Grady v. Kroger Limited Partnership I
Plaintiff: Lesundra Grady
Defendant: Kroger Limited Partnership I
Not Classified By Court: Temiika Gipson
Case Number: 2:2021cv02583
Filed: September 16, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Tennessee
Presiding Judge: Charmiane G Claxton
Referring Judge: Jon Phipps McCalla
Nature of Suit: P.I.: Other
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 9, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 9, 2021 Filing 20 NOTICE by Lesundra Grady of Serving Plaintiff's Initial Rule 26 Disclosures (Peters, Larry)
November 5, 2021 Filing 19 NOTICE by Kroger Limited Partnership I of Service of Defendants' Rule 26(a) Initial Disclosures (Deakins, Laura)
October 27, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 18 SCHEDULING ORDER: Final Pretrial Conference set for 10/11/2022 10:00 AM in Courtroom 5 - Memphis before Magistrate Judge Charmiane G. Claxton. Jury Trial set for 10/24/2022 09:30 AM in Courtroom 5 - Memphis before Magistrate Judge Charmiane G. Claxton. ADR deadline is 1/19/2022. Amended Pleadings due by 12/27/2021. Discovery due by 6/17/2022. Joinder of Parties due by 12/27/2021. Motions due by 1/25/2022. Proposed Pretrial Order due by 10/3/2022.. Signed by Magistrate Judge Charmiane G. Claxton on 10/27/2021. (Claxton, Charmiane)
October 27, 2021 Filing 17 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Charmiane G. Claxton: Scheduling Conference held on 10/27/2021. Proposed Scheduling Order submitted. The Court reviewed the dates with the parties. Jury Selection set for 10/21/2022 at 9:30 AM in Courtroom 5 - Memphis before Magistrate Judge Charmiane G. Claxton. Jury Trial set for 10/24/2022 at 9:30 AM in Courtroom 5 - Memphis before Magistrate Judge Charmiane G. Claxton. Pretrial Conference set for 10/11/2022 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom 5 - Memphis before Magistrate Judge Charmiane G. Claxton. Proposed Pretrial Order is due 10/3/2022. The Court will enter the Scheduling Order. (Plaintiffs Counsel: Jimmy Peters. Defendants Counsel: Chris Vescovo.) (Tape #Teams) (cas)
October 22, 2021 Filing 16 REPORT of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting . (Deakins, Laura)
October 19, 2021 Filing 15 COURTESY NOTICE: Pursuant to Rule 5 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure, document #13 Interrogatories Propounded filed by Lesundra Grady has been filed. For future reference, please note Parties may electronically file a Notice of Service setting forth the date on which the interrogatories, requests for admission or requests for production of documents or the responses thereto were served. Interrogatories, Requests for Production of Documents, and Requests for Admission shall not be filed, except as allowed by LR 26.1(a)(3) or LR 26.1(b). Please refer to the #ECF User Manual and #ECF Policies and Procedures. Filer is not required to resubmit document. (csf)
October 19, 2021 Filing 14 NOTICE OF SETTING: A SCHEDULING CONFERENCE has been set for WEDNESDAY, 10/27/2021 at 02:45 PM before Magistrate Judge Charmiane G. Claxton. The proceeding will be done via Microsoft Teams video conference. The Court will email the parties an invitation for the video conference prior to the proceeding.Counsel should submit a proposed scheduling order to the Judge's ECF mailbox at least 3 days prior to the proceeding. The public may also access the video proceeding. If the public and/or media wish to attend in the video proceeding, please click on the following link to request access information: #https://www.tnwd.uscourts.gov/videohearings The access information will be delivered via email to the email address from which the request originated.Parties should consult the instructions for #Joining a Meeting in Teams or #Joining a Meeting Without a Teams Account. Please email Chris Sowell at chris_sowell@tnwd.uscourts.gov for any questions. Any requests for a continuance of the Scheduling Conference should be made by written motion. (bvh)
October 18, 2021 Filing 13 INTERROGATORIES Propounded to Kroger Limited Partnership I by Lesundra Grady.(Peters, Larry)
October 4, 2021 Filing 12 NOTICE OF CANCELLATION: The Telephonic Scheduling Conference set for Friday, 10/22/2021 at 3:00 PM before Judge Jon Phipps McCalla is CANCELLED. The case is now assigned to Judge Charmiane G. Claxton. (jrs)
October 4, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge. Signed by Judge Jon Phipps McCalla on 10/4/2021. (mab) (Additional attachment(s) added on 10/4/2021: #1 Magistrate Judicial Card) (jae).
October 4, 2021 Magistrate Judge Charmiane G. Claxton assigned as presiding judge. (jae)
September 23, 2021 Filing 10 NOTICE by Kroger Limited Partnership I of Service of Defendant's First Set of Discovery to Plaintiff (Vescovo, Christopher)
September 23, 2021 Filing 9 ANSWER to Complaint with Jury Demand to Amended Complaint by Kroger Limited Partnership I.(Vescovo, Christopher)
September 23, 2021 Filing 8 *CORRECTED* SETTING LETTER: A Telephonic Scheduling Conference set for Friday, 10/22/2021 at 3:00 PM before Judge Jon Phipps McCalla. To access the telephonic conference parties will dial 888-675-2535 and enter access code 7360481. Please call at least 5 minutes in advance of the conference time. (jrs) (Main Document 8 replaced on 9/23/2021 to correct setting letter party and case number) (jrs)
September 20, 2021 Filing 7 AMENDED DOCUMENT by Lesundra Grady. First Amended Complaint. (Peters, Larry)
September 16, 2021 Filing 6 NOTICE OF RIGHT TO CONSENT TO THE EXERCISE OF CIVIL JURISDICTION BY A MAGISTRATE JUDGE Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 636(c), Fed.R.Civ.P.73, and Local Rule 72.1, this Court has designated the Magistrate Judges of this District to conduct trials and otherwise dispose of any civil case that is filed in this Court. Your decision to consent, or not consent, to the referral of your case to a United States Magistrate Judge for trial and entry of a final judgment must be entirely voluntary. The judge or magistrate judge to whom the case has been assigned will not be informed of your decision unless all parties agree that the case may be referred to a magistrate judge for these specific purposes. A less than unanimous decision will not be communicated by this office to either the judge or magistrate judge. The consent form is available on the courts website at https://www.tnwd.uscourts.gov/forms-and-applications.php (jae)
September 16, 2021 Filing 5 NOTICE TO COMPLY WITH PLAN FOR ALTERNATE DISPUTE RESOLUTION (ADR): Pursuant to Section to 2.1 of the ADR Plan, all civil cases filed on or after Sept. 1, 2014, shall be referred automatically for ADR. For compliance requirements, refer to the ADR Plan at: http://www.tnwd.uscourts.gov/pdf/content/ADRPlan.pdf (jae)
September 16, 2021 Filing 4 NOTICE OF CASE TRACKING ASSIGNMENT PURSUANT TO LOCAL RULE 16.2: Pursuant to Local Rule 16.2, this case has been assigned to the Standard track. http://www.tnwd.uscourts.gov/pdf/content/LocalRules.pdf (jae)
September 16, 2021 Filing 3 Judge Jon Phipps McCalla and Magistrate Judge Charmiane G. Claxton added. (jae)
September 16, 2021 Filing 2 NOTICE of Appearance by Laura Lampton Deakins on behalf of Kroger Limited Partnership I (Deakins, Laura)
September 16, 2021 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Kroger Limited Partnership I from Shelby County Circuit, case number CT-3347-21 (Filing fee $ 402 receipt number ATNWDC-3702810), filed by Kroger Limited Partnership I. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit State Court Documents)(Vescovo, Christopher)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Tennessee Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Grady v. Kroger Limited Partnership I
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Not classified by court: Temiika Gipson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lesundra Grady
Represented By: Larry Jimmy Peters
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kroger Limited Partnership I
Represented By: Laura Lampton Deakins
Represented By: Christopher L. Vescovo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?