Hayes v. Titlemax of Tennessee, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Sidney Hayes
Defendant: Titlemax of Tennessee, Inc. and Henderson Recovery, Inc.
Case Number: 2:2021cv02617
Filed: September 30, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Tennessee
Presiding Judge: Annie T Christoff
Referring Judge: Thomas L Parker
Nature of Suit: Personal Property: Other
Cause of Action: 15 U.S.C. ยง 1692
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 9, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 9, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 9 [**TEXT ORDER ONLY--NO DOCUMENT ATTACHED**] Defendants move, unopposed, for an extension of time to respond to Plaintiff's complaint. (ECF No. 8.) Defendants' counsel requests a thirty-day extension in order to investigate Plaintiff's allegations before responding. (Id.) For good cause shown, the Court GRANTS Defendants' motion. Defendants shall have through December 9, 2021, to respond to Plaintiff's complaint. Signed by Judge Thomas L. Parker on 11/9/21. (aah)
November 5, 2021 Filing 8 MOTION for Extension of Time to File (Unopposed) - Proposed Order Sumitted by Henderson Recovery, Inc., Titlemax of Tennessee, Inc.. (Murphree, John)
September 30, 2021 Filing 7 Summons Issued as to Henderson Recovery, Inc., Titlemax of Tennessee, Inc.. The filer has been notified electronically that the summons has been issued, and the new docket entry reflects this. Upon notification of the new docket entry, the filer is to print the issued summons in order to effect service. (Attachments: #1 summons)(jae)
September 30, 2021 Filing 6 NOTICE OF RIGHT TO CONSENT TO THE EXERCISE OF CIVIL JURISDICTION BY A MAGISTRATE JUDGE Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 636(c), Fed.R.Civ.P.73, and Local Rule 72.1, this Court has designated the Magistrate Judges of this District to conduct trials and otherwise dispose of any civil case that is filed in this Court. Your decision to consent, or not consent, to the referral of your case to a United States Magistrate Judge for trial and entry of a final judgment must be entirely voluntary. The judge or magistrate judge to whom the case has been assigned will not be informed of your decision unless all parties agree that the case may be referred to a magistrate judge for these specific purposes. A less than unanimous decision will not be communicated by this office to either the judge or magistrate judge. The consent form is available on the courts website at https://www.tnwd.uscourts.gov/forms-and-applications.php (jae)
September 30, 2021 Filing 5 NOTICE TO COMPLY WITH PLAN FOR ALTERNATE DISPUTE RESOLUTION (ADR): Pursuant to Section to 2.1 of the ADR Plan, all civil cases filed on or after Sept. 1, 2014, shall be referred automatically for ADR. For compliance requirements, refer to the ADR Plan at: http://www.tnwd.uscourts.gov/pdf/content/ADRPlan.pdf (jae)
September 30, 2021 Filing 4 NOTICE OF CASE TRACKING ASSIGNMENT PURSUANT TO LOCAL RULE 16.2: Pursuant to Local Rule 16.2, this case has been assigned to the Standard track. http://www.tnwd.uscourts.gov/pdf/content/LocalRules.pdf (jae)
September 30, 2021 Filing 3 COURTESY NOTICE: Pursuant to Rule 5 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure, document #1 Complaint, filed by Sidney Hayes has been filed. For future reference, please note :Civil cover sheet contains wet signature of attorney. All documents should contain electronic signatures. Please refer to the #ECF User Manual and #ECF Policies and Procedures. Filer is not required to resubmit document. (jae)
September 30, 2021 Filing 2 Judge Thomas L. Parker and Magistrate Judge Annie T. Christoff added. (jae)
September 30, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT Sidney Hayes against Henderson Recovery, Inc., Titlemax of Tennessee, Inc. (Filing fee $ 402 receipt number BTNWDC-3713132), filed by Sidney Hayes. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons, #3 Summons)(Bailey, John)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Tennessee Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Hayes v. Titlemax of Tennessee, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sidney Hayes
Represented By: John M. Bailey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Titlemax of Tennessee, Inc.
Represented By: John Leland Murphree
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Henderson Recovery, Inc.
Represented By: John Leland Murphree
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?