Hamer v. United States of America
Plaintiff: Herbert Hamer
Defendant: United States of America
Case Number: 2:2021cv02582
Filed: September 13, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Tennessee
Presiding Judge: Samuel H Mays
Referring Judge: Tu M Pham
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1983
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 3, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 3, 2021 Filing 7 Mail Returned as Undeliverable. Mail sent to Herbert Hamer. (Attachments: #1 envelope) (btg)
October 29, 2021 Filing 6 Mail Returned as Undeliverable. Mail sent to Herbert Hamer. (Attachments: #1 envelope) (btg)
October 8, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER granting #4 Motion for Extension of Time for Plaintiff to comply with 28 U.S.C. 1915(a)(2) or pay the $402 civil filing fee, signed by Judge Samuel H. Mays, Jr. on 10/08/2021. (Mays, Samuel)
October 6, 2021 Filing 4 PRO SE MOTION for Extension of Time to File IFP Motion by Herbert Hamer. (Attachments: #1 envelope)(btg)
September 20, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER directing Plaintiff to comply with 28 U.S.C. 1915(A)(1)-(2) or pay the $402 civil filing fee, signed by Judge Samuel H. Mays, Jr. on 09/20/2021. (Mays, Samuel)
September 13, 2021 Filing 2 NOTICE OF CASE TRACKING ASSIGNMENT PURSUANT TO LOCAL RULE 16.2: Pursuant to Local Rule 16.2, this case has been assigned to the Pro Se Prisoner track. http://www.tnwd.uscourts.gov/pdf/content/LocalRules.pdf (csf)
September 13, 2021 Filing 1 PRO SE COMPLAINT for Violation of Civil Rights Under 42 U.S.C. 1983 filed by Herbert Hamer against United States of America. (Attachments: #1 Envelope, #2 Judicial Cards)(csf)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Tennessee Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Hamer v. United States of America
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Herbert Hamer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United States of America
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?