Seymour v. Rhodes College
Plaintiff: Camilla Seymour
Defendant: Rhodes College
Case Number: 2:2021cv02523
Filed: August 12, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Tennessee
Presiding Judge: Charmiane G Claxton
Referring Judge: Samuel H Mays
Nature of Suit: Labor: Family and Medical Leave Act
Cause of Action: 29 U.S.C. ยง 2615 a
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 8, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 8, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 11 JUDGMENT dismissing the case WITH PREJUDICE in accordance with the Order docketed on 09/08/2021, signed by Judge Samuel H. Mays, Jr. on 09/08/2021. (Mays, Samuel)
September 8, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER dismissing this case WITH PREJUDICE, pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 41(a)(1)(A)(i), signed by Judge Samuel H. Mays, Jr. on 09/08/2021. (Mays, Samuel)
September 8, 2021 Filing 9 NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by Camilla Seymour (Oliphant, Philip)
September 8, 2021 Filing 8 DEFICIENCY NOTICE: Pursuant to Rule 5 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure, document #7 Notice of Voluntary Dismissal filed by Camilla Seymour has been filed. However, the following deficiency has been found: the CM/ECF user name and the electronic signature on the pleading do not match. Please refer to the #ECF User Manual and #ECF Policies and Procedures. The filer has one business day to correct the deficiency. (agj)
September 6, 2021 Filing 7 NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by Camilla Seymour (Oliphant, Philip)
August 13, 2021 Filing 6 Summons Issued as to Rhodes College. The filer has been notified electronically that the summons has been issued, and the new docket entry reflects this. Upon notification of the new docket entry, the filer is to print the issued summons in order to effect service. (jae)
August 13, 2021 Filing 5 NOTICE OF RIGHT TO CONSENT TO THE EXERCISE OF CIVIL JURISDICTION BY A MAGISTRATE JUDGE Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 636(c), Fed.R.Civ.P.73, and Local Rule 72.1, this Court has designated the Magistrate Judges of this District to conduct trials and otherwise dispose of any civil case that is filed in this Court. Your decision to consent, or not consent, to the referral of your case to a United States Magistrate Judge for trial and entry of a final judgment must be entirely voluntary. The judge or magistrate judge to whom the case has been assigned will not be informed of your decision unless all parties agree that the case may be referred to a magistrate judge for these specific purposes. A less than unanimous decision will not be communicated by this office to either the judge or magistrate judge. The consent form is available on the courts website at https://www.tnwd.uscourts.gov/forms-and-applications.php (jae)
August 13, 2021 Filing 4 NOTICE TO COMPLY WITH PLAN FOR ALTERNATE DISPUTE RESOLUTION (ADR): Pursuant to Section to 2.1 of the ADR Plan, all civil cases filed on or after Sept. 1, 2014, shall be referred automatically for ADR. For compliance requirements, refer to the ADR Plan at: http://www.tnwd.uscourts.gov/pdf/content/ADRPlan.pdf (jae)
August 13, 2021 Filing 3 NOTICE OF CASE TRACKING ASSIGNMENT PURSUANT TO LOCAL RULE 16.2: Pursuant to Local Rule 16.2, this case has been assigned to the Standard track. http://www.tnwd.uscourts.gov/pdf/content/LocalRules.pdf (jae)
August 12, 2021 Filing 2 Judge Samuel H. Mays, Jr and Magistrate Judge Charmiane G. Claxton added. (jae)
August 12, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Rhodes College (Filing fee $ 402 receipt number ATNWDC-3677108), filed by Camilla Seymour. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons)(Oliphant, Philip)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Tennessee Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Seymour v. Rhodes College
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Camilla Seymour
Represented By: Philip Eric Oliphant
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Rhodes College
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?