Ethel Dorsey v. Dollar Tree Stores, Inc.
Plaintiff: Ethel Dorsey
Defendant: Dollar Tree Stores, Inc.
Not Classified By Court: Temiika Gipson
Case Number: 2:2021cv02614
Filed: September 29, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Tennessee
Presiding Judge: Charmiane G Claxton
Referring Judge: Thomas L Parker
Nature of Suit: P.I.: Other
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 23, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 23, 2021 Filing 13 NOTICE OF SETTING - Proposed Pretrial Order due 12/2/2022; Pretrial Conference set for 12/9/2022 at 9:30 a.m. in Courtroom 2 Memphis before Judge Thomas L. Parker; and Jury Trial set for 12/19/2022 at 9:30 a.m. in Courtroom 2 Memphis before Judge Thomas L. Parker. (mlk)
November 23, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 11 SCHEDULING ORDER. Signed by Judge Thomas L. Parker on 11/23/2021. (Parker, Thomas)
November 22, 2021 Filing 10 Minute Entry for Telephonic Scheduling Conference held before Judge Thomas L. Parker on 11/22/2021. Elaine Sheng appeared for Plaintiff. Ronald Harper appeared for Defendant. The Court adopted the proposed scheduling order. In addition, the Court set these trial-related deadlines: Proposed Pretrial Order due 12/2/2022; Pretrial Conference set for 12/9/2022 at 9:30 a.m. in Courtroom 2 Memphis before Judge Thomas L. Parker; and Jury Trial set for 12/19/2022 at 9:30 a.m. in Courtroom 2 Memphis before Judge Thomas L. Parker. (Court Reporter, Catherine Phillips) (jrs)
November 18, 2021 Filing 9 REPORT of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting . (Harper, Ronald)
November 2, 2021 Filing 12 SETTING LETTER - TEXT ONLY, NO IMAGE ATTACHED; Civil Jury Trial (2 days) set for 12/19/2022 at 09:30 AM in Courtroom 2 - Memphis before Judge Thomas L. Parker. Pretrial Conference set for 12/9/2022 at 09:30 AM in Courtroom 2 - Memphis before Judge Thomas L. Parker. (mlk)
November 1, 2021 Filing 8 SETTING LETTER: - TEXT ONLY, NO IMAGE ATTACHED; Telephonic Scheduling Conference set for 11/22/2021 at 01:00 PM before Judge Thomas L. Parker. Please call 877-336-1839 to dial into the conference call. The access code is 6517215.(mlk)
October 18, 2021 Filing 7 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Ethel Dorsey as to Dollar Tree Stores, Inc.. (Sheng, Elaine)
October 7, 2021 Filing 6 ANSWER to Complaint with Jury Demand by Dollar Tree Stores, Inc..(Harper, Ronald)
September 29, 2021 Filing 5 NOTICE OF RIGHT TO CONSENT TO THE EXERCISE OF CIVIL JURISDICTION BY A MAGISTRATE JUDGE Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 636(c), Fed.R.Civ.P.73, and Local Rule 72.1, this Court has designated the Magistrate Judges of this District to conduct trials and otherwise dispose of any civil case that is filed in this Court. Your decision to consent, or not consent, to the referral of your case to a United States Magistrate Judge for trial and entry of a final judgment must be entirely voluntary. The judge or magistrate judge to whom the case has been assigned will not be informed of your decision unless all parties agree that the case may be referred to a magistrate judge for these specific purposes. A less than unanimous decision will not be communicated by this office to either the judge or magistrate judge. The consent form is available on the courts website at https://www.tnwd.uscourts.gov/forms-and-applications.php (agj)
September 29, 2021 Filing 4 NOTICE OF CASE TRACKING ASSIGNMENT PURSUANT TO LOCAL RULE 16.2: Pursuant to Local Rule 16.2, this case has been assigned to the Standard track. http://www.tnwd.uscourts.gov/pdf/content/LocalRules.pdf (agj)
September 29, 2021 Filing 3 NOTICE TO COMPLY WITH PLAN FOR ALTERNATE DISPUTE RESOLUTION (ADR): Pursuant to Section to 2.1 of the ADR Plan, all civil cases filed on or after Sept. 1, 2014, shall be referred automatically for ADR. For compliance requirements, refer to the ADR Plan at: http://www.tnwd.uscourts.gov/pdf/content/ADRPlan.pdf (agj)
September 29, 2021 Filing 2 Judge Thomas L. Parker and Magistrate Judge Charmiane G. Claxton added. (agj)
September 29, 2021 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Dollar Tree Stores, Inc. from Shelby County Circuit Court, case number CT-3417-21; Division IX (Filing fee $ 402 receipt number ATNWDC-3712510), filed by Dollar Tree Stores, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit A = Complaint for Damages, #3 Exhibit B = Summons to Defendant Dollar Tree Stores, Inc., #4 Exhibit C = Plaintiff's First Set of Interrogatories and Request for Production to Defendant, #5 Exhibit D = Notice of Filing Notice of Removal)(Harper, Ronald)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Tennessee Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Ethel Dorsey v. Dollar Tree Stores, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Not classified by court: Temiika Gipson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ethel Dorsey
Represented By: Elaine Sheng
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dollar Tree Stores, Inc.
Represented By: Ronald L. Harper
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?