Patton v. Weirich et al
Plaintiff: Vernon Charles Patton
Defendant: Amy Weirich, Judge Mitchell, W. Mark Ward, Christopher Craft, Lee Coffee, John W. Campbell and Criminal Court Judges Presiding Over Divisions 5, 4, 3, 2 and 1
Case Number: 2:2021cv02675
Filed: October 25, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Tennessee
Presiding Judge: Samuel H Mays
Referring Judge: Tu M Pham
Nature of Suit: Prisoner Petitions (Prison Condition)
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1983
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 20, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 20, 2021 Filing 9 Request for Service of Process by Vernon Charles Patton (Attachments: #1 envelope)(jae)
December 7, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER granting #2 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis and assessing the $350.00 civil filing fee in accordance with the PLRA, signed by Judge Samuel H. Mays, Jr. on 12/07/2021. (Mays, Samuel)
November 18, 2021 Filing 7 PRO SE NOTICE of filing exhibits in support by Vernon Charles Patton (Attachments: #1 Exhibit B, #2 Exhibit C, #3 envelope)(jae)
November 16, 2021 Filing 6 Inmate Balance by Vernon Charles Patton re #4 Order (Attachments: #1 cover letter, #2 envelope)(jae)
November 4, 2021 Filing 5 AMENDED COMPLAINT against All Defendants, filed by Vernon Charles Patton. (Attachments: #1 envelope)(jae)
October 26, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER directing Plaintiff to comply with 28 U.S.C. 1915(a)(2) or pay the $402 civil filing fee, signed by Judge Samuel H. Mays, Jr. on 10/26/2021. (Mays, Samuel)
October 25, 2021 Filing 3 NOTICE OF CASE TRACKING ASSIGNMENT PURSUANT TO LOCAL RULE 16.2: Pursuant to Local Rule 16.2, this case has been assigned to the Pro Se Prisoner track. http://www.tnwd.uscourts.gov/pdf/content/LocalRules.pdf (csf)
October 25, 2021 Filing 2 Pro Se Handwritten MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Vernon Charles Patton. (csf)
October 25, 2021 Filing 1 PRO SE COMPLAINT for Violation of Civil Rights Under 42 U.S.C. 1983 filed by Vernon Charles Patton against All Defendants. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A News Article, #2 Envelope (Front and Back), #3 Judicial Cards)(csf)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Tennessee Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Patton v. Weirich et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Vernon Charles Patton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Amy Weirich
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Judge Mitchell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: W. Mark Ward
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Christopher Craft
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lee Coffee
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John W. Campbell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Criminal Court Judges Presiding Over Divisions 5, 4, 3, 2 and 1
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?