Austin v. Camping World of Memphis, et al
Plaintiff: Aron J. Austin
Defendant: Camping World of Memphis, Camping World Collision Center, Inc. and Camping World Holdings, Inc.
Case Number: 2:2021cv02541
Filed: August 23, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Tennessee
Presiding Judge: Charmiane G Claxton
Referring Judge: Thomas L Parker
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 1, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 18, 2021 Filing 36 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Charmiane G. Claxton: Scheduling Conference held on 10/18/2021. Counsel for the parties present via video. Proposed scheduling order submitted. The Court discussed the dates with the parties. The Court will appoint a mediator for this matter. For the reasons stated on the record the Court DENIED the Motions at DE#9, DE#13, DE#32 & DE#34. The Court will enter the Scheduling Order. (Plaintiff: Pro Se. Defendants Counsel: Kathryn Namen & Caroline Loveless.) (Tape #Teams) (cas)
October 18, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 35 ORDER granting #33 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Signed by Magistrate Judge Charmiane G. Claxton on 10/18/2021. (Claxton, Charmiane)
October 15, 2021 Filing 34 PRO SE MOTION to submit video of evidence of damage by Aron J. Austin. (Attachments: #1 verified statement)(jae)
October 14, 2021 Filing 33 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice (Filing fee $ 150 receipt number ATNWDC-3724316) by Camping World Collision Center, Inc., Camping World Holdings, Inc., Camping World of Memphis. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A Email from Plaintiff, #2 Certificate of Good Standing from U. S. District Court, #3 Certificate of Good Standing Mississippi Supreme Court)(Loveless, Caroline)
October 12, 2021 Filing 31 NOTICE OF SETTING: A SCHEDULING CONFERENCE has been set for MONDAY, 10/18/2021 at 02:30 PM before Magistrate Judge Charmiane G. Claxton. The proceeding will be done via Microsoft Teams video conference. The Court will email the parties an invitation for the video conference prior to the proceeding. Counsel should submit a proposed scheduling order to the Judge's ECF mailbox at least three (3) days prior to the proceeding. The public may also access the video proceeding. If the public and/or media wish to attend in the video proceeding, please click on the following link to request access information: #https://www.tnwd.uscourts.gov/videohearings The access information will be delivered via email to the email address from which the request originated.Parties should consult the instructions for #Joining a Meeting in Teams or #Joining a Meeting Without a Teams Account. Please email chris_sowell@tnwd.uscourts.gov for any questions. Any requests for a continuance of the Scheduling Conference should be made by written motion.(bvh)
October 8, 2021 Filing 32 PRO SE MOTION for Discovery by Aron J. Austin. (Submitted via Clerk's drop box) (btg)
October 6, 2021 Filing 30 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Aron J. Austin as to Marcus Lemonis, CEO & Owner (CWH). (btg)
October 6, 2021 Filing 29 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Aron J. Austin as to Camping World Holdings, Inc. (btg)
October 6, 2021 Filing 28 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Aron J. Austin as to Camping World RV Sales, LLC. (btg)
October 6, 2021 Filing 27 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Aron J. Austin as to Camping World Corporate Office. (btg)
October 6, 2021 Filing 26 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Aron J. Austin as to Camping World Collision Center, Inc. (btg)
October 4, 2021 Filing 25 Summons Issued as to Camping World Corporate, Camping World RV Sales and Marcus Anthony Lemonis. The filer presented summons to be issued (to parties named in amended complaint). Summons were signed and dated and returned to filer for service. (Attachments: #1 summons, #2 summons)(jae)
October 4, 2021 Filing 24 Summons Reissued as to Camping World Collision Center, Inc., Camping World Holdings, Inc.. Filer present summons at the Intake counter. They were signed and dated and returned to filer for service. (Attachments: #1 summons)(jae)
October 4, 2021 Filing 23 ATTACHMENT (Part 5) to #21 Attachment by Aron J. Austin.. (Attachments: #1 part 6)(jae)
October 4, 2021 Filing 22 ATTACHMENT (part 3) to #21 amended complaint by Aron J. Austin.. (Attachments: #1 part 4)(jae)
October 4, 2021 Filing 21 ATTACHMENT - AMENDED COMPLAINT to #20 MOTION to Amend #1 Pro Se Complaint, by Aron J. Austin.. (Attachments: #1 Part 2 of amended complaint)(jae)
October 4, 2021 Filing 20 MOTION to Amend #1 Pro Se Complaint, by Aron J. Austin. (jae)
October 1, 2021 Filing 19 RESPONSE in Opposition re #12 MOTION for Joinder Joinder in Camping World RV Sales, LLC's Response in Opposition to Plaintiff' Motion for Joinder filed by Camping World Holdings, Inc.. (Van Namen, Kathryn)
October 1, 2021 Filing 18 RESPONSE in Opposition re #12 MOTION for Joinder filed by Camping World Collision Center, Inc., Camping World of Memphis. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Ex. A - Declaration of Lindsey Christen)(Van Namen, Kathryn)
September 30, 2021 Filing 17 AMENDED ANSWER to Complaint by Camping World Holdings, Inc.. (Van Namen, Kathryn)
September 27, 2021 Filing 16 MOTION to Amend #1 Pro Se Complaint Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. 15(1), 15(2) by Aron J. Austin. (agj)
September 22, 2021 Filing 15 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Camping World Collision Center, Inc., Camping World of Memphis identifying Corporate Parent Camping World Holdings, Inc., Corporate Parent FreedomRoads Operations Company, LLC, Corporate Parent FreedomRoads, LLC, Corporate Parent FreedomRoads Intermediate Holdco, LLC, Corporate Parent ITM Holding Company #2, LLC, Corporate Parent ITM Holding Company, LLC, Corporate Parent FreedomRoads Holding Company, LLC, Corporate Parent CWGS Group, LLC, Corporate Parent CWGS Enterprises, LLC, Corporate Parent CWGS Holding, LLC, Corporate Parent CVRV Acquisition, LLC, Corporate Parent CWH BR, LLC, Corporate Parent ML Acquisition Company, LLC, Corporate Parent AGI Holding Corp., Corporate Parent ML RV Group, LLC, Corporate Parent Crestview Partners II GP, LP, Other Affiliate Camping World RV Sales, LLC for Camping World Collision Center, Inc., Camping World of Memphis.. (Van Namen, Kathryn)
September 22, 2021 Filing 14 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Camping World Holdings, Inc.. (Van Namen, Kathryn)
September 17, 2021 Filing 13 PRO SE MOTION for Discovery by Aron J. Austin. (no envelope - drop box) (jae)
September 16, 2021 Filing 12 PRO SE MOTION for Joinder by Aron J. Austin. (jae)
September 15, 2021 Filing 11 ANSWER to Complaint by Camping World Holdings, Inc..(Van Namen, Kathryn)
September 15, 2021 Filing 10 ANSWER to Complaint by Camping World Collision Center, Inc., Camping World of Memphis.(Van Namen, Kathryn)
September 3, 2021 Filing 9 Plaintiff MOTION for Video Captured Footage of Damage to be Entered into Evidence by Aron J. Austin. (agj)
August 30, 2021 Filing 8 NOTICE of Plaintiffs Addition Exhibit #2 by Aron J. Austin (Attachments: #1 Exhibt A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E)(csf)
August 26, 2021 Filing 7 NOTICE of Plaintiff Additional Exhibits by Aron J. Austin (agj)
August 25, 2021 Filing 6 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Aron J. Austin as to Camping World Holdings, Inc.. (jae)
August 25, 2021 Filing 5 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Aron J. Austin as to Camping World of Memphis. (jae) (Main Document 5 replaced on 8/26/2021) (jae).
August 23, 2021 Filing 4 Case initiation fee: $ 402.00, receipt number M4676049867 (agj)
August 23, 2021 Filing 3 Agreement to receive Notice of Electronic Filing by Aron J. Austin (jae)
August 23, 2021 Filing 2 Summons Issued as to Camping World Holdings, Inc., Camping World of Memphis. Filer was given summons for service of process. (Attachments: #1 summons)(jae)
August 23, 2021 Filing 1 PRO SE COMPLAINT against Camping World Collision Center, Inc., Camping World Holdings, Inc., Camping World of Memphis (Filing fee $ 402.), filed by Aron J. Austin. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Civil Cover Sheet, #3 Judicial assignment cards)(jae)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Tennessee Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Austin v. Camping World of Memphis, et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Aron J. Austin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Camping World of Memphis
Represented By: Caroline C. Loveless
Represented By: Kathryn Van Namen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Camping World Collision Center, Inc.
Represented By: Caroline C. Loveless
Represented By: Kathryn Van Namen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Camping World Holdings, Inc.
Represented By: Caroline C. Loveless
Represented By: Kathryn Van Namen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?