Lee v. Craft et al
Plaintiff: Wendolyn Lee
Defendant: Chris Craft, Amy Weirich and James Jones
Case Number: 2:2021cv02655
Filed: October 19, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Tennessee
Presiding Judge: Samuel H Mays
Referring Judge: Tu M Pham
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1983
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 15, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 15, 2021 Filing 15 USCA Case Number 21-6191 for #14 Notice of Appeal, filed by Wendolyn Lee. Prisoner Case Docketed with CAP unnecessary. Notice filed by Appellant Wendolyn Lee. Transcript needed: n. (csf)
December 6, 2021 Filing 14 Letter from USCA stating "if a notice of appeal is mistakenly filed in the court of appeals, the clerk of the court of appeals shall note thereon the date on which it was received and transmit it to the clerk of the district court." (Attachments: #1 Notice of Appeal, by Wendolyn Lee #2 Attachments)(csf)
November 17, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 13 JUDGMENT dismissing the case WITH PREJUDICE in accordance with the Order docketed on 11/17/2021, signed by Judge Samuel H. Mays, Jr. on 11/17/2021. (Mays, Samuel) (Main Document 13 replaced on 11/17/2021) (der). (Main Document 13 replaced on 11/17/2021) (der).
November 17, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER dismissing complaint WITH PREJUDICE, as non-compliant with prior Court orders; certifying that an appeal would not be taken in good faith; and denying leave to appeal in forma pauperis; and assessing sanctions, signed by Judge Samuel H. Mays, Jr. on 11/17/2021. (Mays, Samuel) (Main Document 12 replaced on 11/17/2021) (der).
October 19, 2021 Filing 11 Letter to the Court from Wendolyn Lee (Attachments: #1 envelope) (agj)
October 19, 2021 Filing 10 NOTICE OF CASE TRACKING ASSIGNMENT PURSUANT TO LOCAL RULE 16.2: Pursuant to Local Rule 16.2, this case has been assigned to the Pro Se Prisoner track. http://www.tnwd.uscourts.gov/pdf/content/LocalRules.pdf (csf)
October 19, 2021 Filing 9 Case transferred in from District of Louisiana Eastern; Case Number 2:21-cv-01227. Original file certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received. (Additional attachment(s) added on 10/19/2021: #2 Judicial Cards) (csf).
October 18, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER AND REASONS ADOPTING #4 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION: IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that Plaintiff's objections are OVERRULED; IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that the Court ADOPTS the Report and Recommendation; IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that this matter is TRANSFERRED to the Western Division of the United States District Court for the Western District of Tennessee. Signed by Chief Judge Nannette Jolivette Brown on 10/18/2021.(jls) [Transferred from Louisiana Eastern on 10/19/2021.]
September 29, 2021 Filing 7 MOTION for Help and Assistance by Wendolyn Lee. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(jls) [Transferred from Louisiana Eastern on 10/19/2021.]
September 16, 2021 Filing 6 Supplemental Complaint by Wendolyn Lee. (Attachments: #1 Exhibits)(js) [Transferred from Louisiana Eastern on 10/19/2021.]
August 9, 2021 Filing 5 OBJECTION to #4 Report and Recommendations by Wendolyn Lee. (jls) [Transferred from Louisiana Eastern on 10/19/2021.]
July 28, 2021 Filing 4 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION: IT IS RECOMMENDED that the captioned matter be transferred to the Western Division of the United States District Court for the Western District of Tennessee. A party's failure to file written objections to the proposed findings, conclusions, and recommendation in a magistrate judge's report and recommendation within fourteen (14) days after being served with a copy shall bar that party, except upon grounds of plain error, from attacking on appeal the unobjected-to proposed factual findings and legal conclusions accepted by the district court, provided that the party has been served with notice that such consequences will result from a failure to object. Objections to R&R due by 8/11/2021. Signed by Magistrate Judge Michael North on 7/28/2021.(jls) [Transferred from Louisiana Eastern on 10/19/2021.]
July 9, 2021 Filing 3 Notice of Related Case(s) by Wendolyn Lee of related case(s) 21-1118. (js) [Transferred from Louisiana Eastern on 10/19/2021.]
June 25, 2021 Filing 2 NOTICE OF DEFICIENT ProSe COMPLAINT: re #1 Complaint. Please see attached letter for steps needed to remedy deficiency. Deficiency remedy due by 7/16/2021. (bw) [Transferred from Louisiana Eastern on 10/19/2021.]
June 23, 2021 Filing 1 DEFICIENT. COMPLAINT against Chris Craft, James Jones, Amy Weirich filed by Wendolyn Lee. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Letter to the Court, #3 Envelope, #4 Civil Cover Sheet)(bw) [Transferred from Louisiana Eastern on 10/19/2021.]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Tennessee Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Lee v. Craft et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Wendolyn Lee
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Chris Craft
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Amy Weirich
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: James Jones
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?