Stinson v. United States of America
Petitioner: Mark Stinson
Respondent: United States of America
Case Number: 2:2021cv02526
Filed: August 16, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Tennessee
Presiding Judge: Annie T Christoff
Referring Judge: John T Fowlkes
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Vacate Sentence
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 2255
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 1, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 1, 2021 Filing 7 COA case number 21-5829. Second Successive Motion Docketed. Notice filed by Movant Mark Stinson. 2nd/Successive Motion Received in 6CA: 09/01/2021. (csf)
September 1, 2021 Filing 6 COA case number 21-5829. Copy of District Court Order filed to transfer proceedings to United Sates Court of Appeals for the Sixth Circuit.(csf)
August 31, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 5 Order transferring #1 Successive 2255 Motion to Sixth Circuit Court of Appeals and closing case. Signed by Judge John T. Fowlkes, Jr. on 08/31/2021. (Fowlkes, J.)
August 18, 2021 Filing 4 NOTICE of Appearance by Calvin David Biggers, Jr on behalf of United States of America (Biggers, Calvin)
August 16, 2021 Filing 3 NOTICE OF CASE TRACKING ASSIGNMENT PURSUANT TO LOCAL RULE 16.2: Pursuant to Local Rule 16.2, this case has been assigned to the Pro Se Prisoner track. http://www.tnwd.uscourts.gov/pdf/content/LocalRules.pdf (csf)
August 16, 2021 Filing 2 Pro Se MOTION and Affidavit for Permission to Appeal In Forma Pauperis by Mark Stinson. (csf)
August 16, 2021 Filing 1 PRO SE Motion to Vacate, Set Aside or Correct a Sentence filed by Mark Stinson against United States of America. (Attachments: #1 Attachments, #2 Envelope, #3 Judicial Cards)(csf)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Tennessee Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Stinson v. United States of America
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Mark Stinson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: United States of America
Represented By: 2255 AUSA
Represented By: Calvin David Biggers, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?