Ragland, II v. F & M Koz, Inc et al
Plaintiff: Eric Ragland, II
Defendant: F & M Koz, Inc, Mary Kozlowski and Frank Kozlowski
Not Classified By Court: Temiika Gipson
Case Number: 2:2021cv02530
Filed: August 17, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Tennessee
Presiding Judge: Charmiane G Claxton
Referring Judge: Thomas L Parker
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1981
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 9, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 9, 2021 Filing 12 Pro Se Plaintiff's Response to Defendant's Reply by Eric Ragland, II re #11 Reply to Response to Motion. (Submitted via drop box) (btg)
September 8, 2021 Filing 11 REPLY to Response to Motion re #10 Response in Opposition to Motion Defs' Reply to Plf's Response to Defs' Motion to Dismiss Plf's Amended Complaint filed by F & M Koz, Inc, Temiika Gipson, Frank Kozlowski, Mary Kozlowski. (Jackson, Russell)
August 25, 2021 Filing 10 PRO SE RESPONSE in Opposition re #8 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM filed by Eric Ragland, II. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(jae)
August 24, 2021 Filing 9 NOTICE by F & M Koz, Inc, Frank Kozlowski, Mary Kozlowski re #7 Notice (Other) Notice of Filing (Jackson, Russell)
August 24, 2021 Filing 8 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM by F & M Koz, Inc, Frank Kozlowski, Mary Kozlowski. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum)(Jackson, Russell)
August 24, 2021 Filing 7 NOTICE by F & M Koz, Inc, Frank Kozlowski, Mary Kozlowski re #1 Notice of Removal, (Jackson, Russell)
August 17, 2021 Filing 6 NOTICE of Signed Agreement to Receive Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) by Eric Ragland, II (agj)
August 17, 2021 Filing 5 Case initiation fee: $ 402.00, receipt number M4676049845 (agj)
August 17, 2021 Filing 4 NOTICE OF RIGHT TO CONSENT TO THE EXERCISE OF CIVIL JURISDICTION BY A MAGISTRATE JUDGE Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 636(c), Fed.R.Civ.P.73, and Local Rule 72.1, this Court has designated the Magistrate Judges of this District to conduct trials and otherwise dispose of any civil case that is filed in this Court. Your decision to consent, or not consent, to the referral of your case to a United States Magistrate Judge for trial and entry of a final judgment must be entirely voluntary. The judge or magistrate judge to whom the case has been assigned will not be informed of your decision unless all parties agree that the case may be referred to a magistrate judge for these specific purposes. A less than unanimous decision will not be communicated by this office to either the judge or magistrate judge. The consent form is available on the courts website at https://www.tnwd.uscourts.gov/forms-and-applications.php (jae)
August 17, 2021 Filing 3 NOTICE TO COMPLY WITH PLAN FOR ALTERNATE DISPUTE RESOLUTION (ADR): Pursuant to Section to 2.1 of the ADR Plan, all civil cases filed on or after Sept. 1, 2014, shall be referred automatically for ADR. For compliance requirements, refer to the ADR Plan at: http://www.tnwd.uscourts.gov/pdf/content/ADRPlan.pdf (jae)
August 17, 2021 Filing 2 NOTICE OF CASE TRACKING ASSIGNMENT PURSUANT TO LOCAL RULE 16.2: Pursuant to Local Rule 16.2, this case has been assigned to the Standard track. http://www.tnwd.uscourts.gov/pdf/content/LocalRules.pdf (jae)
August 17, 2021 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Eric Ragland, II from Shelby County Circuit Court, case number CR 0915-21. ( Filing fee $ 402), filed by Eric Ragland, II. (Attachments: #1 Notice of filing, #2 Civil Cover Sheet, #3 Index of State Court Record, #4 Part 1 of State Court Records, #5 Part 2 of State Court Records, #6 Part 3 of State Court Records, #7 Judicial Cards)(jae)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Tennessee Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Ragland, II v. F & M Koz, Inc et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Not classified by court: Temiika Gipson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Eric Ragland, II
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: F & M Koz, Inc
Represented By: Russell W. Jackson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mary Kozlowski
Represented By: Russell W. Jackson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Frank Kozlowski
Represented By: Russell W. Jackson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?