Harris v. Wells Fargo Bank, N.A. et al
Plaintiff: Heather Hogrobrooks Harris
Defendant: Wells Fargo Bank, N.A. and Wilson & Associates, P.L.L.C.
Case Number: 2:2021cv02558
Filed: August 31, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Tennessee
Presiding Judge: John T Fowlkes
Referring Judge: Tu M Pham
Nature of Suit: Real Property: Foreclosure
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. § 1981
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 14, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 29, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 31 ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE. Signed by Judge John T. Fowlkes, Jr. on 10/29/2021. (Fowlkes, J.)
October 28, 2021 Filing 30 ANSWER to Complaint by Wilson & Associates, P.L.L.C..(Morrison, H.)
October 28, 2021 Filing 29 MEMORANDUM in Support re #28 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM filed by Wells Fargo Bank, N.A.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Deed of Trust)(Morris, Samuel)
October 28, 2021 Filing 28 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM by Wells Fargo Bank, N.A.. (Morris, Samuel)
October 28, 2021 Filing 27 TEXT ORDER granting #26 Motion for Leave to File Excess Pages. The motion is hereby granted. It is so ordered. Signed by Chief Magistrate Judge Tu M. Pham on October 28, 2021. (TEXT ORDER ONLY - NO IMAGE ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY) (cmp)
October 28, 2021 Filing 26 MOTION for Leave to File Excess Pages (proposed order submitted) by Wells Fargo Bank, N.A.. (Morris, Samuel)
October 27, 2021 Filing 25 SETTING LETTER: Show Cause Hearing set for Thursday, 1/12/2022 10:00 AM - Memphis before Judge John T. Fowlkes Jr. The proceeding will be held via Microsoft Teams video conference. The Court will email the parties an invitation for the video conference 1 day prior to the proceeding.Counsel should submit any exhibits to be offered to the Judge's ECF mailbox prior to the proceeding.The public may also access the video proceeding. If the public and/or media wish to attend in the video proceeding, please click on the following link to request access information: #https://www.tnwd.uscourts.gov/videohearings The access information will be delivered via email to the email address from which the request originated.Parties should consult the instructions for #Joining a Meeting in Teams or #Joining a Meeting Without a Teams Account. Please email Ross Herrin at ross_herrin@tnwd.uscourts.gov for any questions. (wrh)
October 27, 2021 Filing 23 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge John T. Fowlkes, Jr.: Evidentiary Hearing held on 10/27/2021. Plaintiff did not appear for the hearing. Defense counsel Samuel Morris & Reid Manley present. The Court will enter an Order Denying the Preliminary Injunction as well as a Show Cause Order. The Court noted that Mr. Harris has not been present for any of the previous proceedings held by Microsoft Teams and was also confirmed by the case manager. Defense counsel Reid Manley received an email reply from Plaintiff which stated that Plaintiff was unable to open the Word Document, Consent Before the Magistrate form emailed to her by the case manager. The Court sets the case Wednesday, 01/12/2022 at 10:00 a.m. for a Show Cause/Scheduling Conference Hearing. (Plaintiff: Pro Se)(Defense: Samuel Morris, Reid Manley) (Court Reporter Mark Dodson.) (wrh)
October 27, 2021 Filing 22 NOTICE of Appearance by Reid S. Manley on behalf of Wells Fargo Bank, N.A. (Manley, Reid)
October 27, 2021 Filing 21 NOTICE of Appearance by Samuel Aitken Morris on behalf of Wells Fargo Bank, N.A. (Morris, Samuel)
October 22, 2021 Filing 20 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Heather Hogrobrooks Harris as to Wilson & Associates, P.L.L.C.. (agj)
October 22, 2021 Filing 19 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Heather Hogrobrooks Harris as to Wells Fargo Bank, N.A.. (agj)
October 20, 2021 Filing 18 RESPONSE in Opposition re #7 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction filed by Wells Fargo Bank, N.A.. (Morris, Samuel)
October 13, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ORDER denying Plaintiff's Motion to Disqualify Judge. Signed by Judge John T. Fowlkes, Jr. on 10/13/2021. (Fowlkes, J.)
October 12, 2021 Filing 16 SETTING LETTER: Re: #7 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction. Preliminary Injunction Hearing set for Wednesday, 10/27/2021 10:15 AM before Judge John T. Fowlkes Jr. The proceeding will be held via Microsoft Teams video conference. The Court will email the parties an invitation for the video conference 1 day prior to the proceeding.Counsel should submit any exhibits to be offered to the Judge's ECF mailbox prior to the proceeding.The public may also access the video proceeding. If the public and/or media wish to attend in the video proceeding, please click on the following link to request access information: #https://www.tnwd.uscourts.gov/videohearings The access information will be delivered via email to the email address from which the request originated.Parties should consult the instructions for #Joining a Meeting in Teams or #Joining a Meeting Without a Teams Account. Please email Ross Herrin at ross_herrin@tnwd.uscourts.gov for any questions. (wrh)
October 12, 2021 Filing 15 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge John T. Fowlkes, Jr.: Status Conference held on 10/12/2021. Plaintiff not present for hearing; Defense counsel Sam Morris present via Microsoft Teams video conferencing. Defendant has file a response de#14 to Plaintiff's Motion to Disqualify Judge Fowlkes de#11 . The Court Denies the Temporary Restraining Order; The Court will enter an Order Denying the Motion to Disqualify/Recuse Judge Fowlkes by end of week. Case set Wednesday, 10/27/2021 at 10:15 a.m. for Preliminary Injunction & Show Cause hearing. (Plaintiff: Pro Se)(Defense: Sam Morris) (Court Reporter Tina Gibson.) (wrh)
October 12, 2021 Filing 14 RESPONSE to Motion re #7 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction Response to Request for Temporary Restraining Order filed by Wells Fargo Bank, N.A.. (Morris, Samuel)
October 5, 2021 Filing 13 SETTING LETTER: Re: #7 Motion Hearing set for Tuesday, 10/12/2021 11:00 AM before Judge John T. Fowlkes Jr. MOTION for Preliminary Injunction, #11 MOTION to Disqualify Judge. The proceeding will be held via Microsoft Teams video conference. The Court will email the parties an invitation for the video conference 1 day prior to the proceeding.Counsel should submit any exhibits to be offered to the Judge's ECF mailbox prior to the proceeding.The public may also access the video proceeding. If the public and/or media wish to attend in the video proceeding, please click on the following link to request access information: #https://www.tnwd.uscourts.gov/videohearings The access information will be delivered via email to the email address from which the request originated.Parties should consult the instructions for #Joining a Meeting in Teams or #Joining a Meeting Without a Teams Account. Please email Ross Herrin at ross_herrin@tnwd.uscourts.gov for any questions. (wrh)
October 5, 2021 Filing 12 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge John T. Fowlkes, Jr.: Hearing on Temporary Restraining Order held on 10/5/2021. Plaintiff not present; case manager attempted to reach Plaintiff by telephone, reached voicemail. Defense counsel Samuel Morris present via Microsoft Teams video conferencing. Mr. Morris informed the Court that the Defendant, Wells Fargo Bank, et al has not been served. The Court can not address the TRO until the Motion to Disqualify the Court is ruled upon. The Court instructed Defendant to file a brief response as to DE#7 Motion for Preliminary Injunction. Case reset to Tuesday, 10/12/2021 at 11:00 a.m. for Motion to Disqualify the Court & TRO hearing. (Plaintiff: Pro Se)(Defense: Samuel Morris) (Court Reporter Mark Dodson.) (wrh)
October 1, 2021 Filing 11 MOTION/Affidavit to Disqualify Judge John T. Fowlkes, Jr. by Heather Hogrobrooks Harris. (agj)
October 1, 2021 Filing 10 Summons Issued as to Wells Fargo Bank, N.A., Wilson & Associates, P.L.L.C.. Summons, complaint, USM 285 and copy of Order to issue service printed and placed in USM's inner office mail for service. (Attachments: #1 summons)(jae)
September 30, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER to issue and effect service of process. Signed by Chief Magistrate Judge Tu M. Pham on September 30, 2021. (cmp)
September 30, 2021 Filing 8 SETTING LETTER: Temporary Restraining Order / Preliminary Injunction Hearing set for Tuesday, 10/5/2021 09:30 AM before Judge John T. Fowlkes Jr. The proceeding will be held via Microsoft Teams video conference. The Court will email the parties an invitation for the video conference 1 day prior to the proceeding.Counsel should submit any exhibits to be offered to the Judge's ECF mailbox prior to the proceeding.The public may also access the video proceeding. If the public and/or media wish to attend in the video proceeding, please click on the following link to request access information: #https://www.tnwd.uscourts.gov/videohearings The access information will be delivered via email to the email address from which the request originated.Parties should consult the instructions for #Joining a Meeting in Teams or #Joining a Meeting Without a Teams Account. Please email Ross Herrin at ross_herrin@tnwd.uscourts.gov for any questions. (wrh)
September 22, 2021 Filing 7 PRO SE MOTION for Preliminary Injunction or Restraining Order Pursuant to Rule 65 Under Penalty of Perjury 28 U.S.C. 1746 and Requesting an Expedited Hearing by Heather Hogrobrooks Harris. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(btg)
September 1, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER granting #2 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. Signed by Chief Magistrate Judge Tu M. Pham on September 1, 2021.(cmp)
August 31, 2021 Filing 5 NOTICE TO COMPLY WITH PLAN FOR ALTERNATE DISPUTE RESOLUTION (ADR): Pursuant to Section to 2.1 of the ADR Plan, all civil cases filed on or after Sept. 1, 2014, shall be referred automatically for ADR. For compliance requirements, refer to the ADR Plan at: http://www.tnwd.uscourts.gov/pdf/content/ADRPlan.pdf (csf)
August 31, 2021 Filing 4 NOTICE OF RIGHT TO CONSENT TO THE EXERCISE OF CIVIL JURISDICTION BY A MAGISTRATE JUDGE Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 636(c), Fed.R.Civ.P.73, and Local Rule 72.1, this Court has designated the Magistrate Judges of this District to conduct trials and otherwise dispose of any civil case that is filed in this Court. Your decision to consent, or not consent, to the referral of your case to a United States Magistrate Judge for trial and entry of a final judgment must be entirely voluntary. The judge or magistrate judge to whom the case has been assigned will not be informed of your decision unless all parties agree that the case may be referred to a magistrate judge for these specific purposes. A less than unanimous decision will not be communicated by this office to either the judge or magistrate judge. The consent form is available on the courts website at https://www.tnwd.uscourts.gov/forms-and-applications.php (csf)
August 31, 2021 Filing 3 NOTICE OF CASE TRACKING ASSIGNMENT PURSUANT TO LOCAL RULE 16.2: Pursuant to Local Rule 16.2, this case has been assigned to the Standard track. http://www.tnwd.uscourts.gov/pdf/content/LocalRules.pdf (csf)
August 31, 2021 Filing 2 Pro Se MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Heather Hogrobrooks Harris. (csf)
August 31, 2021 Filing 1 PRO SE COMPLAINT Under 42 U.S.C. 1981 Equal Rights Under the Law filed by Heather Hogrobrooks Harris against All Defendants. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 Letter 9/24/2015, #2 Exhibit 2 Letter 2/15/2018, #3 Exhibit 3 Non Qualifying Assumption, #4 Exhibit 4 Order from USBC, #5 Exhibit 5 Letter 8/5/2021, #6 Judicial Cards)(csf)
August 31, 2021 Pursuant to Administrative Order 2013-05, this case has been assigned to the United States magistrate judge for management of all pretrial matters, including screening of the complaint to determine whether or not summons shall be issued by the Clerk pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 1915(e)(2)(B) and Local Rule 4.1(b)(2) (csf)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Tennessee Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Harris v. Wells Fargo Bank, N.A. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Heather Hogrobrooks Harris
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wells Fargo Bank, N.A.
Represented By: Samuel Aitken Morris
Represented By: Reid S. Manley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wilson & Associates, P.L.L.C.
Represented By: H. Keith Morrison
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?