference set for Friday, 9/2/2022 at 10:30 AM before Judge Jon Phipps McCalla. Proposed Joint Pretrial Order due by 4:30 PM on 8/26/2022. (jpw)
August 25, 2021 Filing 10 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Jon Phipps McCalla: Telephonic Scheduling Conference held on 8/25/2021. William Thomas Hackett appeared for the Plaintiff. Cameron Watson appeared for the Defense. The Court set a schedule with deadlines and dates, including a trial schedule. The Jury Trial is set for Monday, September 12, 2022 at 9:30 AM before Judge Jon Phipps McCalla. The trial is estimated to take 3-4 days. The Proposed Joint Pretrial Order will be due by 4:30 PM on August 26, 2022. The Pretrial Conference is set for Friday, September 2, 2022 at 10:30 AM. The Pretrial Conference will proceed by video. A Scheduling Oder will be entered. (Court Reporter: Tina Gibson) (jpw)
August 20, 2021 Filing 9 REPORT of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting (Proposed Order Submitted). (Watson, Cameron)
August 3, 2021 Filing 8 NOTICE by Chivon Fields, Jabria Fields Notice of Service of Discovery to Defendants (Attachments: #1 Exhibit RogsR2P to Def Bisrat Dispatching LLC - WTH 8.3.21, #2 Exhibit RogsR2P to Def Mengestab Gebrekidan - WTH 8.3.21.doc)(Hackett, William)
July 30, 2021 Filing 7 ANSWER to Complaint with Jury Demand by All Defendants.(Watson, Cameron)
July 27, 2021 Filing 6 SETTING LETTER: A Telephonic Scheduling Conference has been set for Wednesday, 8/25/2021 at 2:00 PM before Judge Jon Phipps McCalla. To access the telephonic conference parties will dial 888-675-2535 and enter access code 7360481. Please call at least 5 minutes in advance of the conference time. (jrs)
July 23, 2021 Filing 5 NOTICE OF RIGHT TO CONSENT TO THE EXERCISE OF CIVIL JURISDICTION BY A MAGISTRATE JUDGE Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 636(c), Fed.R.Civ.P.73, and Local Rule 72.1, this Court has designated the Magistrate Judges of this District to conduct trials and otherwise dispose of any civil case that is filed in this Court. Your decision to consent, or not consent, to the referral of your case to a United States Magistrate Judge for trial and entry of a final judgment must be entirely voluntary. The judge or magistrate judge to whom the case has been assigned will not be informed of your decision unless all parties agree that the case may be referred to a magistrate judge for these specific purposes. A less than unanimous decision will not be communicated by this office to either the judge or magistrate judge. The consent form is available on the courts website at https://www.tnwd.uscourts.gov/forms-and-applications.php (jae)
July 23, 2021 Filing 4 NOTICE TO COMPLY WITH PLAN FOR ALTERNATE DISPUTE RESOLUTION (ADR): Pursuant to Section to 2.1 of the ADR Plan, all civil cases filed on or after Sept. 1, 2014, shall be referred automatically for ADR. For compliance requirements, refer to the ADR Plan at: http://www.tnwd.uscourts.gov/pdf/content/ADRPlan.pdf (jae)
July 23, 2021 Filing 3 NOTICE OF CASE TRACKING ASSIGNMENT PURSUANT TO LOCAL RULE 16.2: Pursuant to Local Rule 16.2, this case has been assigned to the Standard track. http://www.tnwd.uscourts.gov/pdf/content/LocalRules.pdf (jae)
July 23, 2021 Filing 2 Judge Jon Phipps McCalla and Magistrate Judge Charmiane G. Claxton added. (jae)
July 23, 2021 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by All Defendants from Circuit Court of Shelby County, Tennessee, case number CT-2297-21 (Filing fee $ 402 receipt number ATNWDC-3662558), filed by All Defendants. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Complaint, #2 Exhibit Affidavit of Service - Bisrat Dispatching, LLC, #3 Exhibit Affidavit of Service - Mengestab Gebrekidan, #4 Civil Cover Sheet)(Watson, Cameron)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Tennessee Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Fields et al v. Gebrekidan et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Not classified by court: Temiika Gipson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jabria Fields
Represented By: William Thomas Hackett
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Chivon Fields
Represented By: William Thomas Hackett
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mengestab Gebrekidan
Represented By: Cameron M. Watson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bisrat Dispatching, LLC
Represented By: Cameron M. Watson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?