McPherson v. Target Corporation d/b/a Target Store T1030
Plaintiff: Peggy McPherson
Defendant: Target Corporation d/b/a Target Store T1030
Not Classified By Court: Temiika Gipson
Case Number: 2:2021cv02606
Filed: September 28, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Tennessee
Presiding Judge: Charmiane G Claxton
Referring Judge: Thomas L Parker
Nature of Suit: P.I.: Other
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332
Jury Demanded By: Defendant
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 22, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 22, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 15 [**TEXT ORDER ONLY--NO DOCUMENT ATTACHED**] Defendant moves to permit withdrawal of Attorney Dawn Davis Carson and the law firm of Hickman, Goza, and Spragins, PLLC in this matter. (ECF No. 13 at PageID 76.) For good cause shown, the Court GRANTS the motion. Attorney David A. Changas will remain counsel of record for Defendant. Signed by Judge Thomas L. Parker on 11/22/2021. (jrs)
November 18, 2021 Filing 14 SETTING LETTER - Jury Trial set for 12/19/2022 at 09:30 AM in Courtroom 2 - Memphis before Judge Thomas L. Parker. Pretrial Conference set for 12/9/2022 at 09:30 AM in Courtroom 2 - Memphis before Judge Thomas L. Parker. Proposed Pretrial Order due by 12/2/2022. (mlk)
November 17, 2021 Filing 13 MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney Proposed Order submitted by Target Corporation d/b/a Target Store T1030. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Changas, David)
November 17, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 12 SCHEDULING ORDER. Signed by Judge Thomas L. Parker on 11/17/2021. (Parker, Thomas)
November 17, 2021 Filing 11 Minute Entry for Telephonic Scheduling Conference held before Judge Thomas L. Parker on 11/17/2021. David Siegel appeared for Plaintiff. Dawn Carson and David Changas appeared for Defendant. The Court adopted the proposed scheduling order. Proposed Pretrial Order due 12/2/2022. Pretrial Conference set for 12/9/2022 at 9:30 a.m. in Courtroom 2 Memphis before Judge Thomas L. Parker. Jury Trial set for 12/19/2022 at 9:30 a.m. in Courtroom 2 Memphis before Judge Thomas L. Parker. (Court Reporter, Catherine Phillips) (jrs)
November 5, 2021 Filing 10 NOTICE of Appearance by David A. Changas on behalf of Target Corporation d/b/a Target Store T1030 (Changas, David)
October 26, 2021 Filing 9 SETTING LETTER - TEXT ONLY, NO IMAGE ATTACHED; Telephonic Scheduling Conference set for 11/17/2021 at 09:15 AM before Judge Thomas L. Parker. (mlk)
September 28, 2021 Filing 8 COURTESY NOTICE: Pursuant to Rule 5 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure, document #1 Notice of Removal, filed by Target Corporation d/b/a Target Store T1030 has been filed. For future reference, please note the civil cover sheet has a hand-written signature and not the required electronic signature. Please refer to the #ECF User Manual and #ECF Policies and Procedures. Filer is not required to resubmit document. (agj)
September 28, 2021 Filing 7 NOTICE OF RIGHT TO CONSENT TO THE EXERCISE OF CIVIL JURISDICTION BY A MAGISTRATE JUDGE Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 636(c), Fed.R.Civ.P.73, and Local Rule 72.1, this Court has designated the Magistrate Judges of this District to conduct trials and otherwise dispose of any civil case that is filed in this Court. Your decision to consent, or not consent, to the referral of your case to a United States Magistrate Judge for trial and entry of a final judgment must be entirely voluntary. The judge or magistrate judge to whom the case has been assigned will not be informed of your decision unless all parties agree that the case may be referred to a magistrate judge for these specific purposes. A less than unanimous decision will not be communicated by this office to either the judge or magistrate judge. The consent form is available on the courts website at https://www.tnwd.uscourts.gov/forms-and-applications.php (agj)
September 28, 2021 Filing 6 NOTICE OF CASE TRACKING ASSIGNMENT PURSUANT TO LOCAL RULE 16.2: Pursuant to Local Rule 16.2, this case has been assigned to the Standard track. http://www.tnwd.uscourts.gov/pdf/content/LocalRules.pdf (agj)
September 28, 2021 Filing 5 NOTICE TO COMPLY WITH PLAN FOR ALTERNATE DISPUTE RESOLUTION (ADR): Pursuant to Section to 2.1 of the ADR Plan, all civil cases filed on or after Sept. 1, 2014, shall be referred automatically for ADR. For compliance requirements, refer to the ADR Plan at: http://www.tnwd.uscourts.gov/pdf/content/ADRPlan.pdf (agj)
September 28, 2021 Filing 4 Judge Thomas L. Parker and Magistrate Judge Charmiane G. Claxton added. (agj)
September 28, 2021 Filing 3 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Target Corporation d/b/a Target Store T1030. (Carson, Dawn)
September 28, 2021 Filing 2 ANSWER to Complaint with Jury Demand by Target Corporation d/b/a Target Store T1030.(Carson, Dawn)
September 28, 2021 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by All Defendants from Circuit Court of Shelby County, Tennessee, case number CT-3402-21 (Filing fee $ 402 receipt number ATNWDC-3711065), filed by All Defendants. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit Exhibit B)(Carson, Dawn)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Tennessee Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: McPherson v. Target Corporation d/b/a Target Store T1030
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Not classified by court: Temiika Gipson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Peggy McPherson
Represented By: David A. Siegel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Target Corporation d/b/a Target Store T1030
Represented By: Dawn Davis Carson
Represented By: David A. Changas
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?